This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:03:41 (UTC).

Laterryl Saddler, et al v. PNC Bank, National Association

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Laterryl Saddler filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PNC Bank, National Association. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2472

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

United States Arbitration & Mediation Midwest, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellants

Laterryl Saddler

Saint Louis, MO 63113

Saddler Residential Care Facility, Inc.

Defendant / Appellee

PNC Bank, National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Laterryl Saddler

4937 Lotus Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63113

Charles Edward Kirksey Jr.

Attorney at BELL & KIRKSEY

Suite 1 West, 7382 Pershing

Saint Louis, MO 63130

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sally Sinclair Perez

Attorney at JENKINS & KLING

Suite 400, 150 N. Meramec Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63105-0000

Andrew Edwin Kaiser

Attorney at JENKINS & KLING

Suite 400, 150 N. Meramec Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63105-0000

Michael P. Stephens

Attorney at JENKINS & KLING

Suite 400, 150 N. Meramec Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63105-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:vacating this court's order, clerk order pay docketing fee, Doc No. [ # 4808279-2 ]. [4812897] [19-2472] (RLS) [Entered: 07/29/2019 09:42 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 08/05/2019, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [4808279] [19-2472] (RLS) [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:28 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Sally Sinclair Perez for Appellee PNC Bank, National Association w/service 07/16/2019 [4808564] [19-2472] (SSP) [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:32 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4808175] [19-2472] (RLS) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:42 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, orders dated 06/11/2019,07/11/2019, 07/12/2019, judgment dated 06/11/2019[4808193] [19-2472] (RLS) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:00 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee PNC Bank, National Association. - FOR CAL [4827198] [19-2472] (SSP) [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:01 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Michael P. Stephens for Appellee PNC Bank, National Association w/service 09/05/2019 [4827194] [19-2472] (MPS) [Entered: 09/05/2019 11:58 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:APPELLANT has failed to pay to the Clerk of the District Court the requisite docketing fees. APPELLANT is directed to show cause within 14 days why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response of Laterryl Saddler and Saddler Residential Care Facility, Inc. due 09/17/2019 [4826096] [19-2472] (RLS) [Entered: 09/03/2019 12:23 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 08/20/2019, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4810984] [19-2472] (RLS) [Entered: 07/23/2019 01:39 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee PNC Bank, National Association. - FOR CAL [4827198] [19-2472] (SSP) [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Michael P. Stephens for Appellee PNC Bank, National Association w/service 09/05/2019 [4827194] [19-2472] (MPS) [Entered: 09/05/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:APPELLANT has failed to pay to the Clerk of the District Court the requisite docketing fees. APPELLANT is directed to show cause within 14 days why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response of Laterryl Saddler and Saddler Residential Care Facility, Inc. due 09/17/2019 [4826096] [19-2472] (RLS) [Entered: 09/03/2019 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:vacating this court's order, clerk order pay docketing fee, Doc No. [ # 4808279-2 ]. [4812897] [19-2472] (RLS) [Entered: 07/29/2019 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 08/20/2019, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4810984] [19-2472] (RLS) [Entered: 07/23/2019 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Sally Sinclair Perez for Appellee PNC Bank, National Association w/service 07/16/2019 [4808564] [19-2472] (SSP) [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 08/05/2019, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [4808279] [19-2472] (RLS) [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, orders dated 06/11/2019,07/11/2019, 07/12/2019, judgment dated 06/11/2019[4808193] [19-2472] (RLS) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4808175] [19-2472] (RLS) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.