This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/23/2022 at 06:05:20 (UTC).

Larry Golden v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Larry Golden filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2318

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

LARRY GOLDEN

Greenville, SC 29607

Defendant / Appellee

GOOGLE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Larry Golden

740 Woodruff Road

Greenville, SC 29607

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:21-cv-00244-JD. Case manager: JRice. [1001065068] [21-2318] JR [Entered: 11/24/2021 09:53 AM]

2 #1

Informal briefing order

#2

Disclosure

#3

(#3) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001065085]. Due: 12/08/2021. [21-2318] JR [Entered: 11/24/2021 10:05 AM]

#4

(#4) ORDER filed grant closing of appeal administratively. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Larry Golden. [1001070659] [21-2318] JR [Entered: 12/07/2021 08:47 AM]

#5

(#5) MANDATE ISSUED UPON ENTRY OF ORDER/ JUDGMENT. Referencing: [ # 4 ] Order. Originating case number: 6:21-cv-00244-JD. Date of order/judgment: December 7, 2021. Mailed to: Larry Golden. [1001070661] [21-2318] JR [Entered: 12/07/2021 08:49 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MANDATE ISSUED UPON ENTRY OF ORDER/ JUDGMENT. Referencing: [ # 4 ] Order. Originating case number: 6:21-cv-00244-JD. Date of order/judgment: December 7, 2021. Mailed to: Larry Golden. [1001070661] [21-2318] JR [Entered: 12/07/2021 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER filed grant closing of appeal administratively. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Larry Golden. [1001070659] [21-2318] JR [Entered: 12/07/2021 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001065085]. Due: 12/08/2021. [21-2318] JR [Entered: 11/24/2021 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Larry Golden. Informal Opening Brief due 12/20/2021. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-2318] JR [Entered: 11/24/2021 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:21-cv-00244-JD. Case manager: JRice. [1001065068] [21-2318] JR [Entered: 11/24/2021 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant