This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/01/2021 at 06:10:55 (UTC).

Kristine Kurk v. Los Rios Classified Employees, et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 Kristine Kurk filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Los Rios Classified Employees,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16257

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendants

SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 620

SAN LUIS COASTAL UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

ERIC PRATER

Plaintiff / Appellant

KRISTINE KURK

Defendant / Appellees

LOS RIOS CLASSIFIED EMPLOYEES ASSOCIATION

LOS RIOS COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

JOHN KNIGHT

ROB BONTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Shella Sadovnik

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Gary M. Messing

Attorney at Messing Adam & Jasmine LLP

980 9Th Street, Suite 380

Sacramento, CA 95814

Monique Alonso

Attorney at Messing Adam & Jasmine, LLP

235 Montgomery Street, Suite 828

San Francisco, CA 94104

Spencer E. Covert Jr.

Attorney at Parker and Covert, LLP

17862 E 17Th Street, Suite 204

Tustin, CA 92780-2164

Ryan Andrew Hanley

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #5

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #6

Case Opening Packet

#2

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12218375] (BLS) [Entered: 09/01/2021 05:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 08/27/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12200991] (BLS) [Entered: 08/13/2021 12:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docket(#5) Attorney Maureen C. Onyeagbako substituted by Attorney Ryan Andrew Hanley. [12195828] (RL) [Entered: 08/09/2021 01:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ryan Andrew Hanley (Office of the Attorney General, PO Box 944255, Sacramento, CA 94244) for Appellee Rob Bonta. Substitution for Attorney Ms. Maureen C. Onyeagbako for Appellee Rob Bonta. Date of service: 08/09/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12195696] [21-16257] (Hanley, Ryan) [Entered: 08/09/2021 01:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/09/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12195677]. [21-16257] (AD) [Entered: 08/09/2021 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Kristine Kurk Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/09/2021. [12195381] [21-16257] (Sadovnik, Shella) [Entered: 08/09/2021 11:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Kristine Kurk Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/09/2021. Transcript ordered by 08/30/2021. Transcript due 09/28/2021. Appellant Kristine Kurk opening brief due 11/08/2021. Appellees Rob Bonta, John Knight, Los Rios Classified Employees Association and Los Rios Community College District answering brief due 12/08/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12189239] (RT) [Entered: 08/02/2021 12:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less