This case was last updated from PACER on 03/19/2019 at 06:06:18 (UTC).

Lawrence Youngberg v. T. J. Watson

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 Lawrence Youngberg filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against T J Watson. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1140

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

T. J. WATSON, Warden

Petitioner / Appellant

LAWRENCE M. YOUNGBERG

Terre Haute, IN 47808-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Brian L. Reitz

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

Ten W. Market Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204-3048

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Lawrence M. Youngberg

Attorney at UNITED STATES PENITENTIARY

P.O. Box 33

Terre Haute, IN 47808-0000

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Lawrence M. Youngberg. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [6982027] [19-1140] (FP) [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:29 PM]

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Federal Habeas Corpus Case

3 #1

C.R. 3(b) Fee Notice

3 #2

D.C. notice denying IFP filed

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #4

Fee Notice

#4

(#4) ORDER: Appellant Lawrence Youngberg shall have thirty days from the date at the top of this order to file a memorandum explaining why this court should not summarily affirm the district court's judgment. Briefing in this case is otherwise suspended pending further order of the court. MPB [4] [6987669] [19-1140] (CAG) [Entered: 02/28/2019 10:42 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Appellant Lawrence Youngberg shall have thirty days from the date at the top of this order to file a memorandum explaining why this court should not summarily affirm the district court's judgment. Briefing in this case is otherwise suspended pending further order of the court. MPB [4] [6987669] [19-1140] (CAG) [Entered: 02/28/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed District Court order DENYING leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 02/08/2019. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 03/11/2019 for Appellant Lawrence M. Youngberg. [6983272] [3] [6983272] [19-1140] (MM) [Entered: 02/08/2019 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Lawrence M. Youngberg. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [6982027] [19-1140] (FP) [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Federal prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Lawrence M. Youngberg by 01/24/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 02/01/2019. Fee or IFP forms due on 02/01/2019 for Appellant Lawrence M. Youngberg. [1] [6979015] [19-1140] (PS) [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.