This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/30/2019 at 06:07:22 (UTC).

Leonard Panella v. Tesco Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2019 Leonard Panella filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Tesco Corporation,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-20298

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

NORMAN HEINZE

Defendant / Appellees

NABORS INDUSTRIES, LIMITED

FERNANDO R. ASSING

MICHAEL W. SUTHERLIN

JOHN P. DIELWART

TESCO CORPORATION

R. VANCE MILLIGAN

ELIJIO V. SERRANO

DOUGLAS R. RAMSAY

ROSE M. ROBESON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Thomas Emerson Bilek

Attorney at Bilek Law Firm. L.L.P.

700 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002-0000

Miles Dylan Schreiner

Attorney at Monteverde & Associates, P.C.

350 5Th Avenue, Empire State Building

New York, NY 10118

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Alan J. Stone

Attorney at Milbank, L.L.P.

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Brian Frederick Antweil

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman, L.L.P.

1301 Mckinney Street

Houston, TX 77001

Gerard Pecht

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US, L.L.P.

1301 Mckinney Street, Fulbright Tower

Houston, TX 77010-3095

Peter Andrew Stokes

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US, L.L.P.

98 San Jacinto Boulevard

Austin, TX 78701-4255

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/17/2019 for Appellant Norman Heinze. [19-20298] (SDH) [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20298] (SDH) [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Alan J. Stone for Appellee Nabors Industries, Limited in 19-20298 [19-20298] (DMS) [Entered: 05/22/2019 11:05 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20298] (Alan J. Stone ) [Entered: 05/21/2019 08:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:17-CV-2904 / 4:17-CV-3029. Electronic ROA due on 06/05/2019. [19-20298] (DMS) [Entered: 05/21/2019 03:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Norman Heinze advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-20298] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Norman Heinze advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 05/21/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Antweil, Pecht, Stokes, Stone; Attorney for Appellants: Bilek, Schreiner [19-20298] (Miles Dylan Schreiner ) [Entered: 05/21/2019 03:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Gerard Pecht for Appellee Michael W. Sutherlin in 19-20298, Attorney Gerard Pecht for Appellee Elijio V. Serrano in 19-20298, Attorney Gerard Pecht for Appellee Rose M. Robeson in 19-20298, Attorney Gerard Pecht for Appellee Douglas R. Ramsay in 19-20298, Attorney Gerard Pecht for Appellee R. Vance Milligan in 19-20298, Attorney Gerard Pecht for Appellee John P. Dielwart in 19-20298, Attorney Gerard Pecht for Appellee Fernando R. Assing in 19-20298, Attorney Gerard Pecht for Appellee Tesco Corporation in 19-20298 [19-20298] (DMS) [Entered: 05/13/2019 08:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Peter Andrew Stokes for Appellee Michael W. Sutherlin in 19-20298, Attorney Peter Andrew Stokes for Appellee Elijio V. Serrano in 19-20298, Attorney Peter Andrew Stokes for Appellee Rose M. Robeson in 19-20298, Attorney Peter Andrew Stokes for Appellee Douglas R. Ramsay in 19-20298, Attorney Peter Andrew Stokes for Appellee R. Vance Milligan in 19-20298, Attorney Peter Andrew Stokes for Appellee John P. Dielwart in 19-20298, Attorney Peter Andrew Stokes for Appellee Fernando R. Assing in 19-20298, Attorney Peter Andrew Stokes for Appellee Tesco Corporation in 19-20298 [19-20298] (DMS) [Entered: 05/13/2019 08:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Miles Dylan Schreiner for party(s) Appellant Norman Heinze, in case 19-20298 [19-20298] (DMS) [Entered: 05/13/2019 08:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Gerard Pecht for Mr. Fernando R. Assing, Mr. John P. Dielwart, Mr. R. Vance Milligan, Mr. Douglas R. Ramsay, Ms. Rose M. Robeson, Mr. Elijio V. Serrano, Mr. Michael W. Sutherlin and Tesco Corporation for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20298] (Gerard Pecht ) [Entered: 05/10/2019 02:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Peter Andrew Stokes for Mr. Fernando R. Assing, Mr. John P. Dielwart, Mr. R. Vance Milligan, Mr. Douglas R. Ramsay, Ms. Rose M. Robeson, Mr. Elijio V. Serrano, Mr. Michael W. Sutherlin and Tesco Corporation for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20298] (Peter Andrew Stokes ) [Entered: 05/10/2019 02:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Miles Dylan Schreiner for Mr. Norman Heinze for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20298] (Miles Dylan Schreiner ) [Entered: 05/10/2019 12:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9047850-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 05/23/2019 for Appellant Norman Heinze [19-20298] (DMS) [Entered: 05/08/2019 11:12 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Norman Heinze [19-20298] (AS) [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nabors Industries Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases where TESCO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Frederick Antweil

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter Andrew Stokes