This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/16/2022 at 05:48:42 (UTC).

Kuster v. Western Digital Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 Kuster filed an Other lawsuit against Western Digital Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1644

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

MARTIN KUSTER

Appellees

WESTERN DIGITAL CORPORATION

WESTERN DIGITAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

SANDISK LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

David A. Reed Esq.

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

1100 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Appellee Attorney

Erica Wilson

Attorney at Walters Wilson LLP

2100 Geng Road

Palo Alto, CA 94303

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid. Fee Amount: $500.00. Receipt Number: A13-37391-107. [843312] [22-1644] [David Reed] [Entered: 04/14/2022 05:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/13/2022. [843206] Fee/IFP is due on 04/28/2022. Entry of Appearance is due on 04/28/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/28/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 04/28/2022. Certified List is due on 05/24/2022. [JCW] [Entered: 04/14/2022 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Western Digital Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Digital Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where SanDisk LLC is a litigant