This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/25/2022 at 06:12:56 (UTC).

Latifa Khan v. Riverside Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 Latifa Khan filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Riverside Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-55715

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

LATIFA KHAN, Individually and as heir and Successor in Interest to Nafiu Khan, Deceased

Defendant / Appellants

RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE AND WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC, DBA Alta Vista Healthcare and Wellness Centre

CITRUS WELLNESS CENTER, LLC

ENSEMBLE HEALTHCARE, LLC

PACIFIC WELLNESS GP, LLC

PACIFIC REHABILITATION AND WELLNESS CENTRE, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Dawn Smith

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

David Zarmi

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Citrus Wellness Center, LLC, Ensemble Healthcare, LLC, Pacific Rehabilitation and Wellness Centre, LP, Pacific Wellness GP, LLC and Riverside Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/27/2022. [12503869] [22-55715] (Zarmi, David) [Entered: 07/27/2022 06:01 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/17/2022, 1:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12504325] (CL) [Entered: 07/28/2022 01:46 PM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12520133] (CL) [Entered: 08/18/2022 01:49 PM]

 

Docket Entries

08/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12520133] (CL) [Entered: 08/18/2022 01:49 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/17/2022, 1:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12504325] (CL) [Entered: 07/28/2022 01:46 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022

Docket(#5) Streamlined request [3] by Appellants Citrus Wellness Center, LLC, Ensemble Healthcare, LLC, Pacific Rehabilitation and Wellness Centre, LP, Pacific Wellness GP, LLC and Riverside Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Citrus Wellness Center, LLC, Ensemble Healthcare, LLC, Pacific Rehabilitation and Wellness Centre, LP, Pacific Wellness GP, LLC and Riverside Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC opening brief due 10/26/2022. Appellee Latifa Khan answering brief due 11/25/2022. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12504277] (DLM) [Entered: 07/28/2022 01:16 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022

Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/27/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12503880]. [22-55715] (AD) [Entered: 07/27/2022 06:44 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022

Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Citrus Wellness Center, LLC, Ensemble Healthcare, LLC, Pacific Rehabilitation and Wellness Centre, LP, Pacific Wellness GP, LLC and Riverside Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC. New requested due date is 10/26/2022. [12503870] [22-55715] (Zarmi, David) [Entered: 07/27/2022 06:04 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Citrus Wellness Center, LLC, Ensemble Healthcare, LLC, Pacific Rehabilitation and Wellness Centre, LP, Pacific Wellness GP, LLC and Riverside Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/27/2022. [12503869] [22-55715] (Zarmi, David) [Entered: 07/27/2022 06:01 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Citrus Wellness Center, LLC, Ensemble Healthcare, LLC, Pacific Rehabilitation and Wellness Centre, LP, Pacific Wellness GP, LLC and Riverside Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/03/2022. Appellants Citrus Wellness Center, LLC, Ensemble Healthcare, LLC, Pacific Rehabilitation and Wellness Centre, LP, Pacific Wellness GP, LLC and Riverside Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC opening brief due 09/26/2022. Appellee Latifa Khan answering brief due 10/26/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12503544] (JBS) [Entered: 07/27/2022 01:47 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less