This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:05:26 (UTC).

Leiann Fountain v. Deutsche Bank National Trust C

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Leiann Fountain filed an Other lawsuit against Deutsche Bank National Trust C. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1173

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

LEIANN TONI FOUNTAIN

Debtor

In re: LEIANN TONI FOUNTAIN

Appellee

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, As Trustee for American Home Mortgage Assets Trust 2007-2, Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-2.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Lars Peterson

Attorney at Abelmann Peterson Rollins LLLC

677 Ala Moana Blvd

Honolulu, HI 96813

Appellee Attorneys

David E. McAllister

Attorney at Aldridge Pite, LLP

4375 Jutland Drive

San Diego, CA 92117

Zachary K. Kondo Esquire

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE, LLP

810 Richards Street,

Honolulu, HI 96813

Michelle N. Comeau

Attorney at ALSTON, HUNT, FLOYD & ING

1001 Bishop Street

Honolulu, HI 96813

Jade Lynne Ching

Attorney at Nakashima Ching LLC

737 Bishop Street

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Notice to all parties and Bankruptcy Court RE: BAP Case number assigned: HI-19-1173. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. (VJ) [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:04 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed order (TAYLOR and BRAND); The motion for stay pending appeal is ORDERED DENIED. ;. ( see attached order) (VJ) [Entered: 08/09/2019 02:16 PM]

#3

(#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant Leiann Toni Fountain. Copies to all parties. Appellant Leiann Toni Fountain's opening brief due 08/30/2019. (VJ) [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:51 PM]

#8

(#8) Certificate of readiness received. (VJ) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:50 AM]

#1

(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 07/11/2019, notice of referral, transmittal form with Order. (VJ) [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:58 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Lars Peterson for Appellant Leiann Toni Fountain's motion to stay further action pending appeal; 08/05/2019 served by: email - Attorney for Appellees: Kondo, McAllister; Attorney for Appellant: Peterson. [19-1173] (LP) [Entered: 08/05/2019 06:35 PM]

#11

(#11) Notice of Deficient Excerpts sent to Attorney Mr. Lars Peterson for Appellant Leiann Toni Fountain Re: Excerpts do not meet requirements in Administrative Order Regarding Electronic Filing in BAP Cases Rule 3(a) -1 Deficient Excerpt Response due 09/18/2019. (VJ) [Entered: 09/04/2019 10:18 AM]

#9

(#9) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Lars Peterson for Appellant Leiann Toni Fountain's brief on appeal; served on 08/30/2019 email - Attorney for Appellees: Ching, Comeau, Kondo, McAllister; Attorney for Appellant: Peterson. [19-1173] (LP) [Entered: 08/30/2019 07:13 PM]

#10

(#10) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Lars Peterson for Appellant Leiann Toni Fountain's excerpts of record; served on 08/30/2019 email - Attorney for Appellees: Ching, Comeau, Kondo, McAllister; Attorney for Appellant: Peterson. [19-1173] (LP) [Entered: 08/30/2019 07:17 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jade L. Ching for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for American Home Mortgage Assets Trust 2007-2, Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-2; served on 08/12/2019 email - Attorney for Appellees: Kondo, McAllister; Attorney for Appellant: Peterson. [19-1173] (JLC) [Entered: 08/12/2019 12:35 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Notice of Deficient Excerpts sent to Attorney Mr. Lars Peterson for Appellant Leiann Toni Fountain Re: Excerpts do not meet requirements in Administrative Order Regarding Electronic Filing in BAP Cases Rule 3(a) -1 Deficient Excerpt Response due 09/18/2019. (VJ) [Entered: 09/04/2019 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Lars Peterson for Appellant Leiann Toni Fountain's excerpts of record; served on 08/30/2019 email - Attorney for Appellees: Ching, Comeau, Kondo, McAllister; Attorney for Appellant: Peterson. [19-1173] (LP) [Entered: 08/30/2019 07:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Lars Peterson for Appellant Leiann Toni Fountain's brief on appeal; served on 08/30/2019 email - Attorney for Appellees: Ching, Comeau, Kondo, McAllister; Attorney for Appellant: Peterson. [19-1173] (LP) [Entered: 08/30/2019 07:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of readiness received. (VJ) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • (#7) Party: Add Attorney(s) Jade Lynne Ching, Michelle N Comeau for party(s) Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, in case 19-1173. (VJ) [Entered: 08/12/2019 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jade L. Ching for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for American Home Mortgage Assets Trust 2007-2, Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-2; served on 08/12/2019 email - Attorney for Appellees: Kondo, McAllister; Attorney for Appellant: Peterson. [19-1173] (JLC) [Entered: 08/12/2019 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed order (TAYLOR and BRAND); The motion for stay pending appeal is ORDERED DENIED. ;. ( see attached order) (VJ) [Entered: 08/09/2019 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Lars Peterson for Appellant Leiann Toni Fountain's motion to stay further action pending appeal; 08/05/2019 served by: email - Attorney for Appellees: Kondo, McAllister; Attorney for Appellant: Peterson. [19-1173] (LP) [Entered: 08/05/2019 06:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant Leiann Toni Fountain. Copies to all parties. Appellant Leiann Toni Fountain's opening brief due 08/30/2019. (VJ) [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice to all parties and Bankruptcy Court RE: BAP Case number assigned: HI-19-1173. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. (VJ) [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 07/11/2019, notice of referral, transmittal form with Order. (VJ) [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.