This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/12/2022 at 05:36:04 (UTC).

Leica Microsystems, Inc. v. Regents of the University of Michigan

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 Leica Microsystems, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Regents of the University of Michigan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1445

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

LEICA MICROSYSTEMS, INC.

Appellee

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Andrew Ryan Sommer

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

1750 Tysons Boulevard

Mclean, VA 22102

Appellee Attorney

Russell Tonkovich

Attorney at Kramer Day Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli LLP

577 Airport Boulevard

Burlingame, CA 94010

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid. Fee Amount: $500.00. Receipt Number: A13-37096-891. [829239] [22-1445] [Andrew Sommer] [Entered: 02/07/2022 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 02/03/2022. [829034] Fee/IFP is due on 02/18/2022. Entry of Appearance is due on 02/18/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 02/18/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 02/18/2022. Certified List is due on 03/16/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 02/04/2022 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Leica Microsystems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Regents Of The University Of Michigan is a litigant