This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/13/2021 at 07:19:46 (UTC).

Larry Wireman, et al v. Park National Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Larry Wireman filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Park National Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-14096

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

JUDY WIREMAN

LARRY WIREMAN

Defendant / Appellees

SOUTHEAST PROPERTY SOLUTIONS, LLC

PARK NATIONAL CORPORATION

SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Franklin Hollis Eaton Jr.

Attorney at Franklin Hollis Eaton, Jr. Law Firm

4810 Easy St

Orange Beach, AL 36561

Christopher A. Callaghan

Attorney at Christopher A. Callaghan, LLC

3145 Gulf Shores Pkwy

Gulf Shores, AL 36542

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jennifer S. Holifield

Attorney at Speegle Hoffman Holman & Holifield, LLC

5 Dauphin St Ste 301, Po Box 11

Mobile, AL 36601-0011

Jerome E. Speegle

Attorney at Speegle Hoffman Holman & Holifield, LLC

5 Dauphin St Ste 301, Po Box 11

Mobile, AL 36601-0011

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Appellees' motion for attorneys' fees and costs

Open Document #1

Court Order Filed

Open Document #4

Exhibit 2 to Appellee's M for Attorney's Fees

Open Document #3

Exhibit 1-Part 2 to Appellee's M for Attorney's Fees

Open Document #2

Exhibit 1-Part 1 to Appellee's M for Attorney's Fees

Open Document #1

Motion filed

Open Document #3

Billof Costs

Open Document #2

Mandate Issued

Open Document #1

MDT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

USDC Judgment- doc #13

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Before the Court is Appellees Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs on Appeal. The motion is GRANTED, IN PART, in that the matter is TRANSFERRED to the district court for consideration of whether Appellees are entitled to appellate attorneys fees, and if so, the amount of reasonable attorneys fees, if any. The motion is DENIED AS MOOT, IN PART, to the extent it seeks an attorneys fees award from this Court. [ # 9466501-2 ]; [ # 9466501-3 ] KCN, RJL and RLA (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 09/24/2021 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for attorney's fees or costs or in the alternative transfer attorney's fees to district court filed by PRK, SE Property Holdings, LLC and Southeast Property Solutions, LLC. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9466501-1] [20-14096]--[Edited 09/17/2021 by CRL, to add relief and edit docket for alternative request in motion] (ECF: Jerome Speegle) [Entered: 08/23/2021 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandate issued as to Appellants Judy Wireman and Larry Wireman. [Entered: 08/18/2021 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSigned Approved Bill of costs filed by Attorney Jennifer S. Holifield for Appellees PRK, SE Property Holdings, LLC and Southeast Property Solutions, LLC. [Entered: 07/30/2021 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBill of costs filed by Attorney Jennifer S. Holifield for Appellees PRK, SE Property Holdings, LLC and Southeast Property Solutions, LLC. [20-14096] (ECF: Jennifer Holifield) [Entered: 07/28/2021 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpinion issued by court as to Appellants Judy Wireman and Larry Wireman. Decision: Affirmed and Remanded. Opinion type: Non-Published. Opinion method: Per Curiam. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link # http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions . [Entered: 07/20/2021 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment entered as to Appellants Judy Wireman and Larry Wireman. [Entered: 07/20/2021 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE JURISDICTION noted after issuance of a Jurisdictional Question as to Appellants Judy Wireman and Larry Wireman. [Entered: 03/16/2021 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The motion to amend the notice of removal to properly allege the citizenships of the parties filed by defendants Park National Corporation (Park), SE Property Holdings, LLC (SE), and Southeast Property Solutions, LLC (Southeast) is GRANTED, and this appeal MAY PROCEED... As the notice of removal is the relevant pleading here for purposes of diversity jurisdiction, the Wiremans motion to amend the complaint to properly allege the parties citizenships is DENIED as unnecessary... The parties shall notify the district court of this order by filing copies of this order and the notice of removal, as amended, with that court. [ # 9297235-2 ]; [ # 9297602-2 ] AJ and KCN (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 03/16/2021 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketReceived reply paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Judy Wireman and Larry Wireman. [Entered: 02/12/2021 08:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILED WITHOUT LEAVE OF THE COURT*** Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Christopher A. Callaghan for Appellants Judy Wireman and Larry Wireman. [20-14096]--[Edited 11/23/2020 by CRL] (ECF: Christopher Callaghan) [Entered: 11/23/2020 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement form Out of time filed by Judy Wireman and Larry Wireman. Motion is Unopposed. [9243842-1] [20-14096]--[Edited 11/23/2020 by CRL, to correct relief] (ECF: Christopher Callaghan) [Entered: 11/23/2020 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Christopher A. Callaghan for Appellants Larry Wireman and Judy Wireman has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 11/18/2020 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jennifer S. Holifield for PRK, SE Property Holdings, LLC and Southeast Property Solutions, LLC. [20-14096] (ECF: Jennifer Holifield) [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jerome E. Speegle for PRK, SE Property Holdings, LLC and Southeast Property Solutions, LLC. [20-14096] (ECF: Jerome Speegle) [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher A. Callaghan for Judy Wireman and Larry Wireman. [20-14096] (ECF: Christopher Callaghan) [Entered: 11/13/2020 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of deficient Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Christopher A. Callaghan for Larry Wireman and Judy Wireman. Document Not Complete. Appearance of Counsel form has not been filed. Appearance of Counsel Form are available on the Internet at www.ca11.uscourts.gov. The clerk may not process filings from an attorney until that attorney files an appearance form. See 11th Cir. R. 46-6. Counsel must file an appearance within 3 days. [Entered: 11/12/2020 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Christopher A. Callaghan for Judy Wireman and Larry Wireman Attorney Christopher A. Callaghan for Appellants Judy Wireman and Larry Wireman. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-14096] (ECF: Christopher Callaghan) [Entered: 11/12/2020 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 10/30/2020 as to Appellant Judy Wireman. [Entered: 11/03/2020 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Judy Wireman and Larry Wireman on 10/30/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 12/09/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/13/2020 as to Appellant Judy Wireman. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/27/2020 as to Appellee Park National Corporation [Entered: 11/03/2020 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jerome E. Speegle