This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2019 at 06:11:07 (UTC).

Landmark American Insurance Co v. Lonergan Law Firm, P.L.L.C., et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 Landmark American Insurance Co filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lonergan Law Firm, P L L C . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-10385

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Intervenor Defendant / Appellants

TODD CRAIN

IMPROMPTU COMMUNICATIONS, L.L.C.

JAMES L. SPRINGER, JR.

CHRISTOPHER DILLON SNELL

BRIAN LOCKHART

Plaintiff / Appellee

LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Bryan Taylor Davis

Attorney at Kelly, Hart & Hallman, L.L.P.

201 Main Street

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Caitlyn Hubbard

Attorney at Kelly, Hart & Hallman, L.L.P.

201 Main Street

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Joakim G. Soederbaum

Attorney at Kelly, Hart & Hallman, L.L.P.

201 Main Street

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Dee J. Kelly Jr.

Attorney at Kelly, Hart & Hallman, L.L.P.

201 Main Street

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

James Richard Harmon Esq.

Attorney at Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons, L.L.P.

700 N. Pearl Street, Plaza Of The Americas

Dallas, TX 75201-2832

Jo Allison Stasney Esq.

Attorney at Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons, L.L.P.

700 N. Pearl Street, Plaza Of The Americas

Dallas, TX 75201-2832

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10385] (Dee J. Kelly Jr.) [Entered: 05/28/2019 10:06 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10385] (Jo Allison Stasney ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:21 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10385] (Joakim G. Soederbaum ) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:02 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10385] (Caitlyn Hubbard ) [Entered: 05/24/2019 04:57 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Todd Crain, Impromptu Communications, L.L.C., Mr. Brian Lockhart, Mr. Christopher Dillon Snell and Mr. James L. Springer, Jr. [19-10385] (CBW) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:58 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9030040-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-10385] (CBW) [Entered: 04/16/2019 07:59 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/03/2019 for Appellants Todd Crain, Impromptu Communications, L.L.C., Brian Lockhart, Christopher Dillon Snell and James L. Springer Jr.. [19-10385] (AGL) [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:47 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Christopher Dillon Snell for filing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief of Appellants until 07/03/2019 [19-10385] (Bryan Taylor Davis ) [Entered: 05/24/2019 05:18 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Bryan Taylor Davis for Mr. Todd Crain, Impromptu Communications, L.L.C., Mr. Brian Lockhart, Mr. Christopher Dillon Snell and Mr. James L. Springer, Jr. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10385] (Bryan Taylor Davis ) [Entered: 04/30/2019 01:58 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Dee J. Kelly Jr. for party(s) Appellant Brian Lockhart Appellant Impromptu Communications, L.L.C. Appellant Christopher Dillon Snell Appellant Todd Crain Appellant James L. Springer Jr., in case 19-10385 [19-10385] (MVM) [Entered: 05/29/2019 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Mr. Todd Crain, Impromptu Communications, L.L.C., Mr. Brian Lockhart, Mr. Christopher Dillon Snell and Mr. James L. Springer, Jr.. Extension Granted to and including 07/03/2019. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 07/03/2019 for Appellants Todd Crain, Impromptu Communications, L.L.C., Brian Lockhart, Christopher Dillon Snell and James L. Springer Jr. [19-10385] (SDH) [Entered: 05/28/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Caitlyn Hubbard for party(s) Appellant Brian Lockhart Appellant Impromptu Communications, L.L.C. Appellant Christopher Dillon Snell Appellant Todd Crain Appellant James L. Springer Jr., in case 19-10385 [19-10385] (MRW) [Entered: 05/28/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10385] (Dee J. Kelly Jr.) [Entered: 05/28/2019 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Christopher Dillon Snell for filing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief of Appellants until 07/03/2019 [19-10385] (Bryan Taylor Davis ) [Entered: 05/24/2019 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10385] (Caitlyn Hubbard ) [Entered: 05/24/2019 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Joakim G. Soederbaum for party(s) Appellant Brian Lockhart Appellant Impromptu Communications, L.L.C. Appellant Christopher Dillon Snell Appellant Todd Crain Appellant James L. Springer Jr., in case 19-10385 [19-10385] (MVM) [Entered: 05/01/2019 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Bryan Taylor Davis for Appellant James L. Springer Jr. in 19-10385, Attorney Bryan Taylor Davis for Appellant Todd Crain in 19-10385, Attorney Bryan Taylor Davis for Appellant Impromptu Communications, L.L.C. in 19-10385, Attorney Bryan Taylor Davis for Appellant Brian Lockhart in 19-10385, Attorney Bryan Taylor Davis for Appellant Christopher Dillon Snell in 19-10385 [19-10385] (MVM) [Entered: 05/01/2019 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10385] (Joakim G. Soederbaum ) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Bryan Taylor Davis for Mr. Todd Crain, Impromptu Communications, L.L.C., Mr. Brian Lockhart, Mr. Christopher Dillon Snell and Mr. James L. Springer, Jr. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10385] (Bryan Taylor Davis ) [Entered: 04/30/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/03/2019 for Appellants Todd Crain, Impromptu Communications, L.L.C., Brian Lockhart, Christopher Dillon Snell and James L. Springer Jr.. [19-10385] (AGL) [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-10385] (AGL) [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jo Allison Stasney for party(s) Appellee Landmark American Insurance Company, in case 19-10385 [19-10385] (MVM) [Entered: 04/24/2019 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10385] (Jo Allison Stasney ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:17-CV-278. Electronic ROA due on 05/01/2019. [19-10385] (CBW) [Entered: 04/16/2019 08:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9030040-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-10385] (CBW) [Entered: 04/16/2019 07:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Todd Crain, Impromptu Communications, L.L.C., Mr. Brian Lockhart, Mr. Christopher Dillon Snell and Mr. James L. Springer, Jr. [19-10385] (CBW) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.