This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/04/2022 at 06:08:08 (UTC).

Leonel Lagunas v. Merrick Garland

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 Leonel Lagunas filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Merrick Garland. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16879

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEONEL SANCHEZ LAGUNAS

Respondents

DAVID W. JENNINGS, Field Office Director of the San Francisco Field Office of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

TAE D. JOHNSON, Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security

MERRICK B. GARLAND, Attorney General, Attorney General of the United States

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Michelle Cho

Attorney at ACLU Foundation of Northern California

39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Vasudha Talla

Attorney at ACLU Foundation of Northern California

39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Respondent Attorney

Sarah Stevens Wilson

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P O Box 875, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellee Leonel Sanchez Lagunas Unopposed Motion to stay appellate proceedings. Date of service: 12/13/2021. [12314016] [21-16879] (Cho, Michelle) [Entered: 12/13/2021 12:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docket(#3) Attorney Imran Raza Zaidi in 21-16879 substituted by Attorney Sarah Stevens Wilson in 21-16879 [12280569] (NAC) [Entered: 11/08/2021 07:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sarah Stevens Wilson (U.S. Department of Justice, Office of Immigration Litigation, Ben Franklin Station, PO Box 878, Washington, DC 20001) for Appellant Merrick B. Garland. Substitution for Attorney Mr. Imran Raza Zaidi for Appellant Merrick B. Garland. Date of service: 11/05/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12280465] [21-16879] (Wilson, Sarah) [Entered: 11/05/2021 08:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General opening brief due 01/03/2022. Appellee Leonel Sanchez Lagunas answering brief due 02/02/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12279539] (HH) [Entered: 11/05/2021 11:37 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases where Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Stevens Wilson