This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/13/2021 at 06:35:07 (UTC).

Kupfer v. Residential Mortgage Solution

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 Kupfer filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Residential Mortgage Solution. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-65

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Defendant

Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates PC

Plaintiff / Appellants

Betty Ann Kupfer, AKA Betty Kupfer

Delaware, OH 43105

Charles Kupfer

Delaware, OH 43105

Defendant / Appellees

Servis One Inc., DBA BSI Financial Services

Jack Getzelman, individually and as Chief Financial Officer of Residential Mortgage Solution LLC and as Director / Officer of RMS Asset Management LLC

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC

David Sklar, individually and as Managing Director of RMS Asset Management LLC

Cynthia Wallace, individually and as Officer / Director of Specialized Loan Serviceing LLC

Residential Mortgage Services LLC

Natalie Owens, individually and as Officer / Director of BSI Financial Services

Denise Singh Skeete, Esq., individually and as an associate of Jeffrey A. Kosterich LLC

Colonial Impact Fund II LLC

John and Jane Doe Defendants 1-20

Colonial Impact Fund 17 LLC

Residential Properties LLC

Colonial Capital Management LLC

RMS Asset Management LLC

Jeffrey A Kosterich LLC

SN Servicing Corporation

RMS Residential Properties LLC

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Betty Ann Kupfer

41 Vureed Road

Delaware, OH 43105

Charles Kupfer

41 Vureed Road

Delaware, OH 43105

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Robert John Brener

Attorney at Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

750 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Zachary Robin Gold Esq.

Attorney at Friedman Vartolo LLP

85 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Zachary Gold Esq.

Attorney at Friedman Vartolo LLP

85 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

1 #2

Case FILED

#2

#3

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#5

#11

#12

#13

#16

#17

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PAPERS, regarding tracking information, RECEIVED.[3047624] [21-65] [Entered: 03/02/2021 05:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgement and Notice of Appearance, [15], on behalf of Appellant Betty Ann Kupfer and Charles Kupfer, FILED.[3046068] [21-65] [Entered: 03/01/2021 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket(#15) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Betty Ann Kupfer and Charles Kupfer, FILED. Service date No Service by US mail.[3046065] [21-65] [Entered: 03/01/2021 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE, to Appellee Jack Getzelman, James Guerin, Jeffrey A Kosterich LLC, John and Jane Doe Defendants 1-20, Jeffrey A. Kosterich, Natalie Owens, RMS Asset Management LLC, RMS Residential Properties LLC, Residential Mortgage Services LLC, Residential Mortgage Solution LLC, Residential Properties LLC, Servis One Inc., Denise Singh Skeete, David Sklar, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC and Cynthia Wallace, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3030799] [21-65] [Entered: 02/05/2021 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER, dated 02/05/2021, dismissing appeal by 02/26/2021 unless Appellants Beth Ann Kupfer and Charles Kupfer submits Form D-P, opy to pro se, FILED.[3030789] [21-65] [Entered: 02/05/2021 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER, dated 02/05/2021, dismissing appeal by 02/26/2021 unless Appellants Charles Kupfer and Betty Ann Kupder submit Acknowledgement and Notice of Appearance form, copy to pro se, FILED.[3030785] [21-65] [Entered: 02/05/2021 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docket(#7) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Mr. Robert John Brener for Appellee Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Residential Mortgage Solution LLC, Residential Mortgage Services LLC, RMS Residential Properties LLC, RMS Asset Management LLC, Jack Getzelman, James Guerin, David Sklar, Cynthia Wallace, Servis One Inc., Natalie Owens, Jeffrey A Kosterich LLC, Jeffrey A. Kosterich and Denise Singh Skeete and Zachary Robin Gold, Esq. for Appellee SN Servicing Corporation, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3012641] [21-65] [Entered: 01/13/2021 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3012519] [21-65] [Entered: 01/13/2021 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#8) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Betty Ann Kupfer and Charles Kupfer, USCA receipt # 4653154357., FILED.[3012735] [21-65] [Entered: 01/13/2021 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3012512] [21-65] [Entered: 01/13/2021 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/02/2020, RECEIVED.[3012511] [21-65] [Entered: 01/13/2021 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/01/2020, RECEIVED.[3012508] [21-65] [Entered: 01/13/2021 12:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Betty Ann Kupfer and Charles Kupfer, FILED. [3012503] [21-65] [Entered: 01/13/2021 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RMS Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RMS Residential Properties LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C. is a litigant