Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2020 at 06:06:04 (UTC).

Landon v. Blumer

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Landon filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Blumer. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1123

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

CORRECTIONAL HEALTH PARTNERS C.H.P.

TIMOTHY ROLAND BROWN, M.D.

Defendant / Appellee

HOLLY BLUMER, Nurse, BCCF Medical Dept.

Plaintiff / Appellant

ROBERT LANDON

Las Animas, CO 81054

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Andrew David Ringel Esq.

Attorney at Hall & Evans

1001 17Th Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Edmund Martin Kennedy

Attorney at Hall & Evans

1001 17Th Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Robert Landon

Attorney at BCCF - Bent County Correctional Facility

11560 Road Ff75

Las Animas, CO 81054

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #4

Vol. 4-restricted document

Open Restricted Document #3

Vol. 3-pleadings

Open Restricted Document #2

Vol. 2-pleadings

Open Restricted Document #1

Vol. 1-pleadings

Open Document

[10736301] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and fee or 1915 forms due 06/08/2020 for Robert Landon. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 05/19/2020. [20-1123] [Entered: 04/28/2020 09:58 AM]

Open Document

[10732705] Order filed by Judge Tymkovich denying Appellant's motion to appoint attorney filed by Appellant Robert Landon. Served on 04/13/2020. [20-1123] Please see order for additional detailed information. [Entered: 04/13/2020 04:14 PM]

Open Document

[10732688] Appellant's motion filed by Robert Landon to appoint attorney. Served on 04/04/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1123] [Entered: 04/13/2020 03:53 PM]

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10730498] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Edmund Martin Kennedy and Mr. Andrew David Ringel, Esq. for Holly Blumer. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/03/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1123] [Entered: 04/03/2020 12:32 PM]

Open Document #2

New General Dkt Letter - Pro Se

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10736538] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 4, Comments: Vol. 1-pleadings; Vol. 2-pleadings; Vol. 3-pleadings; Vol. 4-restricted document. [20-1123] [Entered: 04/29/2020 08:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10736301] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and fee or 1915 forms due 06/08/2020 for Robert Landon. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 05/19/2020. [20-1123] [Entered: 04/28/2020 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10732705] Order filed by Judge Tymkovich denying Appellant's motion to appoint attorney filed by Appellant Robert Landon. Served on 04/13/2020. [20-1123] Please see order for additional detailed information. [Entered: 04/13/2020 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10732688] Appellant's motion filed by Robert Landon to appoint attorney. Served on 04/04/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1123] [Entered: 04/13/2020 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10732687] Entry of appearance filed by Robert Landon. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/06/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-1123] [Entered: 04/13/2020 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10730498] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Edmund Martin Kennedy and Mr. Andrew David Ringel, Esq. for Holly Blumer. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/03/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1123] [Entered: 04/03/2020 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • Docket[10730486] Entry of appearance submitted by Andrew D. Ringel and Edmund M. Kennedy for Appellee Holly Blumer for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/03/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 04/03/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-1123] ADR [Entered: 04/03/2020 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10728560] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 03/26/2020. Notice of appearance due on 04/09/2020 for Holly Blumer, and Notice of appearance due on 04/27/2020 for Robert Landon. Fee or ifp forms due 04/27/2020 for Robert Landon [20-1123] [Entered: 03/26/2020 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CORRECTIONAL HEALTH PARTNERS LLC is a litigant