This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/01/2022 at 06:19:46 (UTC).

Lastephen Rogers v. Tug Hill Operating, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Lastephen Rogers filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Tug Hill Operating, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1480

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

LASTEPHEN ROGERS, Individually and for others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellees

TUG HILL OPERATING, LLC

RUSCO OPERATING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Richard Jennings Burch

Attorney at RICHARD BURCH

11 Greenway Plaza

Houston, TX 77046

Anthony J. Majestro

Attorney at POWELL & MAJESTRO, PLLC

405 Capitol Street, P. O. Box 3081

Charleston, WV 25331-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christian Charles Antkowiak

Attorney at BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC

Union Trust Building, 501 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219-4413

Erin J. McLaughlin

Attorney at BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC

Union Trust Building, 501 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219-4413

Rachel Beth Cowen

Attorney at MCDERMOTT, WILL & EMERY, LLP

444 West Lake Street

Chicago, IL 60606-0029

Ashley Clarke Odell

125 Granville Square

Morgantown, WV 26501

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) JOINT APPENDIX by Lastephen Rogers. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1001183856] [22-1480] Anthony Majestro [Entered: 06/27/2022 01:28 PM]

#17

(#17) BRIEF by Lastephen Rogers. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1001183852] [22-1480] Anthony Majestro [Entered: 06/27/2022 01:25 PM]

Open Document

Mediation forms. [1001176199] [22-1480] LHP [Entered: 06/10/2022 03:44 PM]

Open Document

Mediation forms. [1001176137] [22-1480] LHP [Entered: 06/10/2022 02:30 PM]

#15

(#15) OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Tug Hill Operating, LLC. [1001169125] [22-1480] Erin McLaughlin [Entered: 05/26/2022 06:48 PM]

#14

(#14) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [1001167563] [22-1480] LHP [Entered: 05/24/2022 04:10 PM]

#13

(#13) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Rachel Cowen for RUSCO Operating, LLC. [1001165355] [22-1480] Rachel Cowen [Entered: 05/19/2022 07:51 PM]

#12

(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RUSCO Operating, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001165354] [22-1480] John Bollman [Entered: 05/19/2022 07:47 PM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John Barrick Bollman for RUSCO Operating, LLC. [1001165353] [22-1480] John Bollman [Entered: 05/19/2022 07:44 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christian Antkowiak for Erin J. McLaughlin for Tug Hill Operating, LLC. [1001163146] [22-1480] Christian Antkowiak [Entered: 05/16/2022 07:06 PM]

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tug Hill Operating, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001163145] [22-1480] Erin McLaughlin [Entered: 05/16/2022 06:58 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Richard Jennings Burch for Lastephen Rogers. [1001163144] [22-1480] Richard Burch [Entered: 05/16/2022 06:57 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Erin J. McLaughlin for Erin J. McLaughlin for Tug Hill Operating, LLC. [1001163143] [22-1480] Erin McLaughlin [Entered: 05/16/2022 06:56 PM]

#6

(#6) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001163122] Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/27/2022. Response Brief due 07/25/2022 [22-1480] AW [Entered: 05/16/2022 06:39 PM]

#5

(#5) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Lastephen Rogers.. [1001163071] [22-1480] Anthony Majestro [Entered: 05/16/2022 04:48 PM]

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lastephen Rogers. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001163046] [22-1480] Anthony Majestro [Entered: 05/16/2022 04:30 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Anthony J Majestro for Mr. Anthony J. Majestro for Lastephen Rogers. [1001163042] [22-1480] Anthony Majestro [Entered: 05/16/2022 04:29 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00199-JPB. Mailed to: Erin J. McLaughlin. [1001155640] [22-1480] KH [Entered: 05/02/2022 02:49 PM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) JOINT APPENDIX by Lastephen Rogers. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1001183856] [22-1480] Anthony Majestro [Entered: 06/27/2022 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) BRIEF by Lastephen Rogers. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1001183852] [22-1480] Anthony Majestro [Entered: 06/27/2022 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation forms. [1001176199] [22-1480] LHP [Entered: 06/10/2022 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation forms. [1001176137] [22-1480] LHP [Entered: 06/10/2022 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Tug Hill Operating, LLC. [1001169125] [22-1480] Erin McLaughlin [Entered: 05/26/2022 06:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [1001167563] [22-1480] LHP [Entered: 05/24/2022 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Rachel Cowen for RUSCO Operating, LLC. [1001165355] [22-1480] Rachel Cowen [Entered: 05/19/2022 07:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RUSCO Operating, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001165354] [22-1480] John Bollman [Entered: 05/19/2022 07:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John Barrick Bollman for RUSCO Operating, LLC. [1001165353] [22-1480] John Bollman [Entered: 05/19/2022 07:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christian Antkowiak for Erin J. McLaughlin for Tug Hill Operating, LLC. [1001163146] [22-1480] Christian Antkowiak [Entered: 05/16/2022 07:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tug Hill Operating, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001163145] [22-1480] Erin McLaughlin [Entered: 05/16/2022 06:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Richard Jennings Burch for Lastephen Rogers. [1001163144] [22-1480] Richard Burch [Entered: 05/16/2022 06:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Erin J. McLaughlin for Erin J. McLaughlin for Tug Hill Operating, LLC. [1001163143] [22-1480] Erin McLaughlin [Entered: 05/16/2022 06:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001163122] Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/27/2022. Response Brief due 07/25/2022 [22-1480] AW [Entered: 05/16/2022 06:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Lastephen Rogers.. [1001163071] [22-1480] Anthony Majestro [Entered: 05/16/2022 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lastephen Rogers. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001163046] [22-1480] Anthony Majestro [Entered: 05/16/2022 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Anthony J Majestro for Mr. Anthony J. Majestro for Lastephen Rogers. [1001163042] [22-1480] Anthony Majestro [Entered: 05/16/2022 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00199-JPB. Mailed to: Erin J. McLaughlin. [1001155640] [22-1480] KH [Entered: 05/02/2022 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00199-JPB. Case manager: KHancock. [1001155636] [22-1480] KH [Entered: 05/02/2022 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RUSCO OPERATING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Tug Hill Operating, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel B. Cowen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin J McLaughlin