This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2021 at 07:00:54 (UTC).

LCS Group LLC v. Shire LLC

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 LCS Group LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Shire LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2587

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendant

Baker Hostetler, LLP

Appellees

Stephen M. Lobbin

La Jolla, CA 92037

Foundation Law Group LLP

Defendant / Appellants

Shire PLC

Shire LLC

Shire Development LLC

Haug Partners LLP

Plaintiff / Appellee

LCS Group LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee and Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Stephen M. Lobbin Esq.

Attorney at SML Avvocati P.C.

888 Prospect Street

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Porter F. Fleming Esq.

Attorney at Haug Partners LLP

745 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10151

Jonathan Herstoff Esq.

Attorney at Haug Partners LLP

745 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10151

Jason Ari Kanter Esq.

Attorney at Haug Partners LLP

745 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10151

 

Court Documents

108 #2

CAL_Instructions_InPerson_Appearance

#85

No Description Available

#66

No Description Available

#45

No Description Available

#44

No Description Available

#52

No Description Available

#32

No Description Available

48 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#47

No Description Available

19 #3

Addendum B

19 #1

Form C FILED

#14

No Description Available

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Haug Partners LLP, Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC and Shire PLC, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2907274] [20-2587] [Entered: 08/13/2020 01:53 PM]

#29

No Description Available

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/13/2020, RECEIVED.[2902142] [20-2587] [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:50 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Haug Partners LLP, Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC and Shire PLC, FILED. Service date 10/01/2021 by CM/ECF. [3185000] [20-2587] [Entered: 10/01/2021 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) REVISED ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [3184946] [20-2319, 20-2587] [Entered: 10/01/2021 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Haug Partners LLP, Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC and Shire PLC, FILED. Service date 10/01/2021 by CM/ECF. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [3184899] [20-2587] [Entered: 10/01/2021 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) REVISED ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [3183210] [20-2319, 20-2587] [Entered: 09/29/2021 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee LCS Group LLC and Stephen M. Lobbin, FILED. Service date 09/14/2021 by CM/ECF. [3173725] [20-2587] [Entered: 09/14/2021 10:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Haug Partners LLP, Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC and Shire PLC, FILED. Service date 09/14/2021 by CM/ECF. [3173385] [20-2587] [Entered: 09/14/2021 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [3172776] [20-2319, 20-2587] [Entered: 09/13/2021 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • Docket(#87) CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 10/14/2021, SET.[3157777] [20-2319, 20-2587] [Entered: 08/17/2021 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket(#86) CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 10/12/2021, PROPOSED.[3139603] [20-2319, 20-2587] [Entered: 07/16/2021 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docket(#83) CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 08/16/2021, PROPOSED.[3103193] [20-2319, 20-2587] [Entered: 05/18/2021 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docket(#13) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Haug Partners LLP, Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC and Shire PLC, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2907285] [20-2587] [Entered: 08/13/2020 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Haug Partners LLP, Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC and Shire PLC, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2907274] [20-2587] [Entered: 08/13/2020 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Haug Partners LLP, Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC and Shire PLC, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2907272] [20-2587] [Entered: 08/13/2020 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Haug Partners LLP, Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC and Shire PLC, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2907267] [20-2587] [Entered: 08/13/2020 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2902150] [20-2587] [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docket(#6) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Haug Partners LLP, Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC and Shire PLC, district court receipt # ANYSDC-20927767, FILED.[2902148] [20-2587] [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTE: See lead case, 20-2319, containing complete set of docket entries.[2902146] [20-2587] [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/22/2020, RECEIVED.[2902143] [20-2587] [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/13/2020, RECEIVED.[2902142] [20-2587] [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Haug Partners LLP, Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC and Shire PLC in 20-2587, FILED. [2902132] [20-2587, 20-2319] [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Foundation Law Group LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Shire Development LLC is a litigant