This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/13/2021 at 06:29:12 (UTC).

Kurin, Inc. v. Magnolia Medical Technologies

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 Kurin, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Magnolia Medical Technologies. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55025

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

KURIN, INC.

Counter Claimant

MAGNOLIA MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Nathan D. Thomas Esquire

Attorney at Jones Waldo Holbrook & McDonough

170 South Main Street, Suite 1500

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Jonathan Hangartner Esquire

Attorney at X-PATENTS, PC

5670 La Jolla Boulevard

La Jolla, CA 92037

Elizabeth Butler

Attorney at Jones Waldo Holbrook & McDonough

170 South Main Street, Suite 1500

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Susan Acquista

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

2000 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 400 North Tower

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4704

Christopher Young

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

401 B Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101-4297

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12023078] (CL) [Entered: 03/03/2021 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellee only, 03/02/2021, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [12017384] (CL) [Entered: 02/25/2021 06:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket(#6) Streamlined request [5] by Appellant Kurin, Inc. to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Kurin, Inc. opening brief due 04/12/2021. Appellee Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc. answering brief due 05/12/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12008891] (BG) [Entered: 02/18/2021 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Kurin, Inc.. New requested due date is 04/09/2021. [12008841] [21-55025] (Butler, Elizabeth) [Entered: 02/18/2021 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/11/2021, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11990231] (CL) [Entered: 02/02/2021 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/19/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11968876]. [21-55025] (AD) [Entered: 01/19/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Kurin, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/19/2021. [11968270] [21-55025] (Thomas, Nathan) [Entered: 01/19/2021 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Kurin, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/19/2021. Appellant Kurin, Inc. opening brief due 03/12/2021. Appellee Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc. answering brief due 04/12/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11960414] (JBS) [Entered: 01/12/2021 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kurin, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Young