This case was last updated from PACER on 02/24/2020 at 06:04:12 (UTC).

Lana Starkey v. Amber Enterprises, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 12/26/2019 Lana Starkey filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Amber Enterprises, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3757

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

Hy-Vee, Inc., a Corporation

Mike Agostino, Individually

Plaintiff / Appellant

Lana L. Starkey

Defendant / Appellee

Amber Enterprises, Inc., a Corporation, doing business as Amber Pharmacy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jamie M. Hurst

Attorney at WALENTINE & O'TOOLE

11240 Davenport Street

Omaha, NE 68154-0125

Raymond Ralph Aranza

Attorney at WALENTINE & O'TOOLE

11240 Davenport Street

Omaha, NE 68154-0125

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher M. Schmidt

Attorney at BAYLOR & EVNEN

Wells Fargo Center, Suite 600, 1248 O Street

Lincoln, NE 68508-0000

Torrey L. J. Gerdes

Attorney at BAYLOR & EVNEN

Wells Fargo Center, Suite 600, 1248 O Street

Lincoln, NE 68508-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4882962-2 ] motion to seal filed by Ms. Torrey L. J. Gerdes. The Court is hereby sealing the following: Brief, addendum and appendix of appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc in 19-3688. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Amber Enterprises, Inc. due 02/24/2020 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Disc for sealed brief/addendum due 02/24/2020. [4882971] [19-3688, 19-3757] --[Edited 02/20/2020 by BNW to correct docket text] (BNW) [Entered: 02/19/2020 03:36 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to seal brief, addendum and appendix, filed by Attorney Ms. Torrey L. J. Gerdes for Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3688, Attorney Ms. Torrey L. J. Gerdes for Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3757 w/service 02/19/2020. [4882962] [19-3688, 19-3757] (BNW) [Entered: 02/19/2020 03:28 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Christopher M. Schmidt for Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc. w/service 01/02/2020 [4867085] [19-3757] (CMS) [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:13 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4867084] [19-3757] (TLG) [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:11 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Torrey J. Gerdes for Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc. w/service 01/02/2020 [4867083] [19-3757] (TLG) [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:09 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Jamie M. Hurst for Appellant Lana L. Starkey w/service 01/02/2020 [4866853] [19-3757] (RRA) [Entered: 01/02/2020 11:07 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Raymond R. Aranza for Appellant Lana L. Starkey w/service 01/02/2020 [4866851] [19-3757] (RRA) [Entered: 01/02/2020 11:05 AM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record and STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Lana L. Starkey in 19-3757, Appellee Lana L. Starkey in 19-3688. w/service 01/07/2020 [4868611] [19-3757, 19-3688] --[Edited 01/08/2020 by BNW to include relief statement of issues] (RRA) [Entered: 01/07/2020 03:52 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Lana L. Starkey in 19-3757, Appellee Lana L. Starkey in 19-3688. No Transcript[4868604] [19-3757, 19-3688] (RRA) [Entered: 01/07/2020 03:50 PM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3688, Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3757. w/service 12/31/2019 [4866622] [19-3688, 19-3757] (TLG) [Entered: 12/31/2019 04:25 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3688, Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3757 - w/service 12/31/2019. [4866620] [19-3688, 19-3757] (TLG) [Entered: 12/31/2019 04:09 PM]

Open Document

CROSS APPEAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: BRIEF OF APPELLANT Amber Enterprises, Inc. due 01/27/2020. Appendix due on 01/27/2020. Appellee/cross Appellant brief due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant's brief. [4865217] [19-3688, 19-3757] (AEV) [Entered: 12/26/2019 09:33 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of cross-appeal, Memorandum and Order 11/15/19, Judgment 11/15/19, docket entries, [4865215] [19-3757] (AEV) [Entered: 12/26/2019 09:30 AM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4865210] [19-3757] (AEV) [Entered: 12/26/2019 09:24 AM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketPaper copies SEALED Appellant Brief, [4882981-2] filed by Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3688. 10 paper copies received w/Addendum attached. Brief of Lana L. Starkey due 03/23/2020. [4883788] [19-3688, 19-3757] (BNW) [Entered: 02/21/2020 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketRECORD FILED - SEALED APPENDIX, 4 volumes. 1 boxes. Comments: SEALED Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. Appendix in 19-3688- 4 volumes, 3 copies per volume in 1 box. Source Location: St. Louis. [4882998] [19-3688, 19-3757] (BNW) [Entered: 02/19/2020 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketSEALED ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3688 w/service 02/19/2020. THIS ADDENDUM IS FILED UNDER SEAL AND IS NOT AVAILABLE ON PACER. [4882985] [19-3688, 19-3757] (BNW) [Entered: 02/19/2020 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketSEALED BRIEF FILED - SEALED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3688 w/service 02/19/2020. Length: 12,993 words. THIS BRIEF IS FILED UNDER SEAL AND IS NOT AVAILABLE ON PACER. Appellee's brief deadline will be set based on the certificate of service in the appellant's paper briefs. [4882981] [19-3688, 19-3757] (BNW) [Entered: 02/19/2020 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4882962-2 ] motion to seal filed by Ms. Torrey L. J. Gerdes. The Court is hereby sealing the following: Brief, addendum and appendix of appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc in 19-3688. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Amber Enterprises, Inc. due 02/24/2020 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Disc for sealed brief/addendum due 02/24/2020. [4882971] [19-3688, 19-3757] --[Edited 02/20/2020 by BNW to correct docket text] (BNW) [Entered: 02/19/2020 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to seal brief, addendum and appendix, filed by Attorney Ms. Torrey L. J. Gerdes for Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3688, Attorney Ms. Torrey L. J. Gerdes for Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3757 w/service 02/19/2020. [4882962] [19-3688, 19-3757] (BNW) [Entered: 02/19/2020 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of record and STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Lana L. Starkey in 19-3757, Appellee Lana L. Starkey in 19-3688. w/service 01/07/2020 [4868611] [19-3757, 19-3688] --[Edited 01/08/2020 by BNW to include relief statement of issues] (RRA) [Entered: 01/07/2020 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellant Lana L. Starkey in 19-3757, Appellee Lana L. Starkey in 19-3688. No Transcript[4868604] [19-3757, 19-3688] (RRA) [Entered: 01/07/2020 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Christopher M. Schmidt for Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc. w/service 01/02/2020 [4867085] [19-3757] (CMS) [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4867084] [19-3757] (TLG) [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Torrey J. Gerdes for Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc. w/service 01/02/2020 [4867083] [19-3757] (TLG) [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Jamie M. Hurst for Appellant Lana L. Starkey w/service 01/02/2020 [4866853] [19-3757] (RRA) [Entered: 01/02/2020 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Raymond R. Aranza for Appellant Lana L. Starkey w/service 01/02/2020 [4866851] [19-3757] (RRA) [Entered: 01/02/2020 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3688, Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3757. w/service 12/31/2019 [4866622] [19-3688, 19-3757] (TLG) [Entered: 12/31/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3688, Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3757 - w/service 12/31/2019. [4866620] [19-3688, 19-3757] (TLG) [Entered: 12/31/2019 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS APPEAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: BRIEF OF APPELLANT Amber Enterprises, Inc. due 01/27/2020. Appendix due on 01/27/2020. Appellee/cross Appellant brief due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant's brief. [4865217] [19-3688, 19-3757] (AEV) [Entered: 12/26/2019 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of cross-appeal, Memorandum and Order 11/15/19, Judgment 11/15/19, docket entries, [4865215] [19-3757] (AEV) [Entered: 12/26/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4865210] [19-3757] (AEV) [Entered: 12/26/2019 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hy-Vee, Inc. is a litigant