This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2020 at 06:36:47 (UTC).

LeBlanc, et al v. Halliburton Energy

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 LeBlanc filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Halliburton Energy. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2202

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

TODD GUFFY

JOSH ASHLEY

DAN SAFFORD

BRENT LEBLANC, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

THOMAS RUSSELL

MARSHALL E. HATCHER

JEREMY O. FISHER

MICHAEL BERGEVIN

BROOKS HONDL

JESSE MARKER

Defendant / Appellant

HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Michael Andrew Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Andrew Wells Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Richard Jennings Burch

Attorney at Richard Burch

8 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77046

David Moulton

Attorney at Richard Burch

8 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Charles J. Vigil

Attorney at Rodey Dickason Sloan Akin & Robb

201 Third Street Nw, Suite 2200

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Paige T. Bennett

Attorney at Reed Smith

811 Main Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Jeffrey L. Lowry Esq.

Attorney at Rodey Dickason Sloan Akin & Robb

201 Third Street Nw, Suite 2200

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Mark D. Temple

Attorney at Reed Smith

811 Main Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Robert Alan York

Attorney at Reed Smith

811 Main Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10710355] Status report filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. Served on 01/16/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-2202] RAY [Entered: 01/16/2020 09:42 AM]

Open Document

[10703368] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Richard Jennings Burch and David Moulton for Mr. Thomas Russell, Brent LeBlanc, Jeremy O. Fisher, Todd Guffy, Marshall E. Hatcher and Jesse Marker. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/17/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-2202] [Entered: 12/17/2019 03:31 PM]

Open Document

[10703260] Order filed by Clerk of the Court abating case pending disposition of the Appellant's motion to reconsider filed in district court. Appellant shall notify the court within 5 days afer the district court disposes of the motion to reconsider, or file a status report in 30 days if the district court has not entered an order on the pending motion. Status report due 1/16/2020 for Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. The district court is directed to transmit a supplemental preliminary record (containing the order and updated docket sheet) within 5 days of disposition of the pending motion. See attached order for further informaiton. Served on 12/17/2019. [19-2202] [Entered: 12/17/2019 01:01 PM]

Open Document

[10703105] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/17/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 01/27/2020 for Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. [19-2202] [Entered: 12/17/2019 08:35 AM]

Open Document

[10702946] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Robert Alan York for Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. and Mr. Jeffrey L. Lowry, Esq. for Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2202] [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:44 PM]

Open Document

[10702931] Notice received from Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-2202] JLL [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:29 PM]

Open Document

[10702926] Docketing statement filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-2202] JLL [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:25 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Preliminary ROA

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • Docket[10710368] Minute order filed - This matter is before the court on appellant's status report filed on 1/16/2020. The abatement of this appeal is continued. The court directs the appellant to file another status report in 30 days or within 5 days after the district court enters an order disposing of the pending motion to reconsider. Status report due 02/18/2020 by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-2202] [Entered: 01/16/2020 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10710355] Status report filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. Served on 01/16/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-2202] RAY [Entered: 01/16/2020 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10703368] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Richard Jennings Burch and David Moulton for Mr. Thomas Russell, Brent LeBlanc, Jeremy O. Fisher, Todd Guffy, Marshall E. Hatcher and Jesse Marker. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/17/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-2202] [Entered: 12/17/2019 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket[10703363] Entry of appearance submitted by David I. Moulton and Richard J. (Rex) Burch for Appellees Brent LeBlanc, Josh Ashley, Dan Safford, Michael Bergevin, Brooks Hondl and Todd Guffy for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2202] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 12/17/2019 by NA] DM [Entered: 12/17/2019 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10703260] Order filed by Clerk of the Court abating case pending disposition of the Appellant's motion to reconsider filed in district court. Appellant shall notify the court within 5 days afer the district court disposes of the motion to reconsider, or file a status report in 30 days if the district court has not entered an order on the pending motion. Status report due 1/16/2020 for Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. The district court is directed to transmit a supplemental preliminary record (containing the order and updated docket sheet) within 5 days of disposition of the pending motion. See attached order for further informaiton. Served on 12/17/2019. [19-2202] [Entered: 12/17/2019 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket[10703110] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 12/03/2019. [19-2202] [Entered: 12/17/2019 08:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10703105] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/17/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 01/27/2020 for Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. [19-2202] [Entered: 12/17/2019 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket[10702992] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 12/23/2019 for Mitchell R. Elfers, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-2202] [Entered: 12/16/2019 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702946] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Robert Alan York for Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. and Mr. Jeffrey L. Lowry, Esq. for Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2202] [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702931] Notice received from Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-2202] JLL [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket. Desingation of record not required as Appellant is required to file an appendix. [sds] [10702929] Designation of record filed by Appellant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-2202] JLL [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702926] Docketing statement filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-2202] JLL [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket[10702924] Entry of appearance submitted by R. Alan York; Jeffrey L. Lowry for Appellant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-2202] --[Edited 12/16/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 12/16/2019] JLL [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10699434] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/03/2019 Fee, docketing statement, transcript order form and entry of appearance due 12/17/2019 for Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. Notice of appearance due on 12/17/2019 for Jeremy O. Fisher, Todd Guffy, Marshall E. Hatcher, Brent LeBlanc, Jesse Marker and Thomas Russell [19-2202] [Entered: 12/03/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.