This case was last updated from PACER on 03/10/2020 at 06:08:29 (UTC).

Lawrence Salisbury v. City of Santa Monica, et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 Lawrence Salisbury filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against City of Santa Monica. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55039

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

CHUCK POLSON

REAL ESTATE CONSULTING AND SERVICES, INC.

BIRTCHER ANDERSON REALTY MANAGEMENT, INC.

CARITAS ACQUISITIONS V, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

LAWRENCE SALISBURY

Defendant / Appellee

CITY OF SANTA MONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Frances M. Campbell

Attorney at CAMPBELL & FARAHANI, LLP.

15233 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 408

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Nima Farahani Esquire

Attorney at CAMPBELL & FARAHANI, LLP.

15233 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 408

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Michelle M. Hugard

Attorney at Santa Monica City Attorney's Office

1685 Main Street

Santa Monica, CA 90401

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Further Conference w/ counsel for appellant only, 02/20/2020, 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11596900] (CL) [Entered: 02/13/2020 02:58 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/13/2020, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11580190] (CL) [Entered: 01/30/2020 05:08 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Lawrence Salisbury Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/17/2020. [11566343] [20-55039] (Campbell, Frances) [Entered: 01/17/2020 01:33 PM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Further Conference w/ counsel for appellant only, 02/20/2020, 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11596900] (CL) [Entered: 02/13/2020 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/13/2020, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11580190] (CL) [Entered: 01/30/2020 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/17/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11566942]. [20-55039] (AD) [Entered: 01/17/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Lawrence Salisbury Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/17/2020. [11566343] [20-55039] (Campbell, Frances) [Entered: 01/17/2020 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Lawrence Salisbury Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/17/2020. Transcript ordered by 02/10/2020. Transcript due 03/09/2020. Appellant Lawrence Salisbury opening brief due 04/20/2020. Appellee City of Santa Monica answering brief due 05/20/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11558288] (RT) [Entered: 01/10/2020 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Real Estate Consulting and Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BIRTCHER ANDERSON REALTY MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CARITAS ACQUISITIONS I LLC DBA BRIERWOOD MOBILE HOME PARK is a litigant