This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/25/2021 at 06:16:24 (UTC).

Leoncio Perez v. USA

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 Leoncio Perez filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-13724

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

LEONCIO PEREZ

Beaumont, TX 77720-6030

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Leoncio Perez

Attorney at USP Beaumont - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 26030

Beaumont, TX 77720-6030

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Brandy Brentari Galler

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

500 S Australian Ave Ste 400

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Emily M. Smachetti

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

99 Ne 4Th St

Miami, FL 33132

U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

DC Order Appealed DE# 14

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA. [21-13724] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 10/28/2021 11:19 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brandy B. Galler for USA [21-13724] (ECF: Brandy Galler) [Entered: 11/08/2021 10:29 AM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Leoncio Perez. [Entered: 11/17/2021 12:43 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Leoncio Perez. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. * No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 11/09/2021 11:44 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Brandy Brentari Galler for United States Attorney Juan Antonio Gonzalez. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-13724] (ECF: Brandy Galler) [Entered: 11/09/2021 02:03 PM]

Open Document

USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Leoncio Perez was filed on 11/15/2021. Docket Entry 21. [Entered: 11/17/2021 12:40 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Leoncio Perez was filed on 11/15/2021. Docket Entry 21. [Entered: 11/17/2021 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Brandy Brentari Galler for United States Attorney Juan Antonio Gonzalez. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-13724] (ECF: Brandy Galler) [Entered: 11/09/2021 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Leoncio Perez. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. * No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 11/09/2021 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Leoncio Perez. [Entered: 11/17/2021 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brandy B. Galler for USA [21-13724] (ECF: Brandy Galler) [Entered: 11/08/2021 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA. [21-13724] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 10/28/2021 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Leoncio Perez on 10/26/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 10/27/2021 05:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily M. Smachetti