This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/09/2021 at 06:07:12 (UTC).

Larry Tawney, Jr. v. Portage County, OH, et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 Larry Tawney, Jr filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Portage County, OH,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3809

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

LARRY TAWNEY, JR.

Defendant / Appellees

PORTAGE COUNTY, OH

BILL BURNS, In his official and individual capacities

DAVID W. DOAK, In his official and individual capacities

DOUG DRAKE, In his official and individual capacities

MATT HOLBROOK, In his official and individual capacities

JOHN HOSTLER, In his official and individual capacities

JASON JOY, In his official and individual capacities

DALE KELLY, In his official and individual capacities

SHAWN LANSINGER, In his official and individual capacities

VINCENT T. LOMBARDO, In his official and individual capacities

DEREK MCCOY, In his official and individual capacities

BRYAN MORGANSTERN, In his official and individual capacities

ERIC NOELL, In his official and individual capacities

JUSTIN SCHIFKO, In his official and individual capacities

MIKE SKILTON, In his official and individual capacities

DAN SMITH, In his official and individual capacities

CAMERON STOCKLEY, In his official and individual capacities

ROBERT SYMSEK, In his official and individual capacities

BARRY THRUSH, In his official and individual capacities

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael A. Partlow

Attorney at Law Office

P.O. Box 1569

Stow, OH 44224

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Frank H. Scialdone

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder

34305 Solon Road, Suite 100

Cleveland, OH 44139

Kathleen M. Minahan

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder

34305 Solon Road, Suite 100

Cleveland, OH 44139

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Larry Tawney, Jr. by Michael A. Partlow. Certificate of Service: 09/20/2021. [21-3809] (MAP) [Entered: 09/20/2021 03:18 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Portage County, OH, David W. Doak, Dale Kelly, Robert Symsek, John Hostler, Derek McCoy, Mike Skilton, Circe Hartman, Jason Joy, Dan Smith, Susanne Sattler, Bill Burns, Doug Drake, Vincent T. Lombardo, Justin Schifko, Bryan Morganstern, Claudette McCullough, Janice Clark, Matt Holbrook, Chay Vue, Barry Thrush, Cameron Stockley, Shawn Lansinger, Eric Noell, Erica Jarvis and Austin Wilson by Frank H. Scialdone. Certificate of Service: 09/21/2021. [21-3809] (FHS) [Entered: 09/21/2021 08:45 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Portage County, OH, David W. Doak, Dale Kelly, Robert Symsek, John Hostler, Derek McCoy, Mike Skilton, Circe Hartman, Jason Joy, Dan Smith, Susanne Sattler, Bill Burns, Doug Drake, Vincent T. Lombardo, Justin Schifko, Bryan Morganstern, Claudette McCullough, Janice Clark, Matt Holbrook, Chay Vue, Barry Thrush, Cameron Stockley, Shawn Lansinger, Eric Noell, Erica Jarvis and Austin Wilson by Kathleen M. Minahan. Certificate of Service: 09/21/2021. [21-3809] (KMM) [Entered: 09/21/2021 08:52 AM]

#9

(#9) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 11/08/2021; appellee brief due 12/08/2021. (REO) [Entered: 09/28/2021 10:22 AM]

#10

(#10) MOTION filed by Mr. Michael A. Partlow for Larry Tawney, Jr. to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 11/05/2021. [21-3809] (MAP) [Entered: 11/05/2021 12:17 PM]

#11

(#11) RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 10 ] filed by Mr. Michael A. Partlow. 32 day extension of time granted. Resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 12/10/2021; appellee brief now due 01/10/2022. (REO) [Entered: 11/05/2021 01:50 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 10 ] filed by Mr. Michael A. Partlow. 32 day extension of time granted. Resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 12/10/2021; appellee brief now due 01/10/2022. (REO) [Entered: 11/05/2021 01:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION filed by Mr. Michael A. Partlow for Larry Tawney, Jr. to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 11/05/2021. [21-3809] (MAP) [Entered: 11/05/2021 12:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 11/08/2021; appellee brief due 12/08/2021. (REO) [Entered: 09/28/2021 10:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#8) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Michael A. Partlow for Larry Tawney, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 09/27/2021. [21-3809] (MAP) [Entered: 09/27/2021 05:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE: The initial transcript order has not been completed. If not completed by 09/30/2021 further action will be taken. (REO) [Entered: 09/27/2021 05:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Portage County, OH, David W. Doak, Dale Kelly, Robert Symsek, John Hostler, Derek McCoy, Mike Skilton, Circe Hartman, Jason Joy, Dan Smith, Susanne Sattler, Bill Burns, Doug Drake, Vincent T. Lombardo, Justin Schifko, Bryan Morganstern, Claudette McCullough, Janice Clark, Matt Holbrook, Chay Vue, Barry Thrush, Cameron Stockley, Shawn Lansinger, Eric Noell, Erica Jarvis and Austin Wilson by Kathleen M. Minahan. Certificate of Service: 09/21/2021. [21-3809] (KMM) [Entered: 09/21/2021 08:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Portage County, OH, David W. Doak, Dale Kelly, Robert Symsek, John Hostler, Derek McCoy, Mike Skilton, Circe Hartman, Jason Joy, Dan Smith, Susanne Sattler, Bill Burns, Doug Drake, Vincent T. Lombardo, Justin Schifko, Bryan Morganstern, Claudette McCullough, Janice Clark, Matt Holbrook, Chay Vue, Barry Thrush, Cameron Stockley, Shawn Lansinger, Eric Noell, Erica Jarvis and Austin Wilson by Frank H. Scialdone. Certificate of Service: 09/21/2021. [21-3809] (FHS) [Entered: 09/21/2021 08:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • Docket(#4) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Michael A. Partlow for Larry Tawney, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 09/20/2021. [21-3809] (MAP) [Entered: 09/20/2021 03:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Larry Tawney, Jr. by Michael A. Partlow. Certificate of Service: 09/20/2021. [21-3809] (MAP) [Entered: 09/20/2021 03:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (REO) [Entered: 09/10/2021 02:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Larry Tawney. Transcript needed: y. (REO) [Entered: 09/10/2021 02:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTAGE COUNTY, OH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathleen M. Minahan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank H. Scialdone