This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/14/2022 at 06:03:34 (UTC).

LaShebre Knight v. BP Exploration & Production Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 LaShebre Knight filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against BP Exploration Production Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10109

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

LASHEBRE D. KNIGHT

Defendant / Appellees

BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC

BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Timothy John Falcon

Attorney at Falcon Law Firm

5044 Lapalco Blvd

Marrero, LA 70072

Allen W. Lindsay Jr.

Attorney at Lindsay & Lindsay, PA

5218 Willing St

Milton, FL 32570

Jeremiah A. Sprague

Attorney at Falcon Law Firm

5044 Lapalco Blvd

Marrero, LA 70072

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Stefan G. Bourn

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy, LLC

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy Ste 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Sarah A. Long

Attorney at McDonald Toole Wiggins, PA

111 N Magnolia Ave Ste 1200, Po Box 4924

Orlando, FL 32802-4924

Kalleigh Amber McCoy

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy, LLC

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy Ste 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Kevin Michael Hodges

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Richard M. Crump

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy, LLC

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy Ste 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Courtney M. King

Attorney at McDonald Toole Wiggins, PA

111 N Magnolia Ave Ste 1200, Po Box 4924

Orlando, FL 32802-4924

Francis M. McDonald Jr.

Attorney at McDonald Toole Wiggins, PA

111 N Magnolia Ave Ste 1200, Po Box 4924

Orlando, FL 32802-4924

Youlin Yuan

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Ericson W. Enger

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy, LLC

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy Ste 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Thomas W. Tardy III

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy, LLC

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy Ste 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE to Parties [22-10116, 22-10099, 22-10101, 22-10102, 22-10103, 22-10105, 22-10107, 22-10108, 22-10109, 22-10111, 22-10112, 22-10113, 22-10114, 22-10115, 22-10118, 22-10119, 22-10120, 22-10121, 22-10122, 22-10123, 22-10124, 22-10125, 22-10127, 22-10128, 22-10129, 22-10130, 22-10131, 22-10133, 22-10134] [Entered: 01/18/2022 04:34 PM]

Open Document #1

DKT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

DC Order doc 39

Open Document #4

DC R&R doc 38

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Court Order Filed

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kevin Michael Hodges for BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc. [22-10109] (ECF: Kevin Hodges) [Entered: 01/27/2022 05:30 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Youlin Yuan for BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company [22-10109] (ECF: Youlin Yuan) [Entered: 01/27/2022 06:08 PM]

Open Document

Letter regarding consolidation of appeals filed by Attorney Kevin Michael Hodges for Appellees BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc. [22-10109] (ECF: Kevin Hodges) [Entered: 02/01/2022 09:49 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE: Pursuant to the Court's February 8, 2022 order, the parties are directed to docket all filings related to this appeal only in no. 22-10099. See no. 22-10099 for all further filings related to this appeal. [22-10099, 22-10101, 22-10102, 22-10103, 22-10105, 22-10107, 22-10108, 22-10109, 22-10111, 22-10112, 22-10113, 22-10114, 22-10115, 22-10116, 22-10118, 22-10119, 22-10120, 22-10121, 22-10122, 22-10123, 22-10124, 22-10125, 22-10127, 22-10128, 22-10129, 22-10130, 22-10131, 22-10133, 22-10134] [Entered: 02/09/2022 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The parties did not object to the consolidation of these appeals, the following appeals are CONSOLIDATED: appeal nos. 22-10101, 22-10102, 22-10103, 22-10105, 22-10107, 22-10108, 22-10109, 22-10111, 22-10112, 22-10113, 22-10114, 22-10115, 22-10116, 22-10118, 22-10119, 22-10120, 22-10121, 22-10122, 22-10123, 22-10124, 22-10125, 22-10127, 22-10128, 22-10129, 22-10130, 22-10 (the "Consolidated Appeals"). AJ (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 02/08/2022 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter regarding consolidation of appeals filed by Attorney Kevin Michael Hodges for Appellees BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc. [22-10109] (ECF: Kevin Hodges) [Entered: 02/01/2022 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Youlin Yuan for BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company [22-10109] (ECF: Youlin Yuan) [Entered: 01/27/2022 06:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kevin Michael Hodges for BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc. [22-10109] (ECF: Kevin Hodges) [Entered: 01/27/2022 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE to Parties [22-10116, 22-10099, 22-10101, 22-10102, 22-10103, 22-10105, 22-10107, 22-10108, 22-10109, 22-10111, 22-10112, 22-10113, 22-10114, 22-10115, 22-10118, 22-10119, 22-10120, 22-10121, 22-10122, 22-10123, 22-10124, 22-10125, 22-10127, 22-10128, 22-10129, 22-10130, 22-10131, 22-10133, 22-10134] [Entered: 01/18/2022 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant LaShebre D. Knight on 01/12/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/27/2022 as to Appellant LaShebre D. Knight. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/10/2022 as to Appellees [Entered: 01/15/2022 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Youlin Yuan