This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/09/2022 at 06:09:35 (UTC).

In re: Law Offices of Ben C. Martin v. Babbitt & Johnson PA, et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 In re Law Offices of Ben C Martin filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Babbitt Johnson PA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-15872

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DORIS JONES

Appellees

BABBITT & JOHNSON PA

BARON & BUD, PC

COMMON BENEFIT FEE AND COST COMMITTEE

BEUS GILBERT MCGRODER PLLC

BOSSIER & ASSOCIATES PLLC

BRANCH LAW FIRM

BRENES LAW GROUP, P.C

DALIMONTE RUEB STOLLER LLP

FARACI LANGE LLP

FARRIS RILEY & PITT LLP

FEARS NACHAWATI PLLC

FREESE & GOSS PLLC

GALLAGHER & KENNEDY PA

GOLDENBERG LAW PLLC

HAUSFELD LLP

HEAVISIDE REED ZAIC

LEVIN PAPANTONIO THOMAS MITCHELL RAFFERTY & PROCTOR PA

LIEFF CABRASER HEIMANN & BERNSTEIN LLP

Not Classified By Court

In re: BARD IVC FILTERS PRODUCT LIABILITY LITIGATION

165 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

Joseph R. Johnson

Attorney at Babbitt & Johnson PA

1641 Worthington Road, Suite 100

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

Russell W. Budd

Attorney at Baron & Budd, P.C.

3102 Oak Lawn Avenue, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75219

Roland Karim Tellis Esquire

Attorney at Baron & Budd, PC

15910 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 1600

Encino, CA 91436

Wendy Ruth Fleishman Esquire I

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

250 Hudson Street

New York, NY 10013

Mark O'Connor

Attorney at Beus Gilbert, PLLC

701 N 44Th Street

Phoenix, AZ 85008-6504

Sheila M. Bossier

Attorney at Bossier & Associates, PLLC

1520 N State Street

Jackson, MS 39202

Margaret Moses Branch

2025 Rio Grande Blvd. Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87104

Troy Brenes

Attorney at Brenes Law Group

100 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 330

Irvine, CA 92618

Paul L. Stoller Esquire

2425 E Camelback Road, Suite 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Hadley L. Matarazzo

28 E Main St., Suite 1100

Rochester, NY 14614

Calle M. Mendenhall

505 20Th St. N, Suite 1700

Burmingham, AL 35203

Arati C. Furness

5489 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Richard Arthur Freese

3500 Maple Ave, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75219

Shannon Clark

Attorney at Gallagher & Kennedy, P.A.

2575 East Camelback Road, Suite 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Marlene J. Goldenberg

Attorney at Goldenberg Law PLLC

800 Lasalle Avenue

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Richard S. Lewis

Attorney at Hausfeld LLP

888 16Th Street Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20006

Julia Reed Zaic

Attorney at Julia Reed Zaic, ESQ.

4695 Macarthur Court, Suite 1100

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Matthew D. Schultz

Attorney at Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien, Barr & Mougey, PA

316 S Baylen Street, Suite 600

Pensacola, FL 32502

Other Attorneys

Amorina Patrice Lopez Esquire

Attorney at Lopez McHugh, LLP

120 Vantis Drive, Suite 430

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

David Paul Matthews

Attorney at Matthews & Associates

2905 Sackett Street

Houston, TX 77098

12 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #5

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #6

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Law Offices of Ben C. Martin and Martin Baughman PLLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/17/2022. [12474237] [22-15872] (Bashman, Howard) [Entered: 06/17/2022 01:27 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellee Common Benefit Fee and Cost Committee Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/23/2022. [12478776] [22-15872] (Clark, Shannon) [Entered: 06/23/2022 04:10 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 07/13/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12482631] (VS) [Entered: 06/29/2022 08:36 AM]

#7

(#7) Mail returned on 07/06/2022 addressed to Joseph R. Johnson for Babbitt & Johnson PA, re: [ # 6 ] Mediation Questionnaire (P) Order. Returned envelope notes: forward time exp, rtn to sender, Babbitt & Johnson, PO Box 222881, West Palm Beach, FL 33422-2881. Resending to: case files; counsel has registered for CM/ECF. [12490845] (LA) [Entered: 07/11/2022 01:39 PM]

#8

(#8) Mail returned on 07/07/2022 addressed to Robert Dale Role for Watkins Lourie Roll & Chance PC, re: [ # 6 ] Mediation Questionnaire (P) Order. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. Resending to: counsel via CM/ECF. [12490919] (LA) [Entered: 07/11/2022 02:08 PM]

#10

(#10) Mail returned on 07/08/2022 addressed to Joseph R. Johnson for Babbitt & Johnson PA, re: [ # 1 ] Case Opening Documents. Returned envelope notes: forward time exp, rtn to sender, Babbitt & Johnson, PO Box 222881, West Palm Beach, FL 33422-2881. Resending to: case files; counsel has registered for CM/ECF. [12492820] (LA) [Entered: 07/13/2022 11:52 AM]

#11

(#11) Mail returned on 07/08/2022 addressed to Mr. Joseph Osborne for Babbitt Johnson Osborne & LeClainche PA, re: [ # 1 ] Case Opening Documents. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. Resending to: case files; counsel has registered for CM/ECF. [12492823] (LA) [Entered: 07/13/2022 11:53 AM]

#14

(#14) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12495996] (VS) [Entered: 07/18/2022 11:42 AM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • Docket(#18) Entered appearance of - Christian Mottas, Christiana Care Health Services, Inc., Christiana Care Health Systems, Inc., Thomas Bauer, Cynthia Heldt, California Pacific Medical Center, Lawrence L. Schmetterer, Regents of the University of California, Bard Medical Division, McKesson Corporation, Paul M. Kiproff, Raymond L. Benza, Allegheny General Hospital, Neometrics, Inc., Westchester County Medical Center, Kenneth Collins, James H. Dyer Jr., James W. McLeod Jr. and Damon Page. [12501814] (RT) [Entered: 07/25/2022 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • Docket(#17) Entered appearance of - Regina Kinney, James Kinney, Marie Dolan, Cynthia Bruhn, Rick Reed, Phillip Batchelder, Kim Batchelder, Michelle R. Layman-Hanes, Michael King, Wilford L. Edwards, Karen S. Thomas, Debbie Anderson, Vivian Baldwin, Anders Linster, Denise Gill, Mark Seaman, Dona Seaman, Paula Peters, Brett Waliczek, Elizabeth Waliczek, April Buracker, Maygret Wood, John Bradshaw Wood III, Jamie M. Barrow and Tammy Hesser-Schluter. [12500658] (RT) [Entered: 07/24/2022 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • Docket(#16) Entered appearance of - Michelle Mercurio, Claudette Y. Mears, Lisa Smullen, Angela Voigt, Pharris Morgan, Billy C. Morgan Jr., Denise O'Neill, Tamika Williams, Myra Edwards, Catherine Rowden, Mary Duffie, James Duffie, Kevin Gross, Jennifer Campbell Tate, William Owens Jr., Sheila Middleton, Dean Becker, Cheryl Rouse, Karen Brown, Norma J. Dukett, Michael Callahan, Priscilla Callahan, Joanna Darwactor, Donald E. Yates, Joy E. Yates, Tammy Lynn Hillsburg, Christine Lorthe, Audrey R. Keegan, Kendrick Taylor, Debra P. Rodrigue, Mark A. Rodrigue, Priscilla Eaker, Thomas Eaker, Nannette Smith, Patricia Jones, Tommy Lee Beal, Jennifer Shropshire, Gary Leigh Piazza, Freedom Zybert, Alec Caldwell, Robert G. Harbridge, Michael Gill, Lynn Ann Agnew, James Edward Agnew and Linda Lue King. [12500657] (RT) [Entered: 07/24/2022 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • Docket(#15) Entered appearance of - George Leus, Gary Milton, Denise Ocasio, Carmelo Ocasio, Casey Wyatt, Lessie Tillman, Carol Kruse, David L. Sizemore, Albert Miller, Joseph Rowe, Tonya Munson, Alice Jackson, Anthony Jackson, Angela M. Henley, Humana Insurance Company, Marcia Roeder, Dawn Merritt, Debra Branch, Juanita C. Graham, Charles Conn, Alyssa Conn, Mary Jo Anderson, Melissa Ebert, Vicki Wetzel, Harry Keen III, Homer W. McClarty, Vicki Rivera, Brittany Ann Hough, Jason Hough, Pamela B. Cason, Susan Fox, Jason Pickard, Jessica Deserio-Mintz, Robert Mintz, Jennifer R. Coker, Joel A. Coker, Pamela Noterman, Heather Blacketer, Christopher Cronan, Shannon Cronan-Castellanoes, Melonee Murray, John Murray, Thomas Fregeau, Maureen Fregeau, Sandra Scott, Debra Green, Luis Castillo, Clifford Geter, Debra Castellano, Jessica Parker, David Shackleford, Erin Smith, Ernest Winland, Carol Jo Winland, Lisa Schweska, Daniel P. Schweska, Donald Epps, Robert Peery, Emily Landress, Joji Takada and John Noonan. [12500656] (RT) [Entered: 07/24/2022 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12495996] (VS) [Entered: 07/18/2022 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Docket(#13) Attorney Arati C. Furness in 22-15872 substituted by Attorney Sherri Ann Saucer in 22-15872 [12494960] (QDL) [Entered: 07/15/2022 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sherri Ann Saucer (Fears Nachawati, PLLC, 5489 Blair Rd, Dallas, TX 75231) for Appellee Fears Nachawati PLLC. Substitution for Attorney Arati C. Furness for Appellee Fears Nachawati PLLC. Date of service: 07/15/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12494957] [22-15872] (Saucer, Sherri) [Entered: 07/15/2022 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Mail returned on 07/08/2022 addressed to Mr. Joseph Osborne for Babbitt Johnson Osborne & LeClainche PA, re: [ # 1 ] Case Opening Documents. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. Resending to: case files; counsel has registered for CM/ECF. [12492823] (LA) [Entered: 07/13/2022 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Mail returned on 07/08/2022 addressed to Joseph R. Johnson for Babbitt & Johnson PA, re: [ # 1 ] Case Opening Documents. Returned envelope notes: forward time exp, rtn to sender, Babbitt & Johnson, PO Box 222881, West Palm Beach, FL 33422-2881. Resending to: case files; counsel has registered for CM/ECF. [12492820] (LA) [Entered: 07/13/2022 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • Docket(#9) Attorney Robert Dale Role in 22-15872 substituted by Attorney Robert D. Roll in 22-15872 (to correct counsel's appearance on docket) [12490923] (LA) [Entered: 07/11/2022 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Mail returned on 07/07/2022 addressed to Robert Dale Role for Watkins Lourie Roll & Chance PC, re: [ # 6 ] Mediation Questionnaire (P) Order. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. Resending to: counsel via CM/ECF. [12490919] (LA) [Entered: 07/11/2022 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Mail returned on 07/06/2022 addressed to Joseph R. Johnson for Babbitt & Johnson PA, re: [ # 6 ] Mediation Questionnaire (P) Order. Returned envelope notes: forward time exp, rtn to sender, Babbitt & Johnson, PO Box 222881, West Palm Beach, FL 33422-2881. Resending to: case files; counsel has registered for CM/ECF. [12490845] (LA) [Entered: 07/11/2022 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 07/13/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12482631] (VS) [Entered: 06/29/2022 08:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/23/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12478893]. [22-15872] (AD) [Entered: 06/23/2022 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellee Common Benefit Fee and Cost Committee Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/23/2022. [12478776] [22-15872] (Clark, Shannon) [Entered: 06/23/2022 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/17/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12474752]. [22-15872] (AD) [Entered: 06/17/2022 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Law Offices of Ben C. Martin and Martin Baughman PLLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/17/2022. [12474237] [22-15872] (Bashman, Howard) [Entered: 06/17/2022 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Law Offices of Ben C. Martin and Martin Baughman PLLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/17/2022. Transcript ordered by 07/08/2022. Transcript due 08/08/2022. Appellants Law Offices of Ben C. Martin and Martin Baughman PLLC opening brief due 09/15/2022. Appellees Babbitt & Johnson PA, Babbitt Johnson Osborne & LeClainche PA, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., Baron & Bud, PC, Beus Gilbert McGroder PLLC, Bossier & Associates PLLC, Branch Law Firm, Brenes Law Group, P.C, C. R. Bard, Inc., Common Benefit Fee and Cost Committee, Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP, Faraci Lange LLP, Farris Riley & Pitt LLP, Fears Nachawati PLLC, Freese & Goss PLLC, Gallagher & Kennedy PA, Gallagher Law Firm, Goldenberg Law PLLC, Hausfeld LLP, Heaviside Reed Zaic, Levin Papantonio Thomas MItchell Rafferty & Proctor PA, Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP, Lopez McHugh LLP, Matthews & Associates, Motley Rice LLC, Nations Law Firm, Provost & Umphrey Law Firm LLP, TorHoerman Law LLC, Wagstaff & Cartmell LLP, Walkup Melodia Kelly & Schoenberger and Watkins Lourie Roll & Chance PC answering brief due 10/17/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12468845] (RT) [Entered: 06/10/2022 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEARS/NACHAWATI, PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Blanch Law Firm is a litigant

Latest cases where LIEFF CABRASER HEIMANN & BERNSTEIN, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amorina Patrice Lopez