This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/15/2022 at 08:49:15 (UTC).

Kutt v. Apple Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 Kutt filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1757

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC.

NVIDIA CORPORATION

NOKIA CORPORATION

MR. STUART SMITH LLP

SONY CORPORATION

HTC CORPORATION

TOSHIBA CORPORATION

DELL INC.

MICROSOFT CORPORATION

VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

ARM HOLDING PLC

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS COMPANY, LTD.

LENOVO GROUP LIMITED

ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES

AT&T CORP.

SPRINT CORPORATION

QUALCOMM INCORPORATED

CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

PAMELA MARY DEVINS

Plaintiff / Appellant

MERS KUTT

North York,

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David M. Hoffman

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

111 Congress Avenueone Congress Plaza

Austin, TX 78701

Ashley Bolt Esq.

Attorney at Fish & Richardson

1180 Peachtree Street Ne21St Floor

Atlanta, GA 30309

Michael Hawes

Attorney at Baker Botts, LLP

910 Louisisana Streetone Shell Plaza

Houston, TX 77002

David Folsom Esq.

6002 Summerfield Drive

Texarkana, TX 75503

Melissa Richards Smith

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Michael Edwin Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton, A Professional Corporation

110 N College Avenuesuite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Kevin Paul Anderson

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

505 9Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Eric H. Findlay

Attorney at Findlay Craft PC

102 N College Avenuesuite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

Scott W. Breedlove Esq.

Attorney at Carter Arnett, PLLC

8150 N Central Expressway

Dallas, TX 75206

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Mers Kutt

Attorney at All Computers Inc

140 Cactus Avenue

Other Attorneys

Joshua Lee Raskin

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Eric Joseph Klein

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins LLP

2001 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Matthew Dean Walker

One Riverway, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77056

Richard J. Johnson

2727 North Harwood Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Director, Commercial Litigation Branch, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 480Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Shaun William Hassett

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

2000 Mckinney Avenuesuite 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

Tiffany Patrice Cunningham

131 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Martin Gilmore

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

30 Rockefeller Plaza22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10112

Matias Ferrario

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

1001 West Fourth Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

Rose Cordero Prey

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#117

(#117) Paper document received from Mr. Mers Kutt. (PENDING REVIEW). [824018] [JCP] [Entered: 01/12/2022 08:33 AM]

#116

(#116) Paper document received from Mr. Mers Kutt. (PENDING REVIEW). [822762] [JCP] [Entered: 01/05/2022 10:21 AM]

#115

(#115) Amended Entry of appearance for Margaret I. Lyle as counsel for Appellee Jones Day Margaret I. Lyle. Service: 12/07/2021 by email. [816853] [20-1757] [Margaret Lyle] [Entered: 12/07/2021 02:09 PM]

114 #2

supporting document

114 #1

Court Order

#113

#112

110 #2

supporting document

110 #1

Motion

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

121 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) Paper document received from Mr. Mers Kutt. (PENDING REVIEW). [824018] [JCP] [Entered: 01/12/2022 08:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) Paper document received from Mr. Mers Kutt. (PENDING REVIEW). [822762] [JCP] [Entered: 01/05/2022 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) Amended Entry of appearance for Margaret I. Lyle as counsel for Appellee Jones Day Margaret I. Lyle. Service: 12/07/2021 by email. [816853] [20-1757] [Margaret Lyle] [Entered: 12/07/2021 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) ORDER filed Mr. Kutt's motion [ # 112 ] will be granted to the extent that the mandate will be recalled, the court's September 1, 2020 dismissal order will be vacated, and the appeal will be reinstated if, within 21 days of the date of this order, Mr. Kutt files his opening brief on enclosed Form 12 and, if applicable, an appendix to that brief.; granting [ # 110 ] Jones Day's motion. Mr. Johnson is withdrawn as counsel, and Ms. Lyle is directed to file an amended entry of appearance within seven days from the date of filing of this order. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [816300] [LMS] [Entered: 12/06/2021 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) Declaration of Appellant Mers Kutt. Service: 10/08/2021 by clerk.--[Edited 12/06/2021 by CAB to revise docket text] [804715] [JCP] [Entered: 10/08/2021 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) MODIFIED ENTRY: MOTION of Appellant Mers Kutt to reopen the case and extend time to file his opening brief. Service: 10/08/2021 by clerk. [804714]--[Edited 12/06/2021 by CAB to correct filing event] [JCP] [Entered: 10/08/2021 06:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) Clerk's closed case letter to Appellant Mers Kutt and Appellee Jones Day. Further filings in this closed case will receive no response. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [804566] [CAB] [Entered: 10/08/2021 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) MOTION of Appellee Jones Day to withdraw counsel Richard J. Johnson. Service: 08/24/2021 by email, US mail. [794979] [20-1757] [Margaret Lyle] [Entered: 08/24/2021 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee Jones Day. Service: 08/24/2021 by email, US mail. [794967] [20-1757] [Margaret Lyle] [Entered: 08/24/2021 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) Entry of appearance for Margaret I. Lyle as counsel for Appellee Jones Day. Service: 08/24/2021 by email, US mail. [794963] [20-1757] [Margaret Lyle] [Entered: 08/24/2021 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Entry of appearance for Minghui Yang as of counsel for Appellee AT&T Corp.. Service: 04/30/2020 by email, US mail. [691495] [20-1757] [Minghui Yang] [Entered: 05/01/2020 12:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interest for Appellee AT&T Corp.. Service: 04/30/2020 by email, US mail. [691421] [20-1757] [Scott Breedlove] [Entered: 04/30/2020 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee AT&T Corp., Certificate of Interest [ # 4 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 05/07/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [691355] [JAL] [Entered: 04/30/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Toshiba Corporation. Service: 04/30/2020 by email, US mail. [691332] [20-1757] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 04/30/2020 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Toshiba Corporation. Service: 04/30/2020 by email, US mail. [691327] [20-1757] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 04/30/2020 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Michael Hawes as principal counsel for Appellee Toshiba Corporation. Service: 04/30/2020 by email, US mail. [691324] [20-1757] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 04/30/2020 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellee AT&T Corp.. Service: 04/30/2020 by email, US mail. [691247] [20-1757] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Scott Breedlove] [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docketing Statement for the Appellee AT&T Corp.. Service: 04/30/2020 by email, US mail. [691246] [20-1757] [Scott Breedlove] [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Scott W. Breedlove as principal counsel for Appellee AT&T Corp.. Service: 04/30/2020 by email, US mail. [691245] [20-1757] [Scott Breedlove] [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/23/2020. [690972] Entry of Appearance is due 05/13/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/13/2020. Appellant's informal brief is due 05/26/2020. [JAL] [Entered: 04/29/2020 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where American Residential Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nvidia Corporation is a litigant