This case was last updated from PACER on 01/01/2020 at 05:00:42 (UTC).

Larios-Ortiz v. Barr

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 Larios-Ortiz filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2291

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PETRONILA LARIOS-ORTIZ

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hans Bremer

190 Broad St

Providence, RI 02903

Respondent Attorneys

Derek C. Julius

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

Po Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0878

OIL OIL

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

450 5Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Rosanne M. Perry

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

Po Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0878

Anthony Paul Nicastro

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

Po Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0878

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #1

Petition for Review

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for Attorney Derek C. Julius, Anthony P. Nicastro to withdraw as counsel filed by Respondent William P. Barr. Certificate of service dated 12/31/2019. [19-2291] (RMP) [Entered: 12/31/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Respondent William P. Barr filed by Attorney Rosanne M. Perry. Certificate of service dated 12/31/2019. [19-2291] (RMP) [Entered: 12/31/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Hans Bremer for Petitioner Petronila Larios-Ortiz. Certificate of service dated 12/23/2019. [19-2291] (GB) [Entered: 12/30/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE regarding application of Local Rule 18.0. [19-2291] (GB) [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AGENCY CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Petronila Larios-Ortiz. Fee due 01/13/2020 . Administrative record due 02/10/2020 . Copy of petition served on respondent(s) pursuant to FRAP 15(c). [19-2291] (GB) [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less