This case was last updated from PACER on 12/18/2020 at 06:16:51 (UTC).

KPOKYC v. President, et al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 KPOKYC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against President. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-13921

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

PRESIDENT

JOHN DOES

TRUMP ORGANIZATION

TRUMP NATIONAL DORAL RESORT

Plaintiff / Appellant

KPOKYC

Po Box 664

Fairfield, FL 32634

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

David Lanier Luck

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

2 Alhambra Plz Ste 1100

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

KPOKYC

Po Box 664

Fairfield, FL 32634

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Notice of deficient Appellant appendix filed by Party KPOKYC. Deficiencies: missing index page; USDC docket sheet; complaint; answer; order appealed. [Entered: 12/14/2020 03:54 PM]

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees President, Trump National Doral Resort and Trump Organization [20-13921] (ECF: David Luck) [Entered: 12/07/2020 03:12 PM]

Open Document

"EXHIBITS A & B Re: Trump Tower Moscow" construed as Appendix filed by Party KPOKYC. Deficiencies: missing index page; USDC docket sheet; complaint; answer; order appealed. Service date: 11/30/2020 US mail - Appellant KPOKYC; email - Attorney for Appellee: Luck.--[Edited 12/14/2020 by TLR] [Entered: 12/14/2020 03:26 PM]

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question with incorporated motion to amend document filed by Appellant KPOKYC. [Entered: 12/02/2020 07:33 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's brief filed by KPOKYC. Service date: 11/23/2020 [20-13921] Attorney for Appellee: Luck - US mail. [Entered: 12/02/2020 01:19 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant KPOKYC. [Entered: 11/27/2020 03:53 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David Lanier Luck for Appellees President, Trump National Doral Resort and Trump Organization. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13921] (ECF: David Luck) [Entered: 11/19/2020 03:49 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney David Lanier Luck for Appellees President, Trump National Doral Resort and Trump Organization. [20-13921] (ECF: David Luck) [Entered: 11/19/2020 02:32 PM]

Open Document #2

JQ Issued

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to KPOKYC. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 11/09/2020 08:42 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David L. Luck for Appellees David Lanier Luck for President, Trump National Doral Resort and Trump Organization. [20-13921] (ECF: David Luck) [Entered: 11/05/2020 03:42 PM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant KPOKYC. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/30/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 11/03/2020 08:54 AM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 10/29/2020 as to Appellant KPOKYC. [Entered: 11/02/2020 08:47 AM]

Open Document #3

USDC Order, DE # 12

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of deficient Appellant appendix filed by Party KPOKYC. Deficiencies: missing index page; USDC docket sheet; complaint; answer; order appealed. [Entered: 12/14/2020 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees President, Trump National Doral Resort and Trump Organization [20-13921] (ECF: David Luck) [Entered: 12/07/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket"EXHIBITS A & B Re: Trump Tower Moscow" construed as Appendix filed by Party KPOKYC. Deficiencies: missing index page; USDC docket sheet; complaint; answer; order appealed. Service date: 11/30/2020 US mail - Appellant KPOKYC; email - Attorney for Appellee: Luck.--[Edited 12/14/2020 by TLR] [Entered: 12/14/2020 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Jurisdictional Question with incorporated motion to amend document filed by Appellant KPOKYC. [Entered: 12/02/2020 07:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's brief filed by KPOKYC. Service date: 11/23/2020 [20-13921] Attorney for Appellee: Luck - US mail. [Entered: 12/02/2020 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant KPOKYC. [Entered: 11/27/2020 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David Lanier Luck for Appellees President, Trump National Doral Resort and Trump Organization. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13921] (ECF: David Luck) [Entered: 11/19/2020 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney David Lanier Luck for Appellees President, Trump National Doral Resort and Trump Organization. [20-13921] (ECF: David Luck) [Entered: 11/19/2020 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to KPOKYC and John Does, President, Trump National Doral Resort and Trump Organization. [Entered: 11/16/2020 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to KPOKYC. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 11/09/2020 08:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David L. Luck for Appellees David Lanier Luck for President, Trump National Doral Resort and Trump Organization. [20-13921] (ECF: David Luck) [Entered: 11/05/2020 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant KPOKYC. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/30/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 11/03/2020 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 10/29/2020 as to Appellant KPOKYC. [Entered: 11/02/2020 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant KPOKYC on 10/16/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/06/2020 as to Appellant KPOKYC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/16/2020 as to Appellee President [Entered: 10/22/2020 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRESIDENT is a litigant

Latest cases where Trump Organization LLC is a litigant