This case was last updated from PACER on 08/22/2020 at 06:39:18 (UTC).

Kraemer v. The City of New York

Case Summary

On 06/23/2020 Kraemer filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The City of New York. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1972

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Michael Edelstein

The City of Easton

CVS Health Corporate

Northampton County Sheriff

Dr. Xequiel Hernandez

Raymond DeRaymond, Attorney

United States Marshals Service, SDNY

Milestones Community Healthcare Inc.

Amy Fontno DeRaymond

Northampton County MH/MR

NYPD

Lamont McClure

The Easton Area School District

Lisa Spitale, Esq.

DOI

Shannon Moore, Esq.

Freya Koger, Ph.D

Andrew Guinan, DOI Inspector

Gretchen Kraemer, Deputy

Plaintiff / Appellant

Thomas D. Kraemer

New York, NY 10023

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Nicholas J. Ferrar Esq.

Attorney at Law Offices of Nicholas J. Ferrar

647 Franklin Avenue

Garden City, NY 11350

Edward G. Sponzilli Esq.

Attorney at Norris McLaughlin & Marcus, PA

400 Crossing Boulevard, P.O. Box 5933

Bridgewater, NJ 08807

Sophia Ree

Attorney at Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford P.C.

120 Broadway

New York, NY 10271

Gerard Joseph Geiger Esq.

Attorney at Newman Williams

712 Monroe Street

Stroudsburg, PA 18360

Brian J. Taylor Esq.

Attorney at King, Spry, Herman, Freund & Faul, LLC

1 West Broad Street

Bethlehem, PA 18018

Benjamin H. Torrance

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York

86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

James Edward Johnson Esq.

Attorney at Corporation Counsel of the City of New York

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Thomas D. Kraemer

145 West 71St Street

New York, NY 10023

Other Attorneys

Marcie M. Marino-Romberger Esq.

Attorney at Sweet, Stevens, Katz, & Williams LLP

331 East Butler Avenue

New Britain, PA 18901

Anna Wolonciej Gottlieb

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

67 #2

Supporting Document

67 #1

Motion FILED

#66

(#66) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee The Easton Area School District, informing Court of proposed due date 10/30/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2907055] [20-1972] [Entered: 08/13/2020 11:39 AM]

#64

(#64) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [46], on behalf of Appellee Easton Police and The City of Easton, FILED.[2905678] [20-1972] [Entered: 08/12/2020 08:19 AM]

62 #2

Supporting Document

62 #1

Motion FILED

61 #3

Supporting Document

61 #1

Supporting Document

#58

(#58) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Easton Police and The City of Easton, informing Court of proposed due date 10/30/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 08/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2904428] [20-1972] [Entered: 08/10/2020 03:17 PM]

13 #2

Supporting Document

#11

(#11) MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee The Easton Area School District, FILED. Service date 07/02/2020 by US mail.[2876692] [20-1972] [Entered: 07/02/2020 03:11 PM]

#9

(#9) MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee County of Northampton Office of the County Executive, Gretchen Kraemer, Lamont McClure, Northampton County MH/MR and Northampton County Sheriff, FILED. Service date 07/01/2020 by US mail.[2875884] [20-1972] [Entered: 07/01/2020 05:04 PM]

#5

(#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2869722] [20-1972] [Entered: 06/24/2020 10:59 AM]

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/24/2020, RECEIVED.[2869716] [20-1972] [Entered: 06/24/2020 10:54 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) MOTION, to cease retaliation, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Thomas D. Kraemer, FILED. Service date 08/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2909038] [20-1972]--[Edited 08/17/2020 by RD] [Entered: 08/17/2020 06:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee The Easton Area School District, informing Court of proposed due date 10/30/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2907055] [20-1972] [Entered: 08/13/2020 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) CURED DEFECTIVE LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, [ # 58 ], on behalf of Appellee Easton Police and The City of Easton, FILED.[2905683] [20-1972] [Entered: 08/12/2020 08:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [46], on behalf of Appellee Easton Police and The City of Easton, FILED.[2905678] [20-1972] [Entered: 08/12/2020 08:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Thomas D. Kraemer, FILED. Service date 08/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2905643] [20-1972] [Entered: 08/11/2020 11:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Thomas D. Kraemer, requesting the proposed brief date to be 40 days, September 11., RECEIVED. Service date 08/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2904846] [20-1972]--[Edited 08/12/2020 by RW] [Entered: 08/11/2020 07:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee CVS Health Corporate, informing Court of proposed due date 11/02/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 08/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2904595] [20-1972] [Entered: 08/10/2020 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Easton Police and The City of Easton, informing Court of proposed due date 10/30/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 08/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2904428] [20-1972] [Entered: 08/10/2020 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee The City of New York, informing Court of proposed due date 11/02/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 08/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2904002] [20-1972] [Entered: 08/10/2020 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 52 ], on behalf of Appellee CVS Health Corporate, FILED.[2902194] [20-1972] [Entered: 08/06/2020 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Thomas D. Kraemer, FILED. Service date 07/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2878743] [20-1972] [Entered: 07/08/2020 12:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Thomas D. Kraemer, FILED. Service date 07/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2878721] [20-1972] [Entered: 07/07/2020 10:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Thomas D. Kraemer, FILED. Service date 07/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2877310] [20-1972] [Entered: 07/06/2020 09:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee The Easton Area School District, FILED. Service date 07/02/2020 by US mail.[2876692] [20-1972] [Entered: 07/02/2020 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee County of Northampton Office of the County Executive, Gretchen Kraemer, Lamont McClure, Northampton County MH/MR and Northampton County Sheriff, FILED. Service date 07/01/2020 by US mail.[2875884] [20-1972] [Entered: 07/01/2020 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docket(#7) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Nicholas J. Ferrar, Esq. for Appellee Michael Edelstein, Gerard Joseph Geiger, Esq. for Appellee County of Northampton Office of the County Executive, Northampton County MH/MR, Northampton County Sheriff, Gretchen Kraemer and Lamont McClure, Marcie M. Marino-Romberger, Esq. for Appellee Marcie Romberger, Esq. and Brian J. Taylor, Esq. for Appellee The Easton Area School District, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2869739] [20-1972] [Entered: 06/24/2020 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2869722] [20-1972] [Entered: 06/24/2020 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2869717] [20-1972] [Entered: 06/24/2020 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/24/2020, RECEIVED.[2869716] [20-1972] [Entered: 06/24/2020 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Thomas D. Kraemer, FILED. [2869712] [20-1972] [Entered: 06/24/2020 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Easton Area School District is a litigant

Latest cases where NYPD is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Health Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant