This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/12/2022 at 16:08:21 (UTC).

La Clinica De La Raza, et al v. Donald Trump, et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 La Clinica De La Raza filed an Other lawsuit against Donald Trump. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-17483

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

FARMWORKER JUSTICE

LEGAL AID SOCIETY OF SAN MATEO COUNTY

MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH ACCESS

AFRICAN COMMUNITIES TOGETHER

LA CLINICA DE LA RAZA, INC.

COUNCIL ON AMERICAN ISLAMIC RELATIONS - CALIFORNIA

KOREAN RESOURCE CENTER

CALIFORNIA PRIMARY CARE ASSOCIATION

CENTRAL AMERICAN RESOURCE CENTER

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

DONALD J. TRUMP, in his Official Capacity as President of the United States

KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, in his Official Capacity as Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, in his Official Capacity as Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security

CHAD F. WOLF, in his Official Capacity as Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Tanya Broder

Attorney at National Immigration Law Center

2030 Addison Street

Berkeley, CA 94704

Nicholas David Espiritu

Attorney at National Immigration Law Center

3450 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 108-62

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Alvaro M. Huerta

Attorney at National Immigration Law Center

3450 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 108-62

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Mayra Beatriz Joachin

Attorney at National Immigration Law Center

3450 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 108-62

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Linton Joaquin Esquire

Attorney at National Immigration Law Center

3450 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 108-62

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Max Wolson

P.O. Box No. 34573

Washington, DC 20043

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Joshua M. Kolsky

Attorney at US Department of Justice

1100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Ethan Price Davis

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Joshua Dos Santos

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Eric Soskin

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

1100 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Daniel Tenny

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#4

#7

#9

10 #1

Main Document

10 #2

Declaration of Nicholas Espiritu

#11

#12

#13

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • Docket(#14) Appellee Kevin K. McAleenan in 19-17483 substituted by Appellee Chad F. Wolf in 19-17483 [11911964] (SLM) [Entered: 12/02/2020 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: LK) Appellants unopposed motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 12 ]) for voluntary dismissal is granted. This appeal is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. [11584182] (OC) [Entered: 02/04/2020 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellants African Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations - California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Inc., Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County and Maternal and Child Health Access Unopposed Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 02/03/2020. [11582779] [19-17483] (Espiritu, Nicholas) [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): (ECF Filing) filed by Appellants California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations - California, La Clinica De La Raza, Inc., Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Farmworker Justice, Maternal and Child Health Access, African Communities Together and Korean Resource Center; Granting Motion [ # 10 ](ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellants California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations - California, La Clinica De La Raza, Inc., Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Farmworker Justice, Maternal and Child Health Access, African Communities Together and Korean Resource Center. Appellants African Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations - California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Inc., Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County and Maternal and Child Health Access opening brief due 02/07/2020. Appellees Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services answering brief due 03/09/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11546877] (LKK) [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellants African Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations - California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Inc., Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County and Maternal and Child Health Access Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 02/07/2020. Date of service: 12/27/2019. [11545237] [19-17483] (Espiritu, Nicholas) [Entered: 12/27/2019 12:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11541544] (LW) [Entered: 12/23/2019 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket(#8) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/16/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11534432]. [19-17483] (AD) [Entered: 12/17/2019 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellants African Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations - California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Inc., Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County and Maternal and Child Health Access Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/16/2019. [11534393] [19-17483] (Espiritu, Nicholas) [Entered: 12/16/2019 07:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#6) Added Attorney(s) Joshua Dos Santos for party(s) Appellee USDHS, Appellee Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Appellee Kevin K. McAleenan, Appellee Donald J. Trump and Appellee USCIS, in case 19-17483. [11530388] (QDL) [Entered: 12/12/2019 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joshua Yrion Dos Santos (U.S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Washington DC 20530) for Appellees Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, Donald J. Trump, USCIS and USDHS. Date of service: 12/12/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11530374] [19-17483] (Dos Santos, Joshua) [Entered: 12/12/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: tsp): The appeal filed December 10, 2019 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than January 7, 2020; the answering brief is due February 4, 2020 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [11530158] (HC) [Entered: 12/12/2019 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Daniel Tenny for party(s) Appellee USDHS, Appellee Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Appellee Kevin K. McAleenan, Appellee Donald J. Trump and Appellee USCIS, in case 19-17483. [11529022] (QDL) [Entered: 12/11/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel Tenny (U.S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20530) for Appellees Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, Donald J. Trump, USCIS and USDHS. Date of service: 12/11/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11529004] [19-17483] (Tenny, Daniel) [Entered: 12/11/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: To be set. Preliminary Injunction, C.R. 3-3. [11528458] (JBS) [Entered: 12/11/2019 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS CONNECTICUT is a litigant

Latest cases where Maternal and Child Health Access is a litigant

Latest cases where La Clinica De La Raza is a litigant