This case was last updated from PACER on 08/28/2021 at 06:06:17 (UTC).

Leonard Szplett v. Kenco Logistic Services, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 Leonard Szplett filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Kenco Logistic Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2209

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

TAMMI FOWLER

MARS, INCORPORATED

THE HARTFORD

KENCO LOGISTIC SERVICES, LLC

DAVID JABALEY

HARTFORD LIFE & ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellant

LEONARD A. SZPLETT

Kankakee, IL 60901

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jody Wilner Moran

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

150 N. Michigan Avenue

Chicago, IL 60601

Julia P. Argentieri

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

150 N. Michigan Avenue

Chicago, IL 60601

Thomas R. Davies Esq.

Attorney at HARMON & DAVIES

2306 Columbia Avenue

Lancaster, PA 17603-0000

Kimberly J. Overbaugh

Attorney at HARMON & DAVIES

2306 Columbia Avenue

Lancaster, PA 17603-0000

Joseph Robert Jeffery

Attorney at CHITTENDEN, MURDAY & NOVOTNY LLC

303 W. Madison Street

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Leonard A. Szplett

3421 W. 1500 North Road

Kankakee, IL 60901

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Filed Response by Appellee Mars, Incorporated Attorney Thomas R. Davies to JURISDICTIONAL RESPONSE MEMORANDUM RESPONSE BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS-APPELLEES, MARS, INC., ROBERT COFFEY AND TODD MOORE. [18][7180062] [21-2209] (Davies, Thomas) [Entered: 08/18/2021 06:06 PM]

#17

(#17) Filed Response by Appellee Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company to Plaintiff-Appellant's August 6, 2021 Response on Orders. [17][7180059] [21-2209] (Jeffery, Joseph) [Entered: 08/18/2021 04:55 PM]

#16

(#16) Filed Response by Appellees Kenco Logistic Services, LLC, Tammi Fowler and David Jabaley Attorney Julia Pearce Argentieri to JURISDICTIONAL RESPONSE MEMORANDUM - RESPONSE BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS-APPELLEES, KENCO LOGISTICS SERVICES, LLC, DAVID JABALEY, TAMMI FOWLER, PAULA HISE, TRACE SPIER, JAY ELLIOTT, DAVID CAINES, MICHAEL MANZELLO, DWIGHT CRAWLEY, AND KELVIN WALSH. [16][7179950] [21-2209] (Argentieri, Julia) [Entered: 08/18/2021 01:21 PM]

#15

(#15) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jody Wilner Moran for Appellees Kenco Logistic Services, LLC, Tammi Fowler and David Jabaley. for Paula Hise, Trace Spier, Jay Elliott, David Caines, Michael Manzello, Dwight Crawley, and Kelvin Walsh. [15] [7179947] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2209] (Moran, Jody) [Entered: 08/18/2021 01:09 PM]

#14

(#14) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Julia Pearce Argentieri for Appellee Kenco Logistic Services, LLC. [14] [7179846] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2209] [Edited 08/18/2021 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Argentieri, Julia) [Entered: 08/18/2021 09:47 AM]

#13

(#13) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas R. Davies for Appellee Mars, Incorporated. for Robert Coffey and Todd Moore. [13] [7179771] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2209] (Davies, Thomas) [Entered: 08/17/2021 04:38 PM]

#12

(#12) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kimberly J. Overbaugh for Appellee Mars, Incorporated. for Robert Coffey and Todd Moore. [12] [7179769] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2209] -[Edited 08/17/2021 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Overbaugh, Kimberly) [Entered: 08/17/2021 04:33 PM]

#11

(#11) ORDER re: Reponse. IT IS ORDERED that appellees file, on or before August 18, 2021, a response to appellants filing, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the courts order of June 29, 2021. DW [11] [7178259] [21-2209] (AP) [Entered: 08/10/2021 02:23 PM]

#10

(#10) Filed Showcause Response by Appellant Leonard A. Szplett to 07/20/2021 order. [10][7177761] [21-2209] (CAH) [Entered: 08/06/2021 04:02 PM]

9 #2

June 29, 2021 Order

9 #1

Other RSC Order Filed

#8

(#8) Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellee Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [8] [7173599] [21-2209] (Jeffery, Joseph) [Entered: 07/19/2021 11:13 AM]

#7

(#7) Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee was received. [7] [7172721] [21-2209] (CM) [Entered: 07/14/2021 09:35 AM]

#6

(#6) ORDER: In the present case, appellee Hartford Lifes Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement fails to set forth the federal statute or constitutional provision involved in this case. This information must be provided. Accordingly, appellee Hartford Life shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before 07/19/2021. (See order for further details). DW [6] [7172376] [21-2209] (MM) [Entered: 07/13/2021 08:44 AM]

#5

(#5) Docketing Statement filed by Appellee The Hartford. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7172139] [21-2209] (Jeffery, Joseph) [Entered: 07/12/2021 08:55 AM]

#4

(#4) ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellees brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). [7170017] [4] [7170017] [21-2209] (ZNS) [Entered: 06/29/2021 03:37 PM]

#3

(#3) ORDER: Appellant Leonard A. Szplett shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details). [7170006] Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Leonard A. Szplett by 07/13/2021. DW. [3] [7170006] [21-2209] (ZNS) [Entered: 06/29/2021 03:32 PM]

1 #2

Fee Notice

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Filed Response by Appellee Mars, Incorporated Attorney Thomas R. Davies to JURISDICTIONAL RESPONSE MEMORANDUM RESPONSE BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS-APPELLEES, MARS, INC., ROBERT COFFEY AND TODD MOORE. [18][7180062] [21-2209] (Davies, Thomas) [Entered: 08/18/2021 06:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Filed Response by Appellee Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company to Plaintiff-Appellant's August 6, 2021 Response on Orders. [17][7180059] [21-2209] (Jeffery, Joseph) [Entered: 08/18/2021 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Filed Response by Appellees Kenco Logistic Services, LLC, Tammi Fowler and David Jabaley Attorney Julia Pearce Argentieri to JURISDICTIONAL RESPONSE MEMORANDUM - RESPONSE BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS-APPELLEES, KENCO LOGISTICS SERVICES, LLC, DAVID JABALEY, TAMMI FOWLER, PAULA HISE, TRACE SPIER, JAY ELLIOTT, DAVID CAINES, MICHAEL MANZELLO, DWIGHT CRAWLEY, AND KELVIN WALSH. [16][7179950] [21-2209] (Argentieri, Julia) [Entered: 08/18/2021 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jody Wilner Moran for Appellees Kenco Logistic Services, LLC, Tammi Fowler and David Jabaley. for Paula Hise, Trace Spier, Jay Elliott, David Caines, Michael Manzello, Dwight Crawley, and Kelvin Walsh. [15] [7179947] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2209] (Moran, Jody) [Entered: 08/18/2021 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Julia Pearce Argentieri for Appellee Kenco Logistic Services, LLC. [14] [7179846] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2209] [Edited 08/18/2021 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Argentieri, Julia) [Entered: 08/18/2021 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas R. Davies for Appellee Mars, Incorporated. for Robert Coffey and Todd Moore. [13] [7179771] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2209] (Davies, Thomas) [Entered: 08/17/2021 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kimberly J. Overbaugh for Appellee Mars, Incorporated. for Robert Coffey and Todd Moore. [12] [7179769] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2209] -[Edited 08/17/2021 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Overbaugh, Kimberly) [Entered: 08/17/2021 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER re: Reponse. IT IS ORDERED that appellees file, on or before August 18, 2021, a response to appellants filing, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the courts order of June 29, 2021. DW [11] [7178259] [21-2209] (AP) [Entered: 08/10/2021 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed Showcause Response by Appellant Leonard A. Szplett to 07/20/2021 order. [10][7177761] [21-2209] (CAH) [Entered: 08/06/2021 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff-appellant Leonard A. Szplett to show cause for his failure to respond to the courts order of June 29, 2021. Plaintiff-appellant Leonard A. Szplett shall file his response on or before August 3, 2021. Appellant is advised that failure to respond may result in the dismissal of this appeal. The clerk is directed to attach a copy of the courts order of June 29, 2021, to appellants copy of this order. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7020 2450 0002 1929 9842. DW [9] [7174089] [21-2209] (PS) [Entered: 07/20/2021 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellee Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [8] [7173599] [21-2209] (Jeffery, Joseph) [Entered: 07/19/2021 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee was received. [7] [7172721] [21-2209] (CM) [Entered: 07/14/2021 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: In the present case, appellee Hartford Lifes Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement fails to set forth the federal statute or constitutional provision involved in this case. This information must be provided. Accordingly, appellee Hartford Life shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before 07/19/2021. (See order for further details). DW [6] [7172376] [21-2209] (MM) [Entered: 07/13/2021 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docketing Statement filed by Appellee The Hartford. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7172139] [21-2209] (Jeffery, Joseph) [Entered: 07/12/2021 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellees brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). [7170017] [4] [7170017] [21-2209] (ZNS) [Entered: 06/29/2021 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Appellant Leonard A. Szplett shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details). [7170006] Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Leonard A. Szplett by 07/13/2021. DW. [3] [7170006] [21-2209] (ZNS) [Entered: 06/29/2021 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Mario Lopez, Paula Hise, Trace Spier, Robert Coffey, Todd Moore, Jay Elliot, David Caines, Michael Manzello, David Crawley, and Kevin Walsh. [2] [7169857] [21-2209] (ZNS) [Entered: 06/29/2021 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 07/13/2021. Fee or IFP forms due on 07/13/2021 for Appellant Leonard A. Szplett. [1] [7169846] [21-2209] (ZNS) [Entered: 06/29/2021 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kenco Logistic Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MARS, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where The Hartford is a litigant

Latest cases where THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant