Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/23/2020 at 06:07:46 (UTC).

Lanis Solomon, Jr. v. Scott Sobek, et al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2020 Lanis Solomon, Jr filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Scott Sobek. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1679

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JOSHUA MIKULECKY

SCOTT SOBEK

JOSHUA BRIGGS

MICHAEL HANNAH

KONGPHENG VANG

Plaintiff / Appellant

LANIS E. SOLOMON, JR.

Milwaukee, WI 53233-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Dale R. Nikolay

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CORPORATION COUNSEL

901 N. Ninth Street, Milwaukee County Courthouse

Milwaukee, WI 53233-0000

Anne Berleman Kearney

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CORPORATION COUNSEL

901 N. Ninth Street, Milwaukee County Courthouse

Milwaukee, WI 53233-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Lanis E. Solomon Jr.

Attorney at MILWAUKEE COUNTY JAIL

949 N. Ninth Street

Milwaukee, WI 53233-0000

 

Court Documents

8 #2

PLRA OrderMF IFP

8 #1

(#8) ORDER: TRANSFERRING the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis on appeal to the clerk of the District Court for ruling in the first instance. [8] [7088258] JR [20-1679] (CG) [Entered: 06/19/2020 03:50 PM]

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER: re: Notice of information. This appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and therefore all proceedings are suspended pending the assessment and payment of any necessary fees. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). A review of the docket indicates that the appellant's fee status has not yet been determined. To the extent that the appellant seeks to stay this appeal, the motion is DENIED. The appellant shall either pay the $505.00 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis with the district court by June 26, 2020. The appellant shall file the overdue Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement by June 26, 2020. [6] [7083213] CMD [20-1679] (CG) [Entered: 05/26/2020 04:18 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed notice of information by Appellant Lanis E. Solomon, Jr. [5] [7082857] [20-1679] (CM) [Entered: 05/22/2020 04:19 PM]

4 #2

(#4) Docketing Statement filed by Appellees Joshua Briggs, Michael Hannah, Joshua Mikulecky, Scott Sobek and Kongpheng Vang. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7082498] [20-1679] (Kearney, Anne) [Entered: 05/21/2020 01:06 PM]

4 #1

Docketing/Jurisdictional Statement

3 #2

(#3) Appearance form filed by Attorney Anne Berleman Kearney for Appellees Joshua Briggs, Michael Hannah, Joshua Mikulecky, Scott Sobek and Kongpheng Vang. [3] [7081981] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-1679] --[Edited 05/20/2020 by AP- to reflect the termination and addition of counsel] (Kearney, Anne) [Entered: 05/19/2020 04:09 PM]

3 #1

Appearance form filed (Government counsel only)

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Rights Case

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: TRANSFERRING the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis on appeal to the clerk of the District Court for ruling in the first instance. [8] [7088258] JR [20-1679] (CG) [Entered: 06/19/2020 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Prose motion filed by Appellant Lanis E. Solomon, Jr. to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [7] [7088215] [20-1679] (CAH) [Entered: 06/19/2020 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: re: Notice of information. This appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and therefore all proceedings are suspended pending the assessment and payment of any necessary fees. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). A review of the docket indicates that the appellant's fee status has not yet been determined. To the extent that the appellant seeks to stay this appeal, the motion is DENIED. The appellant shall either pay the $505.00 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis with the district court by June 26, 2020. The appellant shall file the overdue Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement by June 26, 2020. [6] [7083213] CMD [20-1679] (CG) [Entered: 05/26/2020 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed notice of information by Appellant Lanis E. Solomon, Jr. [5] [7082857] [20-1679] (CM) [Entered: 05/22/2020 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement filed by Appellees Joshua Briggs, Michael Hannah, Joshua Mikulecky, Scott Sobek and Kongpheng Vang. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7082498] [20-1679] (Kearney, Anne) [Entered: 05/21/2020 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Appearance form filed by Attorney Anne Berleman Kearney for Appellees Joshua Briggs, Michael Hannah, Joshua Mikulecky, Scott Sobek and Kongpheng Vang. [3] [7081981] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-1679] --[Edited 05/20/2020 by AP- to reflect the termination and addition of counsel] (Kearney, Anne) [Entered: 05/19/2020 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docket(#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEE: Benjamin Jackson. [2] [7076909] [20-1679] (ER) [Entered: 04/24/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Lanis E. Solomon Jr. by 05/01/2020. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 05/26/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 05/08/2020. [1] [7076907] [20-1679] (ER) [Entered: 04/24/2020 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less