This case was last updated from PACER on 03/14/2021 at 06:05:42 (UTC).

LaRocca v. Alvin Independent School Dist

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 LaRocca filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Alvin Independent School Dist. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-40043

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Lisa LaRocca

Defendant / Appellee

Alvin Independent School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Anita Kawaja

Attorney at Law Offices of Anita Kawaja

6030 Claridge Drive

Houston, TX 77096

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Amy Dawn Demmler

Attorney at Rogers, Morris & Grover, L.L.P.

5718 Westheimer Road

Houston, TX 77057

Jonathan Griffin Brush

Attorney at Rogers, Morris & Grover, L.L.P.

5718 Westheimer Road

Houston, TX 77057

Clay Thomas Grover Esq.

Attorney at Rogers, Morris & Grover, L.L.P.

5718 Westheimer Road

Houston, TX 77057

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Anita Kawaja for Ms. Lisa LaRocca for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40043] (Anita Kawaja ) [Entered: 02/11/2021 09:13 AM]

Open Document

DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance form received from Appellant Ms. Lisa LaRocca because must be properly filed and not attached to another filing event [21-40043] (SDH) [Entered: 02/04/2021 01:38 PM]

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Ms. Lisa LaRoccafor the Court to process. Date of service: 02/03/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Brush, Demmler, Grover; Attorney for Appellant: Kawaja. [21-40043] (Anita Kawaja ) [Entered: 02/03/2021 08:19 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Amy Dawn Demmler for Alvin Independent School District for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40043] (Amy Dawn Demmler ) [Entered: 01/21/2021 09:38 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40043] (Jonathan Griffin Brush ) [Entered: 01/21/2021 09:31 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40043] (Clay Thomas Grover ) [Entered: 01/21/2021 09:30 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9485119-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 02/03/2021 for Appellant Lisa LaRocca [21-40043] (CAG) [Entered: 01/19/2021 04:15 PM]

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Lisa LaRocca [21-40043] (SDH) [Entered: 01/13/2021 04:11 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEXTENSION OF TIME GRANTED to the District Court to prepare the Electronic ROA until 03/05/2021 pursuant to Court's General Order 2021-4. Electronic ROA deadline updated to 03/05/2021. [21-40043] (SDH) [Entered: 02/25/2021 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Anita Kawaja for Appellant Lisa LaRocca in 21-40043 [21-40043] (SDH) [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Anita Kawaja for Ms. Lisa LaRocca for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40043] (Anita Kawaja ) [Entered: 02/11/2021 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:20-CV-134. Electronic ROA due on 02/19/2021. [21-40043] (SDH) [Entered: 02/04/2021 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Lisa LaRocca advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [21-40043] (SDH) [Entered: 02/04/2021 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance form received from Appellant Ms. Lisa LaRocca because must be properly filed and not attached to another filing event [21-40043] (SDH) [Entered: 02/04/2021 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Ms. Lisa LaRoccafor the Court to process. Date of service: 02/03/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Brush, Demmler, Grover; Attorney for Appellant: Kawaja. [21-40043] (Anita Kawaja ) [Entered: 02/03/2021 08:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Amy Dawn Demmler for Appellee Alvin Independent School District in 21-40043 [21-40043] (SDH) [Entered: 01/22/2021 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Clay Thomas Grover for party(s) Appellee Alvin Independent School District, in case 21-40043 [21-40043] (SDH) [Entered: 01/22/2021 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jonathan Griffin Brush for party(s) Appellee Alvin Independent School District, in case 21-40043 [21-40043] (SDH) [Entered: 01/22/2021 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Amy Dawn Demmler for Alvin Independent School District for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40043] (Amy Dawn Demmler ) [Entered: 01/21/2021 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40043] (Jonathan Griffin Brush ) [Entered: 01/21/2021 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40043] (Clay Thomas Grover ) [Entered: 01/21/2021 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9485119-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 02/03/2021 for Appellant Lisa LaRocca [21-40043] (CAG) [Entered: 01/19/2021 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Lisa LaRocca [21-40043] (SDH) [Entered: 01/13/2021 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alvin Independent School District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clay Thomas Grover Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy Dawn Demmler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Griffin Brush