This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:04:08 (UTC).

Krull v. Oey

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Krull filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Oey. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2138

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

Jeffrey McKoy, Deputy Commissioner for Program Services, NYS DOCCS

Megan MacTavish, Director of Guidance and Counseling, NYS DOCCS

Plaintiff / Appellant

Vladimir Krull

Dannemora, NY 12929

Defendant / Appellees

Rebecca Oey, S.O.R.C. NYS DOCCS

Anthony J. Annucci, Commissioner, NYS DOCCS

Banker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Vladimir Krull

Attorney at Clinton Correctional Facility

P.O. Box 2001

Dannemora, NY 12929

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Barbara D. Underwood

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) NEW CASE MANAGER, Gerard Whidbee, ASSIGNED.[2644390] [19-2138] [Entered: 08/30/2019 10:02 AM]

#7

(#7) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Anthony J. Annucci, Banker and Rebecca Oey, the New York State Attorney Generals Office does not currently represent the state defendants. Accordingly, I respectfully request that you remove this Office as counsel and designate each defendant-appellee only as a defendant RECEIVED. Service date 07/23/2019 by US mail.[2615384] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/23/2019 03:51 PM]

#14

(#14) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [12], on behalf of Appellant Vladimir Krull, copy to pro se, FILED.[2619938] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:38 AM]

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

1 #2

Case FILED

#15

(#15) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Vladimir Krull, FILED. No Service.[2627300] [19-2138] [Entered: 08/08/2019 11:06 AM]

#28

(#28) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Vladimir Krull Brief due date as 10/22/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 10/22/2019, copy to pro se, FILED.[2644484] [19-2138] [Entered: 08/30/2019 10:42 AM]

#21

(#21) PAPERS, Form D-P, RECEIVED.[2632514] [19-2138] [Entered: 08/14/2019 04:39 PM]

#10

(#10) ORDER, dated 07/29/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/09/2019, unless Appellant Vladimir Krull submits, Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2619199] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:12 PM]

#5

(#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2609762] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:36 PM]

#4

(#4) AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2609761] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:36 PM]

#13

(#13) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Vladimir Krull, informing Court of proposed due date 10/22/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 07/24/2019 by US mail.[2619926] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:32 AM]

#11

(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Vladimir Krull, FILED. Service date 07/24/2019 by US mail.[2619922] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:30 AM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/25/2019, RECEIVED.[2609759] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:34 PM]

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Vladimir Krull Brief due date as 10/22/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 10/22/2019, copy to pro se, FILED.[2644484] [19-2138] [Entered: 08/30/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NEW CASE MANAGER, Gerard Whidbee, ASSIGNED.[2644390] [19-2138] [Entered: 08/30/2019 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • (#17) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Vladimir Krull, district court receipt # SYR055563, FILED.[2628602] [19-2138] [Entered: 08/09/2019 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) PAPERS, Form D-P, RECEIVED.[2632514] [19-2138] [Entered: 08/14/2019 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CURED DEFECTIVE Form D-P, [ # 15 ], on behalf of Appellant Vladimir Krull, FILED.[2627301] [19-2138] [Entered: 08/08/2019 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Vladimir Krull, FILED. No Service.[2627300] [19-2138] [Entered: 08/08/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [12], on behalf of Appellant Vladimir Krull, copy to pro se, FILED.[2619938] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Vladimir Krull, informing Court of proposed due date 10/22/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 07/24/2019 by US mail.[2619926] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • (#12) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Vladimir Krull, FILED. Service date 07/24/2019 by US mail.[2619924] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Vladimir Krull, FILED. Service date 07/24/2019 by US mail.[2619922] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER, dated 07/29/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/09/2019, unless Appellant Vladimir Krull submits, Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2619199] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • (#8) ATTORNEY, Barbara D. Underwood, for Defendants - Appellees, TERMINATED.[2615520] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Anthony J. Annucci, Banker and Rebecca Oey, the New York State Attorney Generals Office does not currently represent the state defendants. Accordingly, I respectfully request that you remove this Office as counsel and designate each defendant-appellee only as a defendant RECEIVED. Service date 07/23/2019 by US mail.[2615384] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/23/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2609762] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2609761] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2609760] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/25/2019, RECEIVED.[2609759] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Vladimir Krull, FILED. [2609753] [19-2138] [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less