Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/04/2020 at 06:11:26 (UTC).

Kravitz v. Tavlarios

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 Kravitz filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Tavlarios. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2579

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Peter C. Georgiopolous

John P. Tavlarios

E. Nikolas Tavlarios

George Konomos

Plaintiff / Appellant

Peter Kravitz, as Trustee of the Aegean Litigation Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Amanda Ravich Esq.

Attorney at Sher Tremonte LLP

90 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Michael Tremonte Esq.

Attorney at Sher Tremonte LLP

90 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Jonathan Sloan Abernethy Esq.

Attorney at Cohen & Gresser LLP

800 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Elizabeth C. Quirk Esq.

Attorney at Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Joshua Goldberg

Attorney at Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Jonathan Bach Esq.

Attorney at Shapiro Arato Bach LLP

500 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10110

Eric S. Olney Esq.

Attorney at Shapiro Arato Bach LLP

500 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10110

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Phillip Jason Collins Esq.

Attorney at Reid Collins & Tsai LLP

1301 South Capital Of Texas Highway, Building C

Austin, TX 78746

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Peter Kravitz, FILED. Service date 09/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2938743] [20-2579] [Entered: 09/25/2020 12:54 PM]

#38

(#38) APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, (pp. 188-273), on behalf of Appellant Peter Kravitz, FILED. Service date 09/25/2020 by CM/ECF.[2938739] [20-2579] [Entered: 09/25/2020 12:52 PM]

37 #2

Appendix FILED (Part 2 of 2)

37 #1

Appendix FILED (Part 1 of 2)

#35

(#35) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee John P. Tavlarios, FILED. Service date 09/14/2020 by CM/ECF.[2930115] [20-2579] [Entered: 09/14/2020 01:25 PM]

#33

(#33) NOTICE, to Appellee John P. Tavlarios , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2929718] [20-2579] [Entered: 09/14/2020 09:49 AM]

#32

(#32) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Peter C. Georgiopolous, FILED. Service date 09/11/2020 by CM/ECF, email. [2929480] [20-2579] [Entered: 09/11/2020 05:46 PM]

#31

(#31) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Peter C. Georgiopolous, FILED. Service date 09/11/2020 by CM/ECF, email.[2929456] [20-2579] [Entered: 09/11/2020 05:18 PM]

#28

(#28) LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 09/25/2020, appellee's brief due date as 10/30/2020, TRANSMITTED.[2914199] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/21/2020 03:41 PM]

#12

(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee George Konomos, FILED. Service date 08/18/2020 by CM/ECF.[2911044] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/18/2020 03:36 PM]

#11

(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee E. Nikolas Tavlarios, FILED. Service date 08/17/2020 by CM/ECF.[2909086] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/17/2020 08:44 AM]

#9

(#10) ATTORNEY, Joshua A. Goldberg, [ # 9 ], in place of attorney Elizabeth C. Quirk, SUBSTITUTED.[2908949] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/15/2020 12:48 PM]

8 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

8 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 07/09/2020, RECEIVED.[2901922] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:51 AM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 07/08/2020, RECEIVED.[2901919] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:50 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Peter Kravitz, FILED. Service date 09/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2938743] [20-2579] [Entered: 09/25/2020 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, (pp. 188-273), on behalf of Appellant Peter Kravitz, FILED. Service date 09/25/2020 by CM/ECF.[2938739] [20-2579] [Entered: 09/25/2020 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, (pp. 1-187), on behalf of Appellant Peter Kravitz, FILED. Service date 09/25/2020 by CM/ECF.[2938734] [20-2579] [Entered: 09/25/2020 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee John P. Tavlarios, FILED. Service date 09/14/2020 by CM/ECF.[2930115] [20-2579] [Entered: 09/14/2020 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ATTORNEY, Michael Tremonte for Peter C. Georgiopolous, in case 20-2579 , [ # 32 ], ADDED.[2929726] [20-2579] [Entered: 09/14/2020 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE, to Appellee John P. Tavlarios , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2929718] [20-2579] [Entered: 09/14/2020 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Peter C. Georgiopolous, FILED. Service date 09/11/2020 by CM/ECF, email. [2929480] [20-2579] [Entered: 09/11/2020 05:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Peter C. Georgiopolous, FILED. Service date 09/11/2020 by CM/ECF, email.[2929456] [20-2579] [Entered: 09/11/2020 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 09/25/2020, appellee's brief due date as 10/30/2020, TRANSMITTED.[2914199] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/21/2020 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2913662] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/21/2020 09:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee George Konomos, FILED. Service date 08/18/2020 by CM/ECF.[2911044] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/18/2020 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee E. Nikolas Tavlarios, FILED. Service date 08/17/2020 by CM/ECF.[2909086] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/17/2020 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY, Joshua A. Goldberg, [ # 9 ], in place of attorney Elizabeth C. Quirk, SUBSTITUTED.[2908949] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/15/2020 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee E. Nikolas Tavlarios, FILED. Service date 08/14/2020 by CM/ECF. [2908285] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/14/2020 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2902156] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docket(#5) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Phillip Jason Collins, Esq. for Appellant Peter Kravitz, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2901927] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Peter Kravitz, district court receipt # ANYSDC-21015020, FILED.[2901925] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 07/09/2020, RECEIVED.[2901922] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 07/08/2020, RECEIVED.[2901919] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Peter Kravitz, FILED. [2901912] [20-2579] [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less