This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/15/2020 at 06:03:55 (UTC).

Lana Starkey v. Amber Enterprises, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Lana Starkey filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Amber Enterprises, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3688

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendants

Hy-Vee, Inc., a Corporation

Mike Agostino, Individually

Plaintiff / Appellee

Lana L. Starkey

Defendant / Appellant

Amber Enterprises, Inc., a Corporation, doing business as Amber Pharmacy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jamie M. Hurst

Attorney at WALENTINE & O'TOOLE

11240 Davenport Street

Omaha, NE 68154-0125

Raymond Ralph Aranza

Attorney at WALENTINE & O'TOOLE

11240 Davenport Street

Omaha, NE 68154-0125

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Torrey L. J. Gerdes

Attorney at BAYLOR & EVNEN

Wells Fargo Center, Suite 600, 1248 O Street

Lincoln, NE 68508-0000

Christopher M. Schmidt

Attorney at BAYLOR & EVNEN

Wells Fargo Center, Suite 600, 1248 O Street

Lincoln, NE 68508-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: Appellants motion for an extension of time to file its opening brief is granted to February 18, 2020 [ # 4871104-2 ]. Appendix due on 02/18/2020. Appellee/cross-appellants brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing appellants opening brief. [4871207] [19-3688] (BNW) [Entered: 01/14/2020 02:22 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 02/18/2020, filed by Attorney Ms. Torrey L. J. Gerdes for Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3688, Attorney Ms. Torrey L. J. Gerdes for Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3757 w/service 01/14/2020. [4871104] [19-3688]--[Edited to remove filing from associated case 01/14/2020 by AMT] (TLG) [Entered: 01/14/2020 12:19 PM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record and STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Lana L. Starkey in 19-3757, Appellee Lana L. Starkey in 19-3688. w/service 01/07/2020 [4868611] [19-3757, 19-3688] --[Edited 01/08/2020 by BNW to include relief statement of issues] (RRA) [Entered: 01/07/2020 03:52 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Lana L. Starkey in 19-3757, Appellee Lana L. Starkey in 19-3688. No Transcript[4868604] [19-3757, 19-3688] (RRA) [Entered: 01/07/2020 03:50 PM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3688, Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3757. w/service 12/31/2019 [4866622] [19-3688, 19-3757] (TLG) [Entered: 12/31/2019 04:25 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3688, Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3757 - w/service 12/31/2019. [4866620] [19-3688, 19-3757] (TLG) [Entered: 12/31/2019 04:09 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc.. No Transcript[4865106] [19-3688] (TLG) [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:01 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Raymond R. Aranza for Appellee Lana L. Starkey w/service 12/23/2019 [4864904] [19-3688] (RRA) [Entered: 12/23/2019 01:10 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Jamie M. Hurst for Appellee Lana L. Starkey w/service 12/23/2019 [4864902] [19-3688] (RRA) [Entered: 12/23/2019 01:09 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4864754] [19-3688] (TLG) [Entered: 12/23/2019 10:40 AM]

Open Document

CROSS APPEAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: BRIEF OF APPELLANT Amber Enterprises, Inc. due 01/27/2020. Appendix due on 01/27/2020. Appellee/cross Appellant brief due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant's brief. [4865217] [19-3688, 19-3757] (AEV) [Entered: 12/26/2019 09:33 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Christopher M. Schmidt for Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. w/service 12/17/2019 [4862774] [19-3688] (CMS) [Entered: 12/17/2019 02:53 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Torrey J. Gerdes for Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. w/service 12/17/2019 [4862772] [19-3688] (TLG) [Entered: 12/17/2019 02:50 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 01/27/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Amber Enterprises, Inc. due 01/27/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4862432] [19-3688] (AEV) [Entered: 12/17/2019 08:57 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Memorandum and Order 11/15/19, Judgment 11/15/19, docket entries, [4862402] [19-3688]--[Edited 12/17/2019 by AEV] (AEV) [Entered: 12/17/2019 08:26 AM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Civil Docketing Letter

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: Appellants motion for an extension of time to file its opening brief is granted to February 18, 2020 [ # 4871104-2 ]. Appendix due on 02/18/2020. Appellee/cross-appellants brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing appellants opening brief. [4871207] [19-3688] (BNW) [Entered: 01/14/2020 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief until 02/18/2020, filed by Attorney Ms. Torrey L. J. Gerdes for Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3688, Attorney Ms. Torrey L. J. Gerdes for Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3757 w/service 01/14/2020. [4871104] [19-3688]--[Edited to remove filing from associated case 01/14/2020 by AMT] (TLG) [Entered: 01/14/2020 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of record and STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Lana L. Starkey in 19-3757, Appellee Lana L. Starkey in 19-3688. w/service 01/07/2020 [4868611] [19-3757, 19-3688] --[Edited 01/08/2020 by BNW to include relief statement of issues] (RRA) [Entered: 01/07/2020 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellant Lana L. Starkey in 19-3757, Appellee Lana L. Starkey in 19-3688. No Transcript[4868604] [19-3757, 19-3688] (RRA) [Entered: 01/07/2020 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3688, Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3757. w/service 12/31/2019 [4866622] [19-3688, 19-3757] (TLG) [Entered: 12/31/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3688, Appellee Amber Enterprises, Inc. in 19-3757 - w/service 12/31/2019. [4866620] [19-3688, 19-3757] (TLG) [Entered: 12/31/2019 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS APPEAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: BRIEF OF APPELLANT Amber Enterprises, Inc. due 01/27/2020. Appendix due on 01/27/2020. Appellee/cross Appellant brief due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant's brief. [4865217] [19-3688, 19-3757] (AEV) [Entered: 12/26/2019 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. - Separate Appendix - w/service 12/23/2019 [4865109] [19-3688] (TLG) [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc.. No Transcript[4865106] [19-3688] (TLG) [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Raymond R. Aranza for Appellee Lana L. Starkey w/service 12/23/2019 [4864904] [19-3688] (RRA) [Entered: 12/23/2019 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Jamie M. Hurst for Appellee Lana L. Starkey w/service 12/23/2019 [4864902] [19-3688] (RRA) [Entered: 12/23/2019 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4864754] [19-3688] (TLG) [Entered: 12/23/2019 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Christopher M. Schmidt for Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. w/service 12/17/2019 [4862774] [19-3688] (CMS) [Entered: 12/17/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Torrey J. Gerdes for Appellant Amber Enterprises, Inc. w/service 12/17/2019 [4862772] [19-3688] (TLG) [Entered: 12/17/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 01/27/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Amber Enterprises, Inc. due 01/27/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4862432] [19-3688] (AEV) [Entered: 12/17/2019 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Memorandum and Order 11/15/19, Judgment 11/15/19, docket entries, [4862402] [19-3688]--[Edited 12/17/2019 by AEV] (AEV) [Entered: 12/17/2019 08:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4862396] [19-3688] (AEV) [Entered: 12/17/2019 08:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amber Enterprises, Inc., a Corporation, doing business as Amber Pharmacy is a litigant

Latest cases where Hy-Vee, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Torrey L. J. Gerdes