This case was last updated from PACER on 03/19/2019 at 01:06:14 (UTC).

Kristina Kipp, et al v. Weyerhaeuser Company

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 Kristina Kipp filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Weyerhaeuser Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1130

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

VINCENT DISTEFANO

SRIKANTH KALVAKOTAVENKATA

DAVID LAI

SHALINI MARKA

RAHUL PUDI

ANJANI TRIPATHI

CHHAVI CHATURVEDI

KRISTINA KIPP

ANUSHA CHILLAKURU, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

CAROL EBERL

Defendant / Appellant

WEYERHAEUSER CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jacob M. Polakoff Esq.

Attorney at Berger Montague

1818 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Shanon J. Carson Esq.

Attorney at Berger Montague

1818 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Joseph C. Hashmall Esq.

Attorney at Berger Montague

1818 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Lawrence Deutsch Esq.

Attorney at Berger Montague

1818 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

E. Michelle Drake Esq.

Attorney at Berger Montague

43 Southeast Main Street, Suite 505

Minneapolis, MN 55414

Steven A. Schwartz Esq.

Attorney at Chimicles & Tikellis

361 West Lancaster Avenue, One Haverford Centre

Haverford, PA 19041

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Mary Rose Alexander Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

330 North Wabash Avenue, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

Paul G. Gagne Esq.

Attorney at Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis

1600 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Robert C. Collins Esq. III

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

330 North Wabash Avenue, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

Mark S. Mester Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

330 North Wabash Avenue, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Mediation Spec Notice of Assign Telephon

Open Restricted Document #1

Mediation Instructions

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark S. Mester on behalf of Appellant(s) Weyerhaeuser Company. [19-1130] (MSM) [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:19 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jacob M. Polakoff on behalf of Appellee(s) Kristina Kipp, Carol Eberl, Anjani Tripathi, Chhavi Chaturvedi, Shalini Marka, David Lai, Rahul Pudi, Anusha Chillakuru, Srikanth Kalvakotavenkata, Vincent DiStefano. [19-1130] (JMP) [Entered: 01/31/2019 09:37 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from E. Michelle Drake on behalf of Appellee(s) Kristina Kipp, Carol Eberl, Anjani Tripathi, Chhavi Chaturvedi, Shalini Marka, David Lai, Rahul Pudi, Anusha Chillakuru, Srikanth Kalvakotavenkata, Vincent DiStefano. [19-1130] (EMD) [Entered: 01/31/2019 09:32 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert C. Collins III on behalf of Appellant(s) Weyerhaeuser Company. [19-1130] (RCC) [Entered: 01/30/2019 06:27 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Weyerhaeuser Co advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [19-1130] (MRA) [Entered: 01/30/2019 06:21 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Weyerhaeuser Co, received. [19-1130] (MRA) [Entered: 01/30/2019 06:17 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Weyerhaeuser Co, filed. [19-1130] (MRA) [Entered: 01/30/2019 06:15 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Weyerhaeuser Co, filed. [19-1130] (MRA) [Entered: 01/30/2019 06:10 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mary Rose Alexander on behalf of Appellant(s) Weyerhaeuser Company. [19-1130] (MRA) [Entered: 01/30/2019 06:05 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lawrence Deutsch on behalf of Appellee(s) Kristina Kipp, Carol Eberl, Anjani Tripathi, Chhavi Chaturvedi, Shalini Marka, David Lai, Rahul Pudi, Anusha Chillakuru, Srikanth Kalvakotavenkata, Vincent DiStefano. [19-1130] (LD) [Entered: 01/30/2019 01:48 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Shanon J. Carson on behalf of Appellee(s) Kristina Kipp, Carol Eberl, Anjani Tripathi,Chhavi Chaturvedi, Shalini Marka, David Lai, Rahul Pudi, Anusha Chillakuru,Srikanth Kalvakotavenkata, Vincent DiStefano. [19-1130] (SJC) [Entered: 01/30/2019 01:45 PM]

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #5

Standing Order

Open Document #4

Case Caption

Open Document #3

DC Memorandum 121718

Open Document #2

DC Order 121718

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • Attorney Bar status modified for Mark S. Mester, Esq. for Weyerhaeuser Co. Status is now active. (TMK) [Entered: 02/07/2019 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY STATUS for APPEARANCE FORM filed by Attorney Mark S. Mester, Esq. for Appellant Weyerhaeuser Co. Counsel's current status in this Court's attorney rolls is inactive. An attorney must have active status in order to appear before this Court. R.A.D.E. 17.3. If you wish to return to active status or if you believe that you have been marked inactive in error, please complete the Attorney Admission Renewal/Adjustment of Status Form available on this Court's website by 02/20/2019. Future filings will not be accepted from an attorney in inactive status. (TMK) [Entered: 02/06/2019 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 01/31/2019 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark S. Mester on behalf of Appellant(s) Weyerhaeuser Company. [19-1130] (MSM) [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jacob M. Polakoff on behalf of Appellee(s) Kristina Kipp, Carol Eberl, Anjani Tripathi, Chhavi Chaturvedi, Shalini Marka, David Lai, Rahul Pudi, Anusha Chillakuru, Srikanth Kalvakotavenkata, Vincent DiStefano. [19-1130] (JMP) [Entered: 01/31/2019 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from E. Michelle Drake on behalf of Appellee(s) Kristina Kipp, Carol Eberl, Anjani Tripathi, Chhavi Chaturvedi, Shalini Marka, David Lai, Rahul Pudi, Anusha Chillakuru, Srikanth Kalvakotavenkata, Vincent DiStefano. [19-1130] (EMD) [Entered: 01/31/2019 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert C. Collins III on behalf of Appellant(s) Weyerhaeuser Company. [19-1130] (RCC) [Entered: 01/30/2019 06:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Weyerhaeuser Co advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [19-1130] (MRA) [Entered: 01/30/2019 06:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Weyerhaeuser Co, received. [19-1130] (MRA) [Entered: 01/30/2019 06:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Weyerhaeuser Co, filed. [19-1130] (MRA) [Entered: 01/30/2019 06:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Weyerhaeuser Co, filed. [19-1130] (MRA) [Entered: 01/30/2019 06:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mary Rose Alexander on behalf of Appellant(s) Weyerhaeuser Company. [19-1130] (MRA) [Entered: 01/30/2019 06:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lawrence Deutsch on behalf of Appellee(s) Kristina Kipp, Carol Eberl, Anjani Tripathi, Chhavi Chaturvedi, Shalini Marka, David Lai, Rahul Pudi, Anusha Chillakuru, Srikanth Kalvakotavenkata, Vincent DiStefano. [19-1130] (LD) [Entered: 01/30/2019 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Shanon J. Carson on behalf of Appellee(s) Kristina Kipp, Carol Eberl, Anjani Tripathi,Chhavi Chaturvedi, Shalini Marka, David Lai, Rahul Pudi, Anusha Chillakuru,Srikanth Kalvakotavenkata, Vincent DiStefano. [19-1130] (SJC) [Entered: 01/30/2019 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 01/16/2019 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Weyerhaeuser Co in District Court No. 2-17-cv-03958. (KR) [Entered: 01/16/2019 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less