This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/03/2019 at 06:04:07 (UTC).

Lawrence Molder v. BNSF

Case Summary

On 09/04/2019 Lawrence Molder filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against BNSF. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-35751

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

BURLINGTON NORTHERN SANTA FE RAILWAY COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellant

LAWRENCE DARREN MOLDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kelsey Endres

Attorney at Montgomery Scarp, PLLC

1218 3Rd Avenue, Seattle Tower, Suite 2500

Seattle, WA 98101

Michael Chait

Attorney at Montgomery Scarp, PLLC

1218 3Rd Avenue, Seattle Tower, Suite 2500

Seattle, WA 98101

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Joseph Andrew Grube

Attorney at Breneman Grube Orehoski, PLLC

1200 5Th Avenue, Suite 625

Seattle, WA 98101

Nicholas Thompson Esquire

Attorney at The Moody Law Firm

500 Crawford Street, Suite 200

Portsmouth, VA 23705

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/04/2019, Appellant to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss, or contact the circuit mediator. See order for details. [11471576] (LW) [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:15 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 10/08/2019, 2:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11429561] (LW) [Entered: 09/12/2019 12:03 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Lawrence Darren Molder Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/10/2019. [11426654] [19-35751] (Thompson, Nicholas) [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:31 AM]

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Counsel Case Opening Packet

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/04/2019, Appellant to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss, or contact the circuit mediator. See order for details. [11471576] (LW) [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 10/08/2019, 2:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11429561] (LW) [Entered: 09/12/2019 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/10/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11426782][19-35751] (AD) [Entered: 09/10/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Lawrence Darren Molder Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/10/2019. [11426654] [19-35751] (Thompson, Nicholas) [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/11/2019. Transcript ordered by 10/03/2019. Transcript due 11/04/2019. Appellant Lawrence Darren Molder opening brief due 12/12/2019. Appellee Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company answering brief due 01/13/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11420012] (JPD) [Entered: 09/04/2019 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BNSF Railway Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Thompson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Andrew Grube