This case was last updated from PACER on 03/16/2021 at 06:11:46 (UTC).

Langston Austin, et al v. Glynn County, Georgia, et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 Langston Austin filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Glynn County, Georgia. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10162

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

GLYNN COUNTY, GEORGIA

E. NEAL JUMP, Individually

Plaintiff / Appellants

LANGSTON AUSTIN, On behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

ERNEST FULLER, III, On behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Richard K. Strickland

Attorney at Brown Readdick Bumgartner Carter Strickland & Watkins, LLP

5 Glynn Ave, Po Box 220

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

Emily Rose Hancock

Attorney at Brown Readdick Bumgartner Carter Strickland & Watkins, LLP

5 Glynn Ave, Po Box 220

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

Aaron W. Mumford

Attorney at Glynn County Attorney's Office

701 G St Fl 2

Brunswick, GA 31520-6750

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Joseph Richard Padgett

Attorney at Roden Law

333 Commercial Dr

Savannah, GA 31406

Thomas A. Withers

Attorney at Gillen Withers & Lake, LLC

8 E Liberty St

Savannah, GA 31401

Peter Lampros

Attorney at Hall & Lampros, LLP

400 Galleria Pkwy Ste 1150

Atlanta, GA 30339

Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen

Attorney at Hall & Lampros, LLP

400 Galleria Pkwy Ste 1150

Atlanta, GA 30339

Patrick J. Hannon

Attorney at Hall & Lampros, LLP

400 Galleria Pkwy Ste 1150

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

Open Document

TIME SENSITIVE MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 03/17/2021 filed by Langston Austin and Ernest Fuller, III. Motion is Unopposed. [9311495-1] [21-10162] (ECF: Patrick Hannon) [Entered: 02/17/2021 05:06 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily Rose Hancock for Glynn County, Georgia and E. Neal Jump. [21-10162] (ECF: Emily Hancock) [Entered: 02/11/2021 01:50 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Patrick J. Hannon for Appellants Ernest Fuller, III and Langston Austin. [Entered: 02/11/2021 09:35 AM]

Open Document

ORDER: Motion for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by Appellants Ernest Fuller, III and Langston Austin is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9306252-2 ] [Entered: 02/11/2021 09:30 AM]

Open Document #2

Exhibit 1 - Civil Appeal Statement

Open Document #1

Motion to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Tim

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Patrick J. Hannon for Appellants Langston Austin and Ernest Fuller, III. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10162] (ECF: Patrick Hannon) [Entered: 02/10/2021 03:42 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Patrick Hannon for Langston Austin and Ernest Fuller III [21-10162] (ECF: Patrick Hannon) [Entered: 02/09/2021 03:10 PM]

Open Document

Attorney Thomas A Withers for Appellants Ernest Fuller, III and Langston Austin has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 02/04/2021 10:14 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10162] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 01/29/2021 10:28 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard K. Strickland for Glynn County, Georgia and E. Neal Jump. [21-10162] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 01/29/2021 10:27 AM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 01/15/2021 as to Appellant Langston Austin. [Entered: 01/20/2021 03:25 PM]

Open Document #3

USDC Judgment- doc #32

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellants Ernest Fuller, III and Langston Austin is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9311495-2 ] Appellants' brief is due on 03/17/2021, with the appendix due (7) days thereafter. [Entered: 02/18/2021 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTIME SENSITIVE MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 03/17/2021 filed by Langston Austin and Ernest Fuller, III. Motion is Unopposed. [9311495-1] [21-10162] (ECF: Patrick Hannon) [Entered: 02/17/2021 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily Rose Hancock for Glynn County, Georgia and E. Neal Jump. [21-10162] (ECF: Emily Hancock) [Entered: 02/11/2021 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Patrick J. Hannon for Appellants Ernest Fuller, III and Langston Austin. [Entered: 02/11/2021 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Motion for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by Appellants Ernest Fuller, III and Langston Austin is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9306252-2 ] [Entered: 02/11/2021 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTIME SENSITIVE MOTION for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement out of time filed by Langston Austin and Ernest Fuller, III. Motion is Unopposed. [9306252-1] [21-10162] (ECF: Patrick Hannon) [Entered: 02/10/2021 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Patrick J. Hannon for Appellants Langston Austin and Ernest Fuller, III. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10162] (ECF: Patrick Hannon) [Entered: 02/10/2021 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Patrick Hannon for Langston Austin and Ernest Fuller III [21-10162] (ECF: Patrick Hannon) [Entered: 02/09/2021 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Thomas A Withers for Appellants Ernest Fuller, III and Langston Austin has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 02/04/2021 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Thomas A Withers for Ernest Fuller, III and Langston Austin. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 02/01/2021 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10162] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 01/29/2021 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard K. Strickland for Glynn County, Georgia and E. Neal Jump. [21-10162] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 01/29/2021 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 01/15/2021 as to Appellant Langston Austin. [Entered: 01/20/2021 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Langston Austin and Ernest Fuller, III on 01/15/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 02/24/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/29/2021 as to Appellant Langston Austin. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/12/2021 as to Appellee Glynn County, Georgia [Entered: 01/20/2021 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Glynn County, Georgia is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick J. Hannon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas A. Withers

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen