This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/20/2021 at 06:15:34 (UTC).

Las Vegas Boat Harbor, Inc. v. Leslie Burns, et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 Las Vegas Boat Harbor, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Leslie Burns. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15699

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Claimant

LESLIE BURNS

Petitioner / Appellant

LAS VEGAS BOAT HARBOR, INC.

Defendant / Appellee

POLARIS BOATS, LLC

Not Classified By Court

BRUNSWICK CORPORATION

In re: LAS VEGAS BOAT HARBOR, INC., as owner of a certain 2018 Bennington Marine model 25SSRCX Half Admiral Pontoon Boat, No. 2449, HIN ETWF9242D818

PONTOON BOAT, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant Attorneys

Donald Jude Campbell Esquire

Attorney at Campbell & Williams

700 South Seventh Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Philip Erwin

Attorney at Campbell & Williams

710 S. 7Th Street, Suite A

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Samuel R. Mirkovich

Attorney at Campbell & Williams

710 S. 7Th Street, Suite A

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Taylor R. Anderson

Attorney at Hall Jaffe & Clayton, LLP

7425 Peak Drive

Las Vegas, NV 89128

Steven Jaffe

Attorney at Hall Jaffe & Clayton, LLP

7425 Peak Drive

Las Vegas, NV 89128

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Karie N. Wilson

Attorney at Alverson, Taylor, Mortensen & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Parkway, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12123947] (CL) [Entered: 05/25/2021 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#9) Deleted Incorrect Entry. Entered in error. [12122800] (CL) [Entered: 05/24/2021 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docket(#8) Added Attorney(s) Philip Erwin for party(s) Appellee Leslie Burns, in case 21-15699. [12114888] (NAC) [Entered: 05/17/2021 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Philip Robert Erwin (Campbell & Williams, 710 S. 7th Street, Suite A, Las Vegas, Nevada 89101) for Appellee Leslie Burns. Date of service: 05/17/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12114884] [21-15699] (Erwin, Philip) [Entered: 05/17/2021 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docket(#6) Added Attorney(s) Samuel R. Mirkovich for party(s) Appellee Leslie Burns, in case 21-15699. [12105741] (QDL) [Entered: 05/07/2021 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Samuel Reid Mirkovich (Campbell & Williams, 710 S. 7th Street, Suite A, Las Vegas, Nevada 89101) for Appellee Leslie Burns. Date of service: 05/07/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12105663] [21-15699] (Mirkovich, Samuel) [Entered: 05/07/2021 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 05/24/2021, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12100735] (CL) [Entered: 05/03/2021 06:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/28/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12090545]. [21-15699] (AD) [Entered: 04/28/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Las Vegas Boat Harbor, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/28/2021. [12090522] [21-15699] (Anderson, Taylor) [Entered: 04/28/2021 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Las Vegas Boat Harbor, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/28/2021. Appellant Las Vegas Boat Harbor, Inc. opening brief due 06/23/2021. Appellees Leslie Burns and Polaris Boats, LLC answering brief due 07/23/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12082611] (RT) [Entered: 04/21/2021 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRUNSWICK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel R. Mirkovich

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald J. Campbell