This case was last updated from PACER on 03/18/2019 at 08:39:56 (UTC).

Kreizenbeck v. HHS

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 Kreizenbeck filed an Immigration - Deportation lawsuit against HHS. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1423

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Deportation

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellants

BRET KREIZENBECK, and

SANDRA KREIZENBECK, as legal representatives of a minor child, C.J.K.

Respondent / Appellee

SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Richard Gage Esq.

Attorney at Richard Gage, PC

1815 Pebrican Avenue

Cheyenne, WY 82001

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Meredith Burns Healy

Attorney at Department of Justice

175 N Street Ne

Washington, DC 20002

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellants Bret Kreizenbeck and Sandra Kreizenbeck. Service: 01/29/2019 by email. [581794] [19-1423] [Richard Gage] [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:10 PM]

#10

(#10) Corrected Entry of appearance for Richard Gage, Esq. as principal counsel for Appellants Bret Kreizenbeck and Sandra Kreizenbeck. Service: 01/29/2019 by email. [581792] [19-1423] [Richard Gage] [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:08 PM]

#9

(#9) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Bret Kreizenbeck and Sandra Kreizenbeck. Service: 01/29/2019 by email. [581788] [19-1423] [Richard Gage] [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:06 PM]

#8

(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellee HHS. Service: 01/29/2019 by email. [581675] [19-1423] [Meredith Healy] [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:02 AM]

#7

(#7) Certified list from the United States Court of Federal Claims. Service: 01/29/2019 by clerk. Appellants' brief is due 04/01/2019. [581639] [MMA] [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:38 AM]

#6

(#6) Entry of appearance for Meredith B. Healy as principal counsel for Appellee HHS. Service: 01/28/2019 by email. [581380] [19-1423] [Meredith Healy] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:32 PM]

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellants Bret Kreizenbeck and Sandra Kreizenbeck, Entry of Appearance - R. Gage; Certificate of Interest; Docketing Statement [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ], [ # 4 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 01/31/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[580685] [JAL] [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:32 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Sandra Kreizenbeck. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580271] [19-1423] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 5 ] [Richard Gage] [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:36 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Sandra Kreizenbeck. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580268] [19-1423] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 5 ] [Richard Gage] [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:35 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Richard Gage as principal counsel for Appellant Sandra Kreizenbeck. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580266] [19-1423] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 5 ] [Richard Gage] [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:33 PM]

1 #2

Vaccine Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellants Bret Kreizenbeck and Sandra Kreizenbeck. Service: 01/29/2019 by email. [581794] [19-1423] [Richard Gage] [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corrected Entry of appearance for Richard Gage, Esq. as principal counsel for Appellants Bret Kreizenbeck and Sandra Kreizenbeck. Service: 01/29/2019 by email. [581792] [19-1423] [Richard Gage] [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Bret Kreizenbeck and Sandra Kreizenbeck. Service: 01/29/2019 by email. [581788] [19-1423] [Richard Gage] [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellee HHS. Service: 01/29/2019 by email. [581675] [19-1423] [Meredith Healy] [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certified list from the United States Court of Federal Claims. Service: 01/29/2019 by clerk. Appellants' brief is due 04/01/2019. [581639] [MMA] [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Entry of appearance for Meredith B. Healy as principal counsel for Appellee HHS. Service: 01/28/2019 by email. [581380] [19-1423] [Meredith Healy] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellants Bret Kreizenbeck and Sandra Kreizenbeck, Entry of Appearance - R. Gage; Certificate of Interest; Docketing Statement [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ], [ # 4 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 01/31/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[580685] [JAL] [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Sandra Kreizenbeck. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580271] [19-1423] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 5 ] [Richard Gage] [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Sandra Kreizenbeck. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580268] [19-1423] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 5 ] [Richard Gage] [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Richard Gage as principal counsel for Appellant Sandra Kreizenbeck. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580266] [19-1423] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 5 ] [Richard Gage] [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/04/2019. [578909] Entry of Appearance due 01/31/2019. Certificate of Interest due 01/31/2019. Docketing Statement due 02/19/2019. Certified List due 02/26/2019. [MJL] [Entered: 01/17/2019 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.