This case was last updated from PACER on 07/14/2019 at 06:10:28 (UTC).

Larry Klayman v. Judicial Watch, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 Larry Klayman filed an Other lawsuit against Judicial Watch, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7043

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Larry Elliott Klayman

Miami, FL 33145

Defendant / Appellee

Judicial Watch, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Larry Elliott Klayman

Attorney at Klayman Law Firm

2020 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 345

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Richard W. Driscoll

Attorney at Driscoll & Seltzer PLLC

300 N. Washington Street, Suite 610

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION [1796888] to extend time to file motion to 07/29/2019 filed by Larry Elliott Klayman (Service Date: 07/11/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 117 Words. [19-7043] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 07/11/2019 08:18 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1796194] for motion for summary affirmance [ # 1795997-2 ] filed by Judicial Watch, Inc.. [19-7043] (Driscoll, Richard) [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:47 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1795997] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by hand due on 07/15/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/15/2019) filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. (Service Date: 07/05/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 13 pages. [19-7043] (Driscoll, Richard) [Entered: 07/05/2019 09:07 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT [1793759] with Disclosure Listing filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 06/20/2019 ] [19-7043] (Driscoll, Richard) [Entered: 06/20/2019 03:26 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1793728] filed by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 06/20/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-7043] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:25 PM]

Open Document

UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1793727] submitted by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 06/20/2019 ] [19-7043] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:24 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1793726] filed by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 06/20/2019 ] [19-7043] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:23 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1793725] filed by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 06/20/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-7043] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:23 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1793724] filed by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 06/20/2019 ] [19-7043] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:22 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1793723] filed by Larry Klayman on behalf of Appellant Larry Elliott Klayman. [19-7043] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:21 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1793722] filed by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 06/20/2019 ] [19-7043] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:20 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1793581] filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 06/19/2019 ] [19-7043] (Driscoll, Richard) [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:48 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1793580] filed by Richard W Driscoll on behalf of Appellee Judicial Watch, Inc.. [19-7043] (Driscoll, Richard) [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:46 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1788675] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/05/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/20/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/20/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/20/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/05/2019 [19-7043] [Entered: 05/21/2019 09:08 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1787893] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:16-mc-01430-RBW filed by Larry Elliott Klayman. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7043. [19-7043] [Entered: 05/15/2019 12:20 PM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1796888] to extend time to file motion to 07/29/2019 filed by Larry Elliott Klayman (Service Date: 07/11/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 117 Words. [19-7043] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 07/11/2019 08:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1796194] for motion for summary affirmance [ # 1795997-2 ] filed by Judicial Watch, Inc.. [19-7043] (Driscoll, Richard) [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1795997] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by hand due on 07/15/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/15/2019) filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. (Service Date: 07/05/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 13 pages. [19-7043] (Driscoll, Richard) [Entered: 07/05/2019 09:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT [1793759] with Disclosure Listing filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 06/20/2019 ] [19-7043] (Driscoll, Richard) [Entered: 06/20/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1793728] filed by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 06/20/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-7043] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1793727] submitted by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 06/20/2019 ] [19-7043] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1793726] filed by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 06/20/2019 ] [19-7043] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1793725] filed by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 06/20/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-7043] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING STATEMENT [1793724] filed by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 06/20/2019 ] [19-7043] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1793723] filed by Larry Klayman on behalf of Appellant Larry Elliott Klayman. [19-7043] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1793722] filed by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 06/20/2019 ] [19-7043] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1793581] filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 06/19/2019 ] [19-7043] (Driscoll, Richard) [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1793580] filed by Richard W Driscoll on behalf of Appellee Judicial Watch, Inc.. [19-7043] (Driscoll, Richard) [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1788675] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/05/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/20/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/20/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/20/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/05/2019 [19-7043] [Entered: 05/21/2019 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1787893] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:16-mc-01430-RBW filed by Larry Elliott Klayman. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7043. [19-7043] [Entered: 05/15/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-7043] [Entered: 05/15/2019 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.