This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2019 at 10:07:20 (UTC).

Lamont Zamichieli v. Pennsylvania Department of Cor, et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 a Prisoner - Prison Condition case was filed by Lamont Zamichieli against Pennsylvania Department of Cor in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3305

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MIKE HICE

PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

NATALIE AUSTIN

ROBERT VALLEY

LORI RIDINGS

Plaintiff / Appellant

LAMONT ZAMICHIELI

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Clerk IFP PLRA Order - Listing for 1915

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

Open Document

ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellee Robert Valley to summarily affirm. Certificate of Service dated 12/04/2019. Service made by ECF, US mail. [19-3305] (JBL) [Entered: 12/04/2019 10:17 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alan S Gold on behalf of Appellee(s) Natalie Austin, PA, Mike Hice, Lori Ridings, CRNP. [19-3305] (ASG) [Entered: 10/10/2019 10:23 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J. Brian Lynn, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Dr. Robert Valley. [19-3305] (JBL) [Entered: 10/14/2019 02:02 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #7

Case Opening Letter

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Lamont Zamichieli for Extension of Time to File for In Forma Pauperis and submit Certified Copy of Account Statement. Response due on 11/04/2019. Certificate of Service dated 10/22/2019. Service made by US mail. (CLW) [Entered: 11/06/2019 11:00 AM]

Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) To facilitate electronic filing for larger groups of parties represented by the same attorney, the first named party in each group will be the designated filer, as follows; For all parties represented by Scott A. Bradley, Esq., or any other attorney from the Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General, the designated filer shall be the Pennsylvania Department of Corrections. Counsel is advised that the designated filer is for cm/ecf filing purposes only, Names of all represented parties must be listed on all forms, motions and briefs. Attorneys representing smaller groups of parties must select all individual persons or entities as filer in cm/ecf. (CLW) [Entered: 10/09/2019 04:25 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel B. Mullen on behalf of Appellee(s) PA Dept. of Corrections, William Nicholson, Tina Staley, Mr. Spiker, CO Liptak, CO Price, Karen Sokol, Mark DiAlesandro, Dan Caro, Robert Gilmore, Tracy Shawley. [19-3305] (DBM) [Entered: 11/06/2019 04:29 PM]

Open Document #4

District Court Judgment

Open Document #6

Standing Order Excess Pagination

Open Document #5

Caption

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Scott A. Bradley, Esq. for Pennsylvania Department of Corrections requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 11/20/2019. (CLW) [Entered: 11/06/2019 11:02 AM]

Open Document #2

Warden Letter

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellee Robert Valley to summarily affirm. Certificate of Service dated 12/04/2019. Service made by ECF, US mail. [19-3305] (JBL) [Entered: 12/04/2019 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Lamont Zamichieli. The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order; no action will be taken on motion for extension of time to file for IFP filed by Appellant Lamont Zamichieli, filed. (CLW) [Entered: 11/15/2019 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel B. Mullen on behalf of Appellee(s) PA Dept. of Corrections, William Nicholson, Tina Staley, Mr. Spiker, CO Liptak, CO Price, Karen Sokol, Mark DiAlesandro, Dan Caro, Robert Gilmore, Tracy Shawley. [19-3305] (DBM) [Entered: 11/06/2019 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Scott A. Bradley, Esq. for Pennsylvania Department of Corrections requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 11/20/2019. (CLW) [Entered: 11/06/2019 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Lamont Zamichieli for Extension of Time to File for In Forma Pauperis and submit Certified Copy of Account Statement. Response due on 11/04/2019. Certificate of Service dated 10/22/2019. Service made by US mail. (CLW) [Entered: 11/06/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Lamont Zamichieli, filed. (CLW) [Entered: 11/06/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER AUTHORIZATION on behalf of Appellant Lamont Zamichieli, filed. (CLW) [Entered: 11/06/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER ADDENDUM on behalf of Appellant Lamont Zamichieli, filed. (CLW) [Entered: 11/06/2019 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Lamont Zamichieli to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Response due on 11/04/2019. Certificate of Service dated 10/22/2019. Service made by US mail. (CLW) [Entered: 11/06/2019 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J. Brian Lynn, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Dr. Robert Valley. [19-3305] (JBL) [Entered: 10/14/2019 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alan S Gold on behalf of Appellee(s) Natalie Austin, PA, Mike Hice, Lori Ridings, CRNP. [19-3305] (ASG) [Entered: 10/10/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) To facilitate electronic filing for larger groups of parties represented by the same attorney, the first named party in each group will be the designated filer, as follows; For all parties represented by Scott A. Bradley, Esq., or any other attorney from the Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General, the designated filer shall be the Pennsylvania Department of Corrections. Counsel is advised that the designated filer is for cm/ecf filing purposes only, Names of all represented parties must be listed on all forms, motions and briefs. Attorneys representing smaller groups of parties must select all individual persons or entities as filer in cm/ecf. (CLW) [Entered: 10/09/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CLW) [Entered: 10/09/2019 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Lamont Zamichieli in District Court No. 2-17-cv-00742. (CLW) [Entered: 10/09/2019 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.