This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/28/2022 at 06:08:31 (UTC).

Lauren Souter v. Edgewell Personal Care Company, et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 Lauren Souter filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Edgewell Personal Care Company,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-55898

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

LAUREN SOUTER, individually, and on behalf of others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellees

EDGEWELL PERSONAL CARE COMPANY

EDGEWELL PERSONAL CARE BRANDS, LLC

EDGEWELL PERSONAL CARE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Naomi B. Spector

Attorney at KamberLaw, LLP

1501 San Elijo Hills Road, S, Suite 104-212

San Marcos, CA 92078

Scott A. Kamber

Attorney at KamberLaw

201 Milwaukee Street, Suite 200

Denver, CO 80246

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel Eaton Esquire

Attorney at Seltzer Caplan McMahon Vitek

750 B Street, Suite 2100

San Diego, CA 92101

John W. Moticka

Attorney at Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP

7700 Forsyth Boulevard

St. Louis, MO 63105

James Emmett Logan

Attorney at Stinson, LLP

1201 Walnut Street, Suite 2900

Kansas City, MO 64106

Megan McCurdy

Attorney at Stinson, LLP

1201 Walnut Street, Suite 2900

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#8

(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant Lauren Souter Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/06/2022. [12557561] [22-55898] (Spector, Naomi) [Entered: 10/06/2022 01:55 PM]

#12

(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellees Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company and Edgewell Personal Care, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/07/2022. [12558100] [22-55898] (Logan, James) [Entered: 10/07/2022 08:38 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • Docket(#13) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/07/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12558497]. [22-55898] (AD) [Entered: 10/07/2022 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellees Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company and Edgewell Personal Care, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/07/2022. [12558100] [22-55898] (Logan, James) [Entered: 10/07/2022 08:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Docket(#11) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/06/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12557977]. [22-55898] (AD) [Entered: 10/06/2022 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Docket(#10) Added Attorney(s) Scott A. Kamber for party(s) Appellant Lauren Souter, in case 22-55898. [12557601] (NAC) [Entered: 10/06/2022 02:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Scott A. Kamber (KamberLaw LLC, 201 Milwaukee Street, Suite 200, Denver, CO 80206) for Appellant Lauren Souter. Date of service: 10/06/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12557570] [22-55898] (Kamber, Scott) [Entered: 10/06/2022 02:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant Lauren Souter Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/06/2022. [12557561] [22-55898] (Spector, Naomi) [Entered: 10/06/2022 01:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Naomi B. Spector for party(s) Appellant Lauren Souter, in case 22-55898. [12557553] (NAC) [Entered: 10/06/2022 01:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Naomi B. Spector (KamberLaw LLP, 1501 San Elijo Hills Road South, Suite 104-212, San Marcos, CA 92078) for Appellant Lauren Souter. Date of service: 10/06/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12557531] [22-55898] (Spector, Naomi) [Entered: 10/06/2022 01:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Megan McCurdy for party(s) Appellee Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC Appellee Edgewell Personal Care Company Appellee Edgewell Personal Care, LLC, in case 22-55898. [12557429] (NAC) [Entered: 10/06/2022 12:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Megan Anne McCurdy (Stinson LLP, 1201 Walnut St., Suite 2900, Kansas City, MO 64106) for Appellees Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company and Edgewell Personal Care, LLC. Date of service: 10/06/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12557411] [22-55898] (McCurdy, Megan) [Entered: 10/06/2022 12:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) James Emmett Logan for party(s) Appellee Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC Appellee Edgewell Personal Care Company Appellee Edgewell Personal Care, LLC, in case 22-55898. [12556492] (NAC) [Entered: 10/05/2022 12:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of James Emmett Logan (Stinson LLP, 1201 Walnut Street, Suite 2900, Kansas City, MO 64106) for Appellees Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company and Edgewell Personal Care, LLC. Date of service: 10/05/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12556443] [22-55898] (Logan, James) [Entered: 10/05/2022 11:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Lauren Souter Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/06/2022. Transcript ordered by 10/27/2022. Transcript due 11/28/2022. Appellant Lauren Souter opening brief due 01/05/2023. Appellees Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company and Edgewell Personal Care, LLC answering brief due 02/06/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12552293] (JBS) [Entered: 09/29/2022 11:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDGEWELL PERSONAL CARE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Emmett Logan(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John W. Moticka