This case was last updated from PACER on 10/10/2020 at 06:10:41 (UTC).

Laura McConnell, et al v. Johnson & Johnson Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 Laura McConnell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Johnson Johnson Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2582

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Plaintiff / Appellee

CHRISTINA AHEARN

Defendant / Appellees

JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC

PTI UNION LLC, DBA Pharma Tech Industries

PTI ROYSTON LLC, DBA Pharma Tech Industries

IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC, FKA Luzenac America Inc

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC, formerly known as Johnson & Johnson Consumer Compaines, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellant

LAURA MCCONNELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant, Plaintiff and Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

William W. Blair Esq.

Attorney at OnderLaw

110 East Lockwood Avenue, 2Nd Floor

St. Louis, MO 63119

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Scott A. James Esq.

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon

600 Travis Street, Jpmorgan Chase Tower, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002

Susan M. Sharko Esq.

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Jessica D. Miller Esq.

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom

1440 New York Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Chanda A. Miller Esq.

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath

One Logan Square, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Janet L. Poletto Esq.

Attorney at Hardin Kundla McKeon & Poletto

673 Morris Avenue

Springfield, NJ 07081

Caroline Tinsley Esq.

Attorney at Tucker Ellis

100 South 4Th Street, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63102

Mark K. Silver Esq.

Attorney at Coughlin Duffy

350 Mount Kemble Avenue, P.O. Box 1917

Morristown, NJ 07962

Mark A. Prost Esq.

Attorney at Sandberg Phoenix & Von Gontard

515 North Sixth Street, One City Centre, 15Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

21 #2

Certificate of Service

21 #1

Appearance Form

#26

(#26) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mark A. Prost, Esq. for Imerys TALC America Inc and Mark K. Silver, Esq. for Imerys TALC America Inc in 20-2575 requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 09/24/2020. Disclosure Statement on or before 09/24/2020. [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583] (LMR) [Entered: 09/10/2020 02:03 PM]

#25

(#25) ECF FILER: Response to Clerk's August 11, 2020 Order regarding appealability filed by Appellants. Certificate of Service dated 09/01/2020 by ECF. [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583] (WWB) [Entered: 09/01/2020 05:05 PM]

#24

(#24) ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion for an extension of time is granted. Appellants' response to the Clerk's August 11, 2020 Order regarding appealability must be filed on or before September 1, 2020. [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583] (LMR) [Entered: 09/01/2020 02:42 PM]

#23

(#23) ECF FILER: Reply by Appellants to Response to motion. Certificate of Service dated 08/27/2020. Service made by ECF [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583]--[Edited 08/28/2020 by LMR] (WWB) [Entered: 08/27/2020 11:55 PM]

#22

(#22) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc and Johnson & Johnson Inc to motion for extension of time. Certificate of Service dated 08/27/2020. [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583]--[Edited 08/27/2020 by LMR] (CAM) [Entered: 08/27/2020 12:04 PM]

#20

(#20) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mark A. Prost, Esq. and Mark K. Silver, Esq. for Imerys TALC America Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form and Disclosure Statement on or before 09/09/2020. [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583] (CJG) [Entered: 08/26/2020 10:01 AM]

#19

(#19) ECF FILER: Joint Motion filed by Appellants for Seven (7) Day Extension of Time to file Response to Clerk's August 11, 2020 Order regarding Appealability until 9/1/2020. Certificate of Service dated 08/25/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583]--[Edited 08/26/2020 by CJG] (WWB) [Entered: 08/25/2020 11:18 PM]

#4

(#4) ORDER (Clerk) for all appellee parties represented by William W. Blair, Esq. the designated filer shall be Christina Ahearn. (LMR) [Entered: 08/11/2020 12:30 PM]

#3

(#3) ORDER (Clerk) for all appellant parties represented by William W. Blair, Esq. the designated filer shall be Laura McConnell. (LMR) [Entered: 08/11/2020 12:28 PM]

1 #5

OPINION

1 #4

ORDER

1 #3

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Case Caption

#1

Case Opening Letter

#6

(#6) ORDER (Clerk) In the above-captioned appeals, some plaintiffs seek review of an order that, instead of remanding their claims back to state court, dismissed some claims and directed that others be refiled in individual federal complaints. Because this order did not resolve all of the plaintiffs' claims, it may not be an appealable final decision[] under 28 U.S.C. 1291 or otherwise appealable. See, e.g., N.J. Dep't of Treasury, Div. of Inv. v. Fuld, 604 F.3d 816, 81924 (3d Cir. 2010); In re Diet Drugs Prods. Liab. Litig., 418 F.3d 372, 37578 (3d Cir. 2005). All parties must file written responses addressing this issue within fourteen days of this order. Parties who are jointly represented must file a joint response addressing all appeals together. [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583] (LMR) [Entered: 08/11/2020 03:04 PM]

#5

(#5) CLERK ORDER The above-captioned appeals are hereby consolidated for the purposes of scheduling, the joint appendix, and disposition. Appellants are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. They may file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). Appellees may elect to file a consolidated brief. [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583] (LMR) [Entered: 08/11/2020 02:59 PM]

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mark A. Prost, Esq. for Imerys TALC America Inc and Mark K. Silver, Esq. for Imerys TALC America Inc in 20-2575 requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 09/24/2020. Disclosure Statement on or before 09/24/2020. [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583] (LMR) [Entered: 09/10/2020 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ECF FILER: Response to Clerk's August 11, 2020 Order regarding appealability filed by Appellants. Certificate of Service dated 09/01/2020 by ECF. [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583] (WWB) [Entered: 09/01/2020 05:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion for an extension of time is granted. Appellants' response to the Clerk's August 11, 2020 Order regarding appealability must be filed on or before September 1, 2020. [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583] (LMR) [Entered: 09/01/2020 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ECF FILER: Reply by Appellants to Response to motion. Certificate of Service dated 08/27/2020. Service made by ECF [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583]--[Edited 08/28/2020 by LMR] (WWB) [Entered: 08/27/2020 11:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc and Johnson & Johnson Inc to motion for extension of time. Certificate of Service dated 08/27/2020. [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583]--[Edited 08/27/2020 by LMR] (CAM) [Entered: 08/27/2020 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Janet L. Poletto on behalf of Appellee(s) PTI Royston, LLC and PTI Union, LLC. [20-2582] (JLP) [Entered: 08/26/2020 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mark A. Prost, Esq. and Mark K. Silver, Esq. for Imerys TALC America Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form and Disclosure Statement on or before 09/09/2020. [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583] (CJG) [Entered: 08/26/2020 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ECF FILER: Joint Motion filed by Appellants for Seven (7) Day Extension of Time to file Response to Clerk's August 11, 2020 Order regarding Appealability until 9/1/2020. Certificate of Service dated 08/25/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583]--[Edited 08/26/2020 by CJG] (WWB) [Entered: 08/25/2020 11:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Laura McConnell advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-2582] (WWB) [Entered: 08/25/2020 07:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Laura McConnell. [20-2582] (WWB) [Entered: 08/25/2020 07:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Caroline M. Tinsley on behalf of Appellee(s) PTI Royston, LLC and PTI Union, LLC. [20-2582] (CT) [Entered: 08/20/2020 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jessica Davidson Miller on behalf of Appellee(s) Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. [20-2582] (JDM) [Entered: 08/18/2020 05:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc and Johnson & Johnson Inc. [20-2582] (CAM) [Entered: 08/18/2020 05:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Chanda A. Miller on behalf of Appellee(s) Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. [20-2582] (CAM) [Entered: 08/18/2020 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER (Clerk) In the above-captioned appeals, some plaintiffs seek review of an order that, instead of remanding their claims back to state court, dismissed some claims and directed that others be refiled in individual federal complaints. Because this order did not resolve all of the plaintiffs' claims, it may not be an appealable final decision[] under 28 U.S.C. 1291 or otherwise appealable. See, e.g., N.J. Dep't of Treasury, Div. of Inv. v. Fuld, 604 F.3d 816, 81924 (3d Cir. 2010); In re Diet Drugs Prods. Liab. Litig., 418 F.3d 372, 37578 (3d Cir. 2005). All parties must file written responses addressing this issue within fourteen days of this order. Parties who are jointly represented must file a joint response addressing all appeals together. [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583] (LMR) [Entered: 08/11/2020 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK ORDER The above-captioned appeals are hereby consolidated for the purposes of scheduling, the joint appendix, and disposition. Appellants are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. They may file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). Appellees may elect to file a consolidated brief. [20-2575, 20-2576, 20-2577, 20-2578, 20-2579, 20-2580, 20-2581, 20-2582, 20-2583] (LMR) [Entered: 08/11/2020 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER (Clerk) for all appellee parties represented by William W. Blair, Esq. the designated filer shall be Christina Ahearn. (LMR) [Entered: 08/11/2020 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Clerk) for all appellant parties represented by William W. Blair, Esq. the designated filer shall be Laura McConnell. (LMR) [Entered: 08/11/2020 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 08/11/2020 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Laura McConnell in District Court No. 3-19-cv-09365. (LMR) [Entered: 08/11/2020 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PTI UNION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC") is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant