Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/27/2021 at 06:02:22 (UTC).

Laborers' Union Local 872, et al v. City of Las Vegas, et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 Laborers' Union Local 872 filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Las Vegas. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15772

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CITY OF LAS VEGAS

STEVE SEROKA

JAMES ROBERT COFFIN

Plaintiff / Appellants

LABORERS' INTERNATIONAL UNION NORTH AMERICA, LOCAL 872

THOMAS M. WHITE, AKA Tommy M. White

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Bradford Jerbic Esquire

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY

495 South Main Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Philip Byrnes Esquire

Attorney at Las Vegas City Attorney's Office

495 South Main Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Rebecca L. Wolfson

Attorney at Las Vegas City Attorney's Office

495 S Main Street, 6Th Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Bryan Keith Scott Esquire

Attorney at Las Vegas City Attorney's Office

495 S Main Street, 6Th Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Peter Maitland Angulo Esquire

Attorney at Angulo Law Group, LLC

5545 S Mountain Vista Street, Suite F

Las Vegas, NV 89120

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Rusty Graf

Attorney at Black & LoBello

10777 West Twain Avenue, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89135

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12137532] (BLS) [Entered: 06/08/2021 12:58 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 05/24/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12108000] (BLS) [Entered: 05/10/2021 02:57 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872 and Thomas M. White Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/06/2021. [12104167] [21-15772] (Graf, Rusty) [Entered: 05/06/2021 09:54 AM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#9) Attorney Bradford Jerbic in 21-15772 substituted by Attorney Bryan Keith Scott in 21-15772 [12154134] (QDL) [Entered: 06/25/2021 08:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Bryan K. Scott (Las Vegas City Attorney's Office, 495 South Main Street, Sixth Floor, Las Vegas, NV 89101) for Appellee City of Las Vegas. Substitution for Attorney Bradford Jerbic, Esquire for Appellee City of Las Vegas. Date of service: 06/24/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12153993] [21-15772] (Scott, Bryan) [Entered: 06/24/2021 06:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Rebecca L. Wolfson for party(s) Appellee City of Las Vegas, in case 21-15772. [12139551] (QDL) [Entered: 06/09/2021 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Rebecca Wolfson (Las Vegas City Attorney's Office, 495 South Main Street, Sixth Floor, Las Vegas, NV 89101) for Appellee City of Las Vegas. Date of service: 06/09/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12139505] [21-15772] (Wolfson, Rebecca) [Entered: 06/09/2021 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12137532] (BLS) [Entered: 06/08/2021 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 05/24/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12108000] (BLS) [Entered: 05/10/2021 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/06/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12104600]. [21-15772] (AD) [Entered: 05/06/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872 and Thomas M. White Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/06/2021. [12104167] [21-15772] (Graf, Rusty) [Entered: 05/06/2021 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872 and Thomas M. White Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/05/2021. Transcript ordered by 05/27/2021. Transcript due 06/28/2021. Appellants Laborers' International Union North America, Local 872 and Thomas M. White opening brief due 08/05/2021. Appellees City of Las Vegas, James Robert Coffin and Steve Seroka answering brief due 09/07/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12089495] (JBS) [Entered: 04/28/2021 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Laborers' International Union of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rusty Graf