Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2020 at 06:08:11 (UTC).

Laborers' International Union, et al v. Wright Traffic Control, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 Laborers' International Union filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Wright Traffic Control, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3640

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LABORERS' INTERNATIONAL UNION OF NORTH AMERICA, LOCAL 423

LABORERS' INTERNATIONAL UNION OF NORTH AMERICA, LOCAL 265

Defendant / Appellees

WRIGHT TRAFFIC CONTROL, INC.

W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

LABORERS' INTERNATIONAL UNION OF NORTH AMERICA, LOCAL 894

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David A. Kadela

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

21 E. State Street, Suite 1600

Columbus, OH 43215

Philip A. Miscimarra

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius

77 W. Wacker Drive, 5Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Wonho John Lee

Attorney at Morgan Lewis

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

David Dziengowski

Attorney at Morgan Lewis

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Andrew L. Gniewek

Attorney at Morgan Lewis

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Ryan Keith Hymore

Attorney at Mangano Law Offices

3805 Edwards Road, Suite 550

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Basil W. Mangano

Attorney at Mangano Law Offices

2460 Fairmount Boulevard, Suite 225

Cleveland, OH 44106

 

Court Documents

17 #2

Clerk Order-Stipulation Dismiss R33

17 #1

Cover Letter

#16

(#16) STIPULATION filed to dismiss pursuant to FRAP 42 and local rule 33. Stipulation filed by Attorney David Dziengowski for Appellee W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.. Certificate of Service: 07/24/2020. [20-3640] (DD) [Entered: 07/24/2020 02:59 PM]

#15

(#15) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Ryan Keith Hymore for Appellant Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 894. Certificate of Service:07/02/2020. [20-3640] (RKH) [Entered: 07/02/2020 04:57 PM]

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Ryan Keith Hymore for Appellant Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 894 Certificate of Service: 07/02/2020. [20-3640] (RKH) [Entered: 07/02/2020 04:50 PM]

#13

(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 894 by Ryan Keith Hymore. Certificate of Service: 07/02/2020. [20-3640] (RKH) [Entered: 07/02/2020 04:48 PM]

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. David A. Kadela for Appellee Wright Traffic Control, Inc. Certificate of Service: 07/02/2020. [20-3640] (DAK) [Entered: 07/02/2020 11:37 AM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Wright Traffic Control, Inc. by David A. Kadela. Certificate of Service: 07/02/2020. [20-3640] (DAK) [Entered: 07/02/2020 11:31 AM]

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Philip A. Miscimarra for Appellee W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc. Certificate of Service: 07/02/2020. [20-3640] (PAM) [Entered: 07/02/2020 10:51 AM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc. and Wright Traffic Control, Inc. by W. John Lee. Certificate of Service: 06/29/2020. [20-3640] (WJL) [Entered: 06/29/2020 03:18 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc. and Wright Traffic Control, Inc. by Andrew L. Gniewek. Certificate of Service: 06/29/2020. [20-3640] (ALG) [Entered: 06/29/2020 03:14 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc. and Wright Traffic Control, Inc. by Philip A. Miscimarra. Certificate of Service: 06/29/2020. [20-3640] (PAM) [Entered: 06/29/2020 03:11 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc. and Wright Traffic Control, Inc. by David C. Dziengowski. Certificate of Service: 06/29/2020. [20-3640] (DD) [Entered: 06/29/2020 03:07 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 06/19/2020 02:40 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 07/28/2020;. appellee brief due 08/27/2020; (JEC) [Entered: 06/18/2020 11:08 AM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 894. Transcript needed: n. (JEC) [Entered: 06/18/2020 11:03 AM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER filed granting stipulation to dismiss case - mediation [ # 16 ] filed by David Dziengowski. Entered by order of the court. (CAW) [Entered: 07/24/2020 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION filed to dismiss pursuant to FRAP 42 and local rule 33. Stipulation filed by Attorney David Dziengowski for Appellee W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.. Certificate of Service: 07/24/2020. [20-3640] (DD) [Entered: 07/24/2020 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Ryan Keith Hymore for Appellant Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 894. Certificate of Service:07/02/2020. [20-3640] (RKH) [Entered: 07/02/2020 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Ryan Keith Hymore for Appellant Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 894 Certificate of Service: 07/02/2020. [20-3640] (RKH) [Entered: 07/02/2020 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 894 by Ryan Keith Hymore. Certificate of Service: 07/02/2020. [20-3640] (RKH) [Entered: 07/02/2020 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. David A. Kadela for Appellee Wright Traffic Control, Inc. Certificate of Service: 07/02/2020. [20-3640] (DAK) [Entered: 07/02/2020 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Wright Traffic Control, Inc. by David A. Kadela. Certificate of Service: 07/02/2020. [20-3640] (DAK) [Entered: 07/02/2020 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Philip A. Miscimarra for Appellee W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc. Certificate of Service: 07/02/2020. [20-3640] (PAM) [Entered: 07/02/2020 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc. and Wright Traffic Control, Inc. by W. John Lee. Certificate of Service: 06/29/2020. [20-3640] (WJL) [Entered: 06/29/2020 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc. and Wright Traffic Control, Inc. by Andrew L. Gniewek. Certificate of Service: 06/29/2020. [20-3640] (ALG) [Entered: 06/29/2020 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc. and Wright Traffic Control, Inc. by Philip A. Miscimarra. Certificate of Service: 06/29/2020. [20-3640] (PAM) [Entered: 06/29/2020 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc. and Wright Traffic Control, Inc. by David C. Dziengowski. Certificate of Service: 06/29/2020. [20-3640] (DD) [Entered: 06/29/2020 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 06/19/2020 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • Docket(#4) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 06/19/2020 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 07/28/2020;. appellee brief due 08/27/2020; (JEC) [Entered: 06/18/2020 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Jill Colyer (JEC) [Entered: 06/18/2020 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 894. Transcript needed: n. (JEC) [Entered: 06/18/2020 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Laborers' International Union of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Keith Hymore

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Basil W Mangano