This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2019 at 06:03:27 (UTC).

LEGO A/S v. ZURU Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 LEGO A/S filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ZURU Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2122

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

LEGO SYSTEMS, INC.

LEGO A/S

LEGO JURIS A/S

Defendant / Appellant

ZURU INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Elizabeth A. Alquist Esq.

Attorney at Day Pitney, LLP

185 Asylum Avenue, Cityplace I

Hartford, CT 06103

John W. Cerreta

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP

242 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103

Elizabeth A. Alquist

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP

242 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103-1212

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Robert Tyler Goodwyn

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Tami Lyn Azorsky

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

John William Lomas Jr.

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED BRIEF FILED for Appellant ZURU Inc. Number of Pages: 74. Service: 09/04/2019 by email. [633181]--[Edited 09/05/2019 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [Tami Azorsky] [Entered: 09/04/2019 05:14 PM]

#28

(#28) Notice to Advise of Scheduling Conflicts. Arguing counsel must advise of, and show good cause for, any scheduling conflicts during the upcoming court session month listed in the attached notice. The Response to Notice to Advise of Scheduling Conflicts can be found # here . The Oral Argument Guide can be found # here . [633030] [MMA] [Entered: 09/04/2019 12:02 PM]

26 #2

Corrected Joint Appendix - Volume II

26 #1

Corrected Joint Appendix - Volume I

#25

(#25) MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED BRIEF FILED for Appellees LEGO A/S, LEGO Juris A/S and LEGO Systems, Inc. Number of Pages: 77. Service: 08/30/2019 by email. [632331]--[Edited 08/30/2019 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [Elizabeth Alquist] [Entered: 08/30/2019 01:13 PM]

#24

(#24) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant ZURU Inc., Appendix [ # 20 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant appendix due on 09/09/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [632251] [MMA] [Entered: 08/30/2019 11:12 AM]

20 #2

Joint Appendix - Volume II

20 #1

Joint Appendix - Volume I

#19

(#31) 6 paper copies of the Reply Brief [ # 19 ] received from Appellant ZURU Inc.. [633750] [CJF] [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:23 PM]

6 #9

Exhibit H

6 #8

Exhibit G

6 #1

Motion

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellant ZURU Inc.. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621119] [19-2122] [Tami Azorsky] [Entered: 07/15/2019 05:24 PM]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for John W. Lomas, Jr. as of counsel for Appellant ZURU Inc.. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621117] [19-2122] [John Lomas] [Entered: 07/15/2019 05:18 PM]

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Robert Tyler Goodwyn as of counsel for Appellant ZURU Inc.. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621111] [19-2122] [Robert Goodwyn] [Entered: 07/15/2019 05:03 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Tami Lyn Azorsky as principal counsel for Appellant ZURU Inc.. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621109] [19-2122] [Tami Azorsky] [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:55 PM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) 6 paper copies of the Corrected Appendix Brief (Vol. I - II) [ # 26 ] received from Appellant ZURU Inc.. [633752] [CJF] [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) 6 paper copies of the Reply Brief [ # 19 ] received from Appellant ZURU Inc.. [633750] [CJF] [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) 6 paper copies of the Corrected Opening Brief [ # 29 ] received from Appellant ZURU Inc.. [633749] [CJF] [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED BRIEF FILED for Appellant ZURU Inc. Number of Pages: 74. Service: 09/04/2019 by email. [633181]--[Edited 09/05/2019 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [Tami Azorsky] [Entered: 09/04/2019 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Notice to Advise of Scheduling Conflicts. Arguing counsel must advise of, and show good cause for, any scheduling conflicts during the upcoming court session month listed in the attached notice. The Response to Notice to Advise of Scheduling Conflicts can be found # here . The Oral Argument Guide can be found # here . [633030] [MMA] [Entered: 09/04/2019 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • (#27) Outstanding paper copies of all briefs and appendices must be submitted within five business days from the date of issuance of this notice. See Fed. Cir. R. 25(c)(1). [633005] [MMA] [Entered: 09/04/2019 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED APPENDIX FILED for ZURU Inc. Number of Pages: 810. Service: 09/03/2019 by email. [632869]--[Edited 09/04/2019 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [Tami Azorsky] [Entered: 09/03/2019 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED BRIEF FILED for Appellees LEGO A/S, LEGO Juris A/S and LEGO Systems, Inc. Number of Pages: 77. Service: 08/30/2019 by email. [632331]--[Edited 08/30/2019 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [Elizabeth Alquist] [Entered: 08/30/2019 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant ZURU Inc., Appendix [ # 20 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant appendix due on 09/09/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [632251] [MMA] [Entered: 08/30/2019 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Joint Statement of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 33 for Appellees LEGO A/S, LEGO Juris A/S, LEGO Systems, Inc. and Appellant ZURU Inc.. Service: 08/29/2019 by email. [632099] [19-2122] [Tami Azorsky] [Entered: 08/29/2019 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellant ZURU Inc.. Service: 07/24/2019 by email. [623317] [19-2122] [Tami Azorsky] [Entered: 07/24/2019 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellees LEGO A/S, LEGO Juris A/S and LEGO Systems, Inc.. Service: 07/24/2019 by email. [623235] [19-2122] [Elizabeth Alquist] [Entered: 07/24/2019 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellees LEGO A/S, LEGO Juris A/S and LEGO Systems, Inc.. Service: 07/24/2019 by email. [623231] [19-2122] [Elizabeth Alquist] [Entered: 07/24/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for Elizabeth A. Alquist as principal counsel for Appellees LEGO A/S, LEGO Juris A/S and LEGO Systems, Inc.. Service: 07/24/2019 by email. [623224] [19-2122] [Elizabeth Alquist] [Entered: 07/24/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION of Appellant ZURU Inc. to expedite briefing schedule, to expedite hearing [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621125] [19-2122] [Tami Azorsky] [Entered: 07/15/2019 05:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellant ZURU Inc.. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621119] [19-2122] [Tami Azorsky] [Entered: 07/15/2019 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Entry of appearance for John W. Lomas, Jr. as of counsel for Appellant ZURU Inc.. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621117] [19-2122] [John Lomas] [Entered: 07/15/2019 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Robert Tyler Goodwyn as of counsel for Appellant ZURU Inc.. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621111] [19-2122] [Robert Goodwyn] [Entered: 07/15/2019 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Tami Lyn Azorsky as principal counsel for Appellant ZURU Inc.. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621109] [19-2122] [Tami Azorsky] [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/10/2019. [620151] Entry of Appearance due 07/24/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/24/2019. Docketing Statement due 07/24/2019. Appellant's brief is due 09/09/2019. [MMA] [Entered: 07/10/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lego Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Zuru Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Tyler Goodwyn, IV