This case was last updated from PACER on 06/29/2019 at 06:09:07 (UTC).

Layne Lindberg, et al v. James Dimon, et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Layne Lindberg filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against James Dimon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1883

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Attorney David C. Piper

Dickinson, ND 58602-1097

US Bank National Association

Jay Bray, Chief Executive Officer & Chairman Nationstar Mortgage LLC, doing business as Mr. Cooper

Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, doing business as Mr. Cooper

Mr. James Dimon, Chairman and Executive Officer JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association

Andrew Cecere, President and Director US Bank National Association

JP Morgan Chase Bank

Plaintiff / Appellants

Barbara J. Lindberg

Rapid City, ND 57702

Layne A. Lindberg

Rapid City, ND 57702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David C. Piper

Attorney at MACKOFF & KELLOGG

38 Second Avenue, E., P.O. Box 1097

Dickinson, ND 58602-1097

Justin Donald Balser

Attorney at AKERMAN & SENTERFITT

Suite 500, 1400 Wewatta Street

Denver, CO 80202

Janelle G. Ewing

Attorney at SAYER LAW GROUP

925 E. Fourth Street

Waterloo, IA 50703

Cassidy M. Stalley

Attorney at LYNN & JACKSON

909 St. Joseph Street

Rapid City, SD 57701-3301

Jeffery D. Collins

Attorney at LYNN & JACKSON

909 St. Joseph Street

Rapid City, SD 57701-3301

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Barbara J. Lindberg

13035 Sonquist Lane

Rapid City, ND 57702

Layne A. Lindberg

13035 Sonquist Lane

Rapid City, ND 57702

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Justin D. Balser for Appellees Mr. Andrew Cecere, Mr. Jay Bray, US Bank National Association and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC w/service 05/02/2019 [4783731] [19-1883] (JDB) [Entered: 05/02/2019 10:12 AM]

Open Document #1

ProSe Docketing Letter

Open Document #1

Appellants' Brief

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Barbara J. Lindberg and Layne A. Lindberg due 06/10/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4782993] [19-1883] (CBO) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:54 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Jeffery D. Collins for Appellees James Dimon and JP Morgan Chase Bank w/service 05/08/2019 [4785691] [19-1883] (JDC) [Entered: 05/08/2019 03:48 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Cassidy M. Stalley for Appellees James Dimon and JP Morgan Chase Bank w/service 05/08/2019 [4785688] [19-1883] (CMS) [Entered: 05/08/2019 03:45 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to dismiss case, filed by Appellees James Dimon and JP Morgan Chase Bank w/service 06/27/2019. [4802785] [19-1883] (CMS) [Entered: 06/27/2019 04:40 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 4/25/2019, docket entries, order and amended order filed 3/27/2019, orders filed 3/25/2019, and report and recommendation filed 2/12/2019. [4782989] [19-1883] (CBO) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:51 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to dismiss case, filed by Appellees James Dimon and JP Morgan Chase Bank w/service 06/27/2019. [4802785] [19-1883] (CMS) [Entered: 06/27/2019 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • PUBLIC DOCKET NOTE: Correcting brief(s) due date for appellees. Brief(s) of appellees due on 07/11/2019.[4796427] [19-1883] (BNW) [Entered: 06/11/2019 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Barbara J. Lindberg and Mr. Layne A. Lindberg. w/service 06/11/2019 by USCA8, Length: 31 pages, Copies: 5 paper copies of brief. Brief(s) of Jay Bray, Andrew Cecere, James Dimon, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, David C. Piper and US Bank National Association due on 07/10/2019. [4796252] [19-1883] (BNW) [Entered: 06/11/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Jeffery D. Collins for Appellees James Dimon and JP Morgan Chase Bank w/service 05/08/2019 [4785691] [19-1883] (JDC) [Entered: 05/08/2019 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Cassidy M. Stalley for Appellees James Dimon and JP Morgan Chase Bank w/service 05/08/2019 [4785688] [19-1883] (CMS) [Entered: 05/08/2019 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • APPEARANCE filed by Cassidy M. Stalley for Appellee JP Morgan Chase Bank w/service 05/08/2019 [4785551] [19-1883] DOCUMENT LOCKED. COUNSEL WILL FILE CORRECTED APPEARANCE FORM.--[Edited 05/08/2019 by AMT] (CMS) [Entered: 05/08/2019 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • APPEARANCE filed by Jeffery D. Collins for Appellee JP Morgan Chase Bank w/service 05/08/2019 [4785423] [19-1883] DOCUMENT LOCKED. COUNSEL WILL FILE CORRECTED APPEARANCE FORM.--[Edited 05/08/2019 by AMT] (JDC) [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Justin D. Balser for Appellees Mr. Andrew Cecere, Mr. Jay Bray, US Bank National Association and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC w/service 05/02/2019 [4783731] [19-1883] (JDB) [Entered: 05/02/2019 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Barbara J. Lindberg and Layne A. Lindberg due 06/10/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4782993] [19-1883] (CBO) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 4/25/2019, docket entries, order and amended order filed 3/27/2019, orders filed 3/25/2019, and report and recommendation filed 2/12/2019. [4782989] [19-1883] (CBO) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4782974] [19-1883] (CBO) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.