This case was last updated from PACER on 05/12/2019 at 06:09:13 (UTC).

L. Rascon, et al v. Clinton Brookins, et al

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 L Rascon filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Clinton Brookins. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-15448

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

STEVEN SQUIER, # 9147

CITY OF PHOENIX

JEREMY KING, # 9144

NICHOLAS R. WELCH, # 9374

TASER INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellees

JUAN A. SANCHEZ

L. ALICIA RASCON, individually, and as the personal representative of estate of Jorge E. Sanchez

TONI MARQUIS, as the Parent and Next Friend of next friend of A.M.

Defendant / Appellant

CLINTON H. BROOKINS, # 9452

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Devon M. Jacob Esquire

Attorney at Jacob Litigation

P.O. Box 837

Mechanicsburg, PA 17055-0837

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Joseph J. Popolizio Esquire

Attorney at Jones, Skelton & Hochuli, P.L.C.

40 N. Central Avenue, Suite 2700

Phoenix, AZ 85004

John Thomas Masterson

Attorney at Jones, Skelton & Hochuli, P.L.C.

40 N. Central Avenue, Suite 2700

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Justin Michael Ackerman Esquire

Attorney at Jones, Skelton & Hochuli, P.L.C.

40 N. Central Avenue, Suite 2700

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 04/09/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in these matters are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11240488] [19-15361, 19-15448, 19-15449] (VS) [Entered: 03/25/2019 10:19 AM]

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#8

(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 05/16/2019, 3:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [11269231] [19-15361, 19-15448, 19-15449] (VS) [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:38 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant L. Alicia Rascon in 19-15361, Appellee L. Alicia Rascon in 19-15448, 19-15449 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/19/2019. [11233471] [19-15361, 19-15448, 19-15449] (Jacob, Devon) [Entered: 03/19/2019 10:24 AM]

1 #4

Cross-Appeal Brief Chart

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Jeremy King, Steven Squier and Nicholas R. Welch in 19-15449 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/20/2019. [11236699] [19-15361, 19-15448, 19-15449] (Zoellner, Tara) [Entered: 03/20/2019 09:57 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Clinton H. Brookins in 19-15448 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/20/2019. [11236454] [19-15448, 19-15361, 19-15449] (Ackerman, Justin) [Entered: 03/20/2019 04:07 PM]

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#9

(#9) Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: First cross appeal brief due July 12, 2019 for Toni Marquis, L. Alicia Rascon and Juan A. Sanchez. Second brief on cross appeal due August 12, 2019 for Clinton H. Brookins, Jeremy King, Steven Squier and Nicholas R. Welch. Third brief on cross appeal due September 12, 2019 for L. Alicia Rascon, Juan A. Sanchez and Toni Marquis. Optional cross appeal reply brief is due within 21 days of service of third brief on cross appeal. [11269343] [19-15361, 19-15448, 19-15449] (OC) [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:04 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: First cross appeal brief due July 12, 2019 for Toni Marquis, L. Alicia Rascon and Juan A. Sanchez. Second brief on cross appeal due August 12, 2019 for Clinton H. Brookins, Jeremy King, Steven Squier and Nicholas R. Welch. Third brief on cross appeal due September 12, 2019 for L. Alicia Rascon, Juan A. Sanchez and Toni Marquis. Optional cross appeal reply brief is due within 21 days of service of third brief on cross appeal. [11269343] [19-15361, 19-15448, 19-15449] (OC) [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 05/16/2019, 3:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [11269231] [19-15361, 19-15448, 19-15449] (VS) [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 04/09/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in these matters are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11240488] [19-15361, 19-15448, 19-15449] (VS) [Entered: 03/25/2019 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Jeremy King, Steven Squier and Nicholas R. Welch in 19-15449 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/20/2019. [11236699] [19-15361, 19-15448, 19-15449] (Zoellner, Tara) [Entered: 03/20/2019 09:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • (#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/20/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11236677] (AD) [Entered: 03/20/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Clinton H. Brookins in 19-15448 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/20/2019. [11236454] [19-15448, 19-15361, 19-15449] (Ackerman, Justin) [Entered: 03/20/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/19/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11233922] (AD) [Entered: 03/19/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant L. Alicia Rascon in 19-15361, Appellee L. Alicia Rascon in 19-15448, 19-15449 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/19/2019. [11233471] [19-15361, 19-15448, 19-15449] (Jacob, Devon) [Entered: 03/19/2019 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/20/2019. First cross appeal brief due 06/05/2019 for Toni Marquis, L. Alicia Rascon and Juan A. Sanchez. Second brief on cross appeal due 07/05/2019 for Clinton H. Brookins, Jeremy King, Steven Squier and Nicholas R. Welch. Third brief on cross appeal due 08/05/2019 for L. Alicia Rascon, Juan A. Sanchez and Toni Marquis. Optional cross appeal reply brief is due within 21 days of service of third brief on cross appeal. [11225724] [19-15449, 19-15361, 19-15448] (JBS) [Entered: 03/13/2019 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less