Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2021 at 06:44:59 (UTC).

Leroy White, et al v. Bellflower Unified School Dist

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Leroy White filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Bellflower Unified School Dist. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55140

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Plaintiff / Appellees

HEATHER ICHINOSE, Parent, on behalf of J.W. a minor

LEROY WHITE, Parent, on behalf of J.W. a minor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Eric John Bathen

Attorney at Law Offices of Eric Bathen

650 Town Center Dr., Suite 1200

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Richard D. Brady

Attorney at Brady Law Firm, PLLC

15 North Broadway

Tacoma, WA 98403+3132

Richard Brady

Attorney at Law Offices of Eric Bathen

650 Town Center Dr., Suite 1200

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Hamlet Yarijanian

Attorney at Yarijanian and Associates PC

4340 North Eagle Rock Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90041

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12073321] (CL) [Entered: 04/13/2021 06:10 PM]

#9

(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 04/13/2021, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12051969] (MS) [Entered: 03/24/2021 12:24 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Bellflower Unified School District Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/22/2021. [12049844] [21-55140] (Brady, Richard) [Entered: 03/22/2021 04:45 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 04/02/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12047625] (CL) [Entered: 03/19/2021 01:04 PM]

#3

(#3) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12024897] (LW) [Entered: 03/04/2021 03:48 PM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #2

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12073321] (CL) [Entered: 04/13/2021 06:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 04/13/2021, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12051969] (MS) [Entered: 03/24/2021 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket(#8) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/22/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12049953]. [21-55140] (AD) [Entered: 03/22/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Bellflower Unified School District Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/22/2021. [12049844] [21-55140] (Brady, Richard) [Entered: 03/22/2021 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket(#6) Attorney Richard D. Brady in 21-55140 substituted by Attorney Richard Brady in 21-55140 [12049317] (QDL) [Entered: 03/22/2021 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Dale Brady (Law Offices of Eric Bathen, 650 Town Center Drive, Suite 1200, Costa Mesa, CA 92626) for Appellant Bellflower Unified School District. Substitution for Attorney Richard D. Brady for Appellant Bellflower Unified School District. Date of service: 03/22/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12049304] [21-55140] (Brady, Richard) [Entered: 03/22/2021 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 04/02/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12047625] (CL) [Entered: 03/19/2021 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12024897] (LW) [Entered: 03/04/2021 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) Entered appearance of Court Reporter Alberto V. Ortiz in this case. [12010015] (JMR) [Entered: 02/19/2021 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Bellflower Unified School District Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/26/2021. Transcript ordered by 03/22/2021. Transcript due 04/19/2021. Appellant Bellflower Unified School District opening brief due 06/01/2021. Appellees Heather Ichinose and Leroy White answering brief due 06/28/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12010012] (JMR) [Entered: 02/19/2021 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant